D'Amato v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas D'Amato
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Home Depot and TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01003
Filed: May 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2023 Filing 9 Answer To Amended Complaint filed by Home Depot, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc. Related document #7 . (Cancila, Joseph)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] rendering moot Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to amend complaint (Related Doc #8 ). Per Fed.R.Civ.P. 15, plaintiff may amend as a matter of course within 21 days after a responsive pleading. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/30/2023.(L,Ja)
June 29, 2023 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion to amend complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicholas D'Amato. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Amend Complaint)(Terry, Eric)
June 28, 2023 Filing 7 First Amended complaint against Home Depot, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc. and adding new party defendant(s) TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.. Filed by Nicholas D'Amato. (Terry, Eric)
June 26, 2023 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Home Depot, One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (Cancila, Joseph)
June 2, 2023 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Tyler Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12024430, filed by Plaintiff Nicholas D'Amato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Certificate)(Hawal, William) Modified on 6/2/2023 (Mc,K).
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Tyler J. Schneider for Nicholas D'Amato. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/2/2023.(L,Ja)
May 31, 2023 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Kenneth J. Brennan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12018902, filed by Plaintiff Nicholas D'Amato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Certificate)(Hawal, William) Modified on 5/31/2023 (Mc,K).
May 31, 2023 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Eric M. Terry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12018887, filed by Plaintiff Nicholas D'Amato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Certificate)(Hawal, William) Modified on 5/31/2023 (Mc,K).
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kenneth J. Brennan for Nicholas D'Amato. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/31/2023.(L,Ja)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Eric M. Terry for Nicholas D'Amato. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #3 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/31/2023.(L,Ja)
May 22, 2023 Notice to Attorney Eric M. Terry. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
May 22, 2023 Notice to Attorney Kenneth J. Brennan. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
May 22, 2023 Notice to Attorney Tyler J. Schneider. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
May 18, 2023 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., and Home Depot. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (F,AW)
May 18, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $402.00, receipt number AOHNDC-12000956. Filed by Nicholas D'Amato. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Techtronic Industries North America, #3 Summons to Ryobi Technologies, Inc., #4 Summons to One World Technologies, Inc., #5 Summons to Home Depot) (Hawal, William)
May 18, 2023 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (F,AW)
May 18, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (F,AW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Amato v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas D'Amato
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: Eric M. Terry
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Represented By: Tyler J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?