Larsen et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Keith J. Larsen and Tammy R. Larsen
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company and Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv01655
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Filing 12 Acknowledgement of receipt of Remand Order received from Medina County Court. Related document(s) #10 , #11 . (M,CE)
September 22, 2023 Filing 11 Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Medina County Court of Common Please with acknowledgment of receipt enclosed. (Related document(s) #10 ) (H,SP)
September 19, 2023 Filing 10 Agreed Entry Remanding Case to State Court (Related Doc #8 ). The parties have stipulated that the maximum recovery Plaintiffs may collectively make in this case is Seventy-Five Thousand Dollars and No/Cents ($75,000.00). The parties further agree, and this Court finds, that diversity jurisdiction is now lacking and therefore this case should be remanded to the Medina County, Ohio, Common Pleas Court. The Clerk of this Court is hereby ordered to affect a transfer of the case to the Medina County Common Pleas Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/19/2023. (M,S)
September 15, 2023 Filing 9 Joint Proposed Stipulation of Maximum Recovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tammy R. Larsen, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Keith J. Larsen)Related document(s) #8 .(Pousoulides, Dimitrios)
September 15, 2023 Filing 8 Joint Motion to remand to State Court filed by Keith J. Larsen, Tammy R. Larsen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pousoulides, Dimitrios)
September 1, 2023 Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference on 10/12/2023 at 10:30 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/1/2023. (M,S)
August 31, 2023 Filing 6 State court documents received from Medina County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023CIV0554. Original record returned to Medina County Court with acknowledgment of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Letter to Medina County Court) (Mc,K)
August 29, 2023 Filing 5 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company answer due 9/27/2023. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/29/2023. (M,S)
August 28, 2023 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until September 27, 2023 to answer plaintiffs' complaint, filed by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Meola, Margo)
August 25, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying corporate parents Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC and The Allstate Corporation filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Meola, Margo) Modified docket text, adding corporate parents on 8/28/2023 (H,Ch).
August 25, 2023 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (F,AW)
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 Petition for Removal from Medina County Common Pleas, case number 2023CIV0554 with jury demand. Filing fee paid $402.00, receipt number AOHNDC-12149337. Filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Meola, Margo)
August 25, 2023 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (F,AW)
August 25, 2023 Notice by Clerk that Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (F,AW)
August 25, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (F,AW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsen et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Margo Stoffel Meola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Margo Stoffel Meola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Margo Stoffel Meola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Margo Stoffel Meola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Margo Stoffel Meola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith J. Larsen
Represented By: Dimitrios S. Pousoulides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy R. Larsen
Represented By: Dimitrios S. Pousoulides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?