United States of America v. Brancatelli et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Frank R. Brancatelli, Linda Brancatelli, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., as a nominee for Wilmington Finance, a division of AIG Federal Savings Bank, AIG Federal Savings Bank, State of Ohio, Bureau of Workers' Compensation, Ohio Bureau of Employment Services, Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Lake County Treasurer and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01804
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Filing 20 Answer to #1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Recorded Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Unrecorded Modification)(Deka, Stefanie)
November 9, 2023 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for AIG Federal Savings Bank filed by AIG Federal Savings Bank. (Johnson, Jessica)
November 9, 2023 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Jessica M. Johnson filed by on behalf of AIG Federal Savings Bank. (Johnson, Jessica)
November 9, 2023 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Stefanie L. Deka filed by on behalf of AIG Federal Savings Bank. (Deka, Stefanie)
November 1, 2023 Filing 16 Return of Service by personal service executed upon AIG Federal Savings Bank on 10/26/2023, filed on behalf of United States of America (Related document(s) #2 ) (Seitz, Lee)
October 30, 2023 Filing 15 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Lake County Treasurer. (Echols, Kelly)
October 18, 2023 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by State of Ohio, Bureau of Workers' Compensation. (Kaufman, Amy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 13 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Ohio Department of Job and Family Services. (Kaufman, Amy)
October 16, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Services, LLC for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Johnson, Jessica)
October 16, 2023 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Jessica M. Johnson filed by on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Johnson, Jessica)
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Stefanie L. Deka filed by on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Deka, Stefanie)
October 3, 2023 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Linda Brancatelli waiver sent on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023 filed on behalf of United States of America (Seitz, Lee)
October 3, 2023 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Frank R. Brancatelli waiver sent on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023 filed on behalf of United States of America (Seitz, Lee)
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Lake County Treasurer waiver sent on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023 filed on behalf of United States of America (Seitz, Lee)
September 22, 2023 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Ohio, Bureau of Workers' Compensation waiver sent on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023 filed on behalf of United States of America (Seitz, Lee)
September 22, 2023 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Ohio Department of Job and Family Services waiver sent on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023 filed on behalf of United States of America (Seitz, Lee)
September 22, 2023 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Ohio Bureau of Employment Services waiver sent on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023 filed on behalf of United States of America (Seitz, Lee)
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023 filed on behalf of United States of America (Seitz, Lee)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (H,Ch)
September 18, 2023 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (H,Ch)
September 18, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (H,Ch)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Frank R. Brancatelli, #3 Summons - Linda Brancatelli, #4 Summons - MERS, #5 Summons - AIG Federal Savings Bank, #6 Summons - OH Bureau of Workers' Comp., #7 Summons - OH Bureau of Employment Svcs., #8 Summons - OH Dept. of Job & Family Svcs., #9 Summons - Lake Cty Treasurer) (Seitz, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Brancatelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lee Seitz
Represented By: Julia M. Glen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank R. Brancatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Brancatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., as a nominee for Wilmington Finance, a division of AIG Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: Jessica M. Johnson
Represented By: Stefanie L. Deka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio, Bureau of Workers' Compensation
Represented By: Amy K. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Bureau of Employment Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Job and Family Services
Represented By: Amy K. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Treasurer
Represented By: Gianine A. Germano
Represented By: Kelly A. Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica M. Johnson
Represented By: Stefanie L. Deka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?