Jackson v. Lakemed Leasing, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Geneva Jackson
Defendant: Lakemed Leasing, LLC, Providence Healthcare Management, Inc., Embassy Painesville, LLC and Lakemed Leasing, LLC doing business as Lakemed Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Case Number: 1:2023cv00154
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Referring Judge: Thomas M Parker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held telephonically on 4/5/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Instructions for participating in the telephone conference will be emailed to all counsel of record separately. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 3/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Position Statement, #2 Attachment B - Preliminary Estimate/Budget). (D,JJ)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Embassy Painesville, LLC. (Salsbury, Scott)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Providence Healthcare Management, Inc.. (Coey, Gracie)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lakemed Leasing, LLC. (Coey, Gracie)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Lakemed Leasing, LLC, Providence Healthcare Management, Inc.. (Coey, Gracie)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Gracie Brenda Coey filed by on behalf of Lakemed Leasing, LLC, Providence Healthcare Management, Inc.. (Coey, Gracie)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Embassy Painesville, LLC. (Salsbury, Scott)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 72.1, the Magistrate Judge may hear and decide all pretrial matters not dispositive of any partys claim or defense and, when appropriate, issue a written order stating the decision. The Court therefore REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker to handle all pretrial matters, except the Magistrate Judge need not prepare a report and recommendation on any dispositive motions. The parties will receive further instructions from Judge Parker's Chambers. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/15/2023. (Y,A)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Lakemed Leasing, LLC on 2/9/2023, filed on behalf of Geneva Jackson Related document(s) #2 . (F,ML)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Providence Healthcare Management, Inc. on 2/9/2023, filed on behalf of Geneva Jackson Related document(s) #2 . (F,ML)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Embassy Painesville, LLC c/o L&M Statutory Agent, LLC on 2/6/2023, filed on behalf of Geneva Jackson. Related document(s) #2 . (R,AP)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lakemed Leasing, LLC c/o Brenda G. Coey Statutory Agent placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7022 3330 0001 3524 2115. (R,AP)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Embassy Painesville, LLC c/o L&M, LLC Statutory Agent placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7022 3330 0001 3524 2092. (R,AP)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Providence Healthcare Management, Inc. c/o Eli Guzman Statutory Agent placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7022 3330 0001 3524 2108. (R,AP)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Embassy Painesville, LLC, Lakemed Leasing, LLC, and Providence Healthcare Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,AP)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (R,AP)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (R,AP)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint for Damages with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-11808078. Filed by Geneva Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue) (Wido, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Lakemed Leasing, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Jackson
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakemed Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Healthcare Management, Inc.
Represented By: Gracie Brenda Coey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embassy Painesville, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Salsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakemed Leasing, LLC doing business as Lakemed Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Gracie Brenda Coey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?