Equity Trust Company v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Equity Trust Company
Defendant: Deanna Martin, Mythe Dinh, John Doe 1-25 and John Does
Case Number: 1:2022cv01004
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 10 Motion for default judgment against Defendants filed by Plaintiff Equity Trust Company. (Related document(s) #1 ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)
July 26, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Defendants Martin and Dinh Non-Opposition to #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Equity Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Notice by E. Sanders, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration: Certified Mailing Envelope addressed to Deanna Martin, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration: Certified Mailing Envelope addressed to Deanna Martin, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration: Certified Mailing Envelope addressed to Mythe Dinh, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration: Email of 7/3/22, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration: Confirmation of Express Mail Delivery to Martin, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration: Confirmation of Express Mail Delivery to Martin, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration: Confirmation of FedEx Delivery to Dinh) (Harris, Paul)
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 Motion for preliminary injunction with memorandum in support filed by Plaintiff Equity Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harris, Paul)
June 29, 2022 Filing 7 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Deanna Martin on 6/27/22 at Business, filed on behalf of Equity Trust Company (Related document(s) #4 ) (Harris, Paul)
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Process Server by personal service executed upon Deanna Martin on 6/27/2022, filed on behalf of Equity Trust Company (Related document(s) #4 ) (Harris, Paul)
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Mythe Dinh on 6/15/2022, filed on behalf of Equity Trust Company (Related document(s) #4 ) (Harris, Paul)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Mythe Dinh and Deanna Martin. Summons for Defendant Mythe Dinh issued to three separate addresses (2193 S. Waco Street; 18931 E. Baltic Pl.; and 18845 E. Warren Dr). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,M)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Equity Trust Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Harris, Paul)
June 10, 2022 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case (G,M)
June 10, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr.. (G,M)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Equity Trust Company. (Harris, Paul)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 Verified Complaint with jury demand against Mythe Dinh, John Doe 1-25, Deanna Martin. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number COHNDC-11464263. Filed by Equity Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Equity Trust Company's Document about IRA Account Agreements and Disclosure Statements, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (document malformed, see ECF #3 ), #3 Summons to Deanna Martin, #4 Summons to Mythe Dinh (address 1), #5 Summons to Mythe Dinh (address 2), #6 Summons to Mythe Dinh (address 3)) (Harris, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equity Trust Company v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equity Trust Company
Represented By: Paul R. Harris
Represented By: Daniela Paez-Paredes
Represented By: Emmanuel I. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mythe Dinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?