Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation v. Zaccardelli et al
Plaintiff: Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation
Defendant: Alisa J. Zaccardelli, Gino R. Zaccardelli, Richard E. Haberkorn, Molly S. Haberkorn, R. H., ABM Funding, Inc. and Sarah Molly Lynn Haberkorn
Case Number: 1:2023cv01637
Filed: August 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Bridget Meehan Brennan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order of Deposit and Investment 28 U.S.C. 1335 Interpleader Funds: As stated in this Order, the Clerk is to accept and deposit into the registry of the Court the deposit made by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation in the amount of $750,000 plus applicable interest. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 10/12/2023. (H,AR)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order: For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Deposit Its Admitted Liability (Doc. No. #2 ) is GRANTED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 10/12/2023. (H,AR)
October 12, 2023 Copy of October 12, 2023 Orders (Doc. Nos. 21 & 22) mailed to Richard E. Haberkorn, 11342 Ridge Road, North Royalton, OH 44133 and Sarah Molly Lynn Haberkorn, 9911 Foster Avenue, Bratenahl, OH 44108 on 10/12/2023. (H,AR)
October 4, 2023 Filing 20 Answer to #1 Complaint for interpleader filed by Richard E. Haberkorn. (H,Ch)
October 4, 2023 Filing 19 Answer to #1 Complaint for interpleader filed by Sarah Molly Lynn Haberkorn. (H,Ch)
September 21, 2023 Filing 18 Reply Memorandum in Support of its #2 Motion for leave to deposit its admitted liability filed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. (Wall, Julie) Modified text on 9/27/2023 (E,CK).
September 15, 2023 Filing 17 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time until September 21, 2023, to file its reply in support of its Motion for Leave to Deposit its Admitted Liability. (Doc. No. #15 .) Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 9/15/2023. (H,AR)
September 14, 2023 Filing 16 Proposed Order Granting Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Leave to Deposit Its Admitted Liability filed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. Related document(s) #15 . (Wall, Julie)
September 14, 2023 Filing 15 Motion for extension of time until September 21, 2023 to file its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Leave to Deposit its Admitted Liability filed by Plaintiff Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. Related document(s) #2 . (Wall, Julie)
September 14, 2023 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. Molly S. Haberkorn waiver sent on 8/25/2023, answer due 10/24/2023 filed on behalf of Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation (Wall, Julie)
September 11, 2023 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. ABM Funding, Inc. waiver sent on 8/25/2023, answer due 10/24/2023 filed on behalf of Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation (Wall, Julie)
September 11, 2023 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. Richard E. Haberkorn waiver sent on 8/25/2023, answer due 10/24/2023 filed on behalf of Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation (Wall, Julie)
September 7, 2023 Filing 11 Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Deposit its Admitted Liability filed by Alisa J. Zaccardelli. Related document(s) #2 . (Kremser, Mark) Modified on 9/11/2023 (R,AP).
September 7, 2023 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Gino R. Zaccardelli. (Kremser, Mark)
September 7, 2023 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Alisa J. Zaccardelli. (Kremser, Mark)
August 31, 2023 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. Gino R. Zaccardelli waiver sent on 8/25/2023, answer due 10/24/2023 filed on behalf of Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation (Wall, Julie)
August 31, 2023 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. Alisa J. Zaccardelli waiver sent on 8/25/2023, answer due 10/24/2023 filed on behalf of Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation (Wall, Julie)
August 23, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. (Wall, Julie)
August 23, 2023 Filing 5 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem filed by Plaintiff Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Wall, Julie)
August 23, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 8/23/2023. (H,Ch)
August 23, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summonses were not provided and were not issued. (H,Ch)
August 23, 2023 Filing 2 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) with memorandum in support filed by Plaintiff Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Julie)
August 23, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint for Interpleader against ABM Funding, Inc., Molly S. Haberkorn, Richard E. Haberkorn, Alisa J. Zaccardelli, Gino R. Zaccardelli, R. H. a minor by his guardian ad litem. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12145664. Filed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Application for Insurance, #2 Exhibit 2-November 4, 2014 Beneficiary Change Form, #3 Exhibit 3-November 20, 2014 Endorsement, #4 Exhibit 4-November 20, 2014 Guardian Ad Litem Appointment Notification, #5 Exhibit 5-December 19, 2019 Endorsement, #6 Exhibit 6-Richard J. Haberkorn Certificate of Death, #7 Exhibit 7-Assignment, #8 Exhibit 8-Alisas Death Claim Form, #9 Exhibit 9-Rickys June 22, 2023 Email to ONLAC, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wall, Julie)
August 23, 2023 Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (H,Ch)
August 23, 2023 Notice by Clerk that Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (H,Ch)
August 23, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation v. Zaccardelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Julie Freund Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisa J. Zaccardelli
Represented By: Amy A. Wuliger
Represented By: Mark E. Kremser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gino R. Zaccardelli
Represented By: Amy A. Wuliger
Represented By: Mark E. Kremser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E. Haberkorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly S. Haberkorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Molly Lynn Haberkorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?