City of Cleveland, Ohio v. Eli Lilly & Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Cleveland, Ohio
Defendant: Evernorth Health, Inc., Eli Lilly & Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Medco Health Solutions, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc. and OptumInsight, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01417
Filed: July 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Filing 45 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Optum RX on 8/25/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 44 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Sanofi-Aventis on 8/25/24 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 43 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc on 8/25/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 42 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon United Health Group on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 41 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Optum Inc. on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 40 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Novo Nordisk on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 39 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon CVS Health Corp. on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 38 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Caremark RX on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 37 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Optum Insight on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 36 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Medco Health Solutions on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 35 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Express Scripts Inc. on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 34 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Express Scripts Pharmacy on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 33 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Express Scripts Administrators on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 32 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Evernorth Health on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 31 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon CVS Pharmacy Inc on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 30 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Caremark PCS on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 19, 2023 Filing 29 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Eli Lilly Company on 8/24/23 filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio. Related document(s) #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
August 15, 2023 Case transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 2:23-cv-04544, filed 08/15/2023. Related document(s) #28 . (R,AP)
August 14, 2023 Filing 28 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 1) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL No. 3080 Insulin Pricing Litigation. Case transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned to the Honorable Brian R. Martinotti. (M,CE)
August 13, 2023 Filing 27 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon UnitedHealth Group, Inc. on 7/27/2023, filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 26 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC on 7/27/2023, filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 25 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon OptumRx Inc. on 7/27/2023, filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 24 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon OptumInsight, Inc. on 7/26/2023, filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 23 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Optum, Inc. on 7/27/2023, filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 22 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Novo Nordisk Inc. on 7/27/2023, filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 21 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Medco Health Solutions, Inc. on 7/26/2023, filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 20 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. on 7/26/2023, filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 19 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Express Scripts Inc. on 7/26/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 18 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Express Scripts Administrators, LLC on 7/26/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 17 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Evernorth Health, Inc. on 7/26/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 16 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. on 7/28/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 15 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Eli Lilly & Company on 7/26/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 14 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon CVS Pharmacy Inc. on 7/26/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 13 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon CVS Health Corporation on 7/27/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 12 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Caremark PCS Health, LLC on 7/26/2023, filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 11 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Caremark, LLC on 7/26/2023, filed on behalf of City of Cleveland, Ohio (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 10 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature of receipt required, executed upon Caremark RX, LLC on 7/27/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Service of Complaint (Redacted) Upon Defendant Caremark, LLC on July 26, 2023 filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 .(Reichard, Joyce)
August 13, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Service of Complaint (Redacted) Upon Defendant Caremark Rx, LLC on July 27, 2023 filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 .(Reichard, Joyce)
July 31, 2023 Filing 7 SEALED Document: Unredacted Complaint filed by City of Cleveland, Ohio. (Related document(s) #5 ). (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Complaint) (Reichard, Joyce s/by Shawn Acton). Modified on 8/7/2023, filer notified that s/signature should be same as filer (H,SP).
July 31, 2023 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Matthew D. Schultz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12110145, filed by Plaintiff City of Cleveland, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Schultz, Matthew)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Matthew D. Schultz for City of Cleveland, Ohio. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/31/2023.(P,K)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Unredacted Complaint Under Seal. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/28/2023.(P,K)
July 28, 2023 Filing 4 Motion for leave to file Unredacted Complaint Under Seal filed by Plaintiff City of Cleveland, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reichard, Joyce)
July 25, 2023 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan terminated. (R,AP)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/24/23. (LC,S)
July 24, 2023 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Espinoza, Paola)
July 24, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12099084. Filed by City of Cleveland, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix A (Glossary) to Complaint, #3 Summons - Caremark PCS Health, LLC, #4 Summons - Caremark RX, LLC, #5 Summons - Caremark, LLC, #6 Summons - CVS Health Corporation, #7 Summons - CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #8 Summons - Eli Lilly and Company, #9 Summons - ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., #10 Summons - Evernorth Health, Inc. (Formerly Express Scripts Holding Company), #11 Summons - Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, #12 Summons - Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., #13 Summons - Express Scripts, Inc., #14 Summons - Medco Health Solutions, Inc., #15 Summons - Novo Nordisk Inc., #16 Summons - Optum, Inc., #17 Summons - OptumInsight, Inc., #18 Summons - OptumRX Inc., #19 Summons - Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, #20 Summons - UnitedHealth Group, Inc.) (Reichard, Joyce)
July 24, 2023 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (H,Ch)
July 24, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Cleveland, Ohio v. Eli Lilly & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evernorth Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Administrators, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medco Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PCS Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumInsight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Cleveland, Ohio
Represented By: Elena N. Boop
Represented By: James R. Russell, Jr.
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Represented By: William F. Cash
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Represented By: Dylan F. Ford
Represented By: Amy K. Hough
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Matthew D. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?