Denaro v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Gretchen M Denaro and Gretchen M. Denaro
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2023cv01532
Filed: August 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Related document(s) #1 . (Golden, Dennis)
August 9, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,KL)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 8/9/2023. (S,KL)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 8/9/2023.(S,KL)
August 7, 2023 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. (F,AW)
August 7, 2023 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Gretchen M. Denaro. Related document(s) #1 . (Shifrin, Debra)
August 7, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Gretchen M. Denaro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shifrin, Debra)
August 7, 2023 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (F,AW)
August 7, 2023 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (F,AW)
August 7, 2023 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/7/2023. (F,AW)
August 7, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (F,AW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denaro v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen M Denaro
Represented By: Debra S. Shifrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen M. Denaro
Represented By: Debra S. Shifrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: SSA-Office of General Counsel
Represented By: Dennis A. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?