Fox v. Kia America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angela Fox
Defendant: KIA America Inc. and Kia America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01881
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion for judicial notice in support of #13 motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter of Cem Hatipoglu)(Prislipsky, Brianna)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion to dismiss #12 first amended complaint for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan P. Schneller, #2 Exhibit A - IMT Website)(Prislipsky, Brianna)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] In light of the filing of the First Amended Complaint, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #10 ) and Motion to Supplement (Doc. No. #11 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/25/2023.(P,K)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 First Amended complaint against Kia America, Inc. Filed by Angela Fox. (Scott, Joseph)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jonathan P. Schneller for Kia America, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/4/2023.(P,K)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Sabrina Heron Strong for Kia America, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #8 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/4/2023.(P,K)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Vincent S. Weisband for Kia America, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #9 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/4/2023.(P,K)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to supplement filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc.. Related document(s) #10 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Cem Hatipoglu, #2 Exhibit Laboratory Test Procedure for FMVSS 114: Theft Protection and Rollaway Prevention)(Prislipsky, Brianna)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with memorandum of law filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc.. (Prislipsky, Brianna)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion for attorney Vincent S. Weisband to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12210119, filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Weisband, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration in Support)(Prislipsky, Brianna) Modified on 10/3/2023 (Mc,K).
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion for attorney Sabrina H. Strong to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12210072, filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standin - Strong, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration in Support)(Prislipsky, Brianna) Modified on 10/3/2023 (Mc,K).
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion for attorney Jonathan P. Schneller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12209978, filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Schneller, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration in Support)(Prislipsky, Brianna) Modified on 10/3/2023 (Mc,K).
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Certified Copy of State Court documents received from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas (copies of original documents). (L,MI)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Joint Notice Regarding Pending Motions filed by Kia America, Inc.. (Prislipsky, Brianna)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Counsel and the parties are hereby advised that this Court will not accept ex parte telephone calls to Chambers regarding substantive issues in pending cases. The Court speaks through its docket. While it may be appropriate to call Chambers regarding routine, non-substantive matters (such as requests for the dial in information for an upcoming status conference, etc.), it is not appropriate under any circumstances for counsel to call Chambers ex parte for guidance or clarification regarding substantive matters, including matters relating to existing case management deadlines, requests to file briefing, and/or inquiries regarding the status of pending motions. All questions regarding substantive matters in pending cases must be filed as a motion on the public docket, with the following exception. If a dispute arises during a deposition that requires this Courts immediate assistance, the parties may call Chambers for assistance, but must do so jointly (and not on an ex parte basis). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/27/2023. (P,K)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,AP)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (R,AP)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (R,AP)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] This matter was removed to this Court on 9/27/2023. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than 10/11/2023, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/27/2023. (P,K)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Kia Corporation, Other Affiliate Hyundai Motor Company for Kia America, Inc. filed by KIA America Inc. (Prislipsky, Brianna)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Kia America Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Prislipsky, Brianna)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV-23-984319. Filing fee paid, $402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12199375. Filed by Kia America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket) (Prislipsky, Brianna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Kia America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Fox
Represented By: Joseph F. Scott
Represented By: Kevin M. McDermott, II
Represented By: Ryan A. Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA America Inc.
Represented By: Brianna M. Prislipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia America, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan P. Schneller
Represented By: Michael P. Gilbride
Represented By: Sabrina Heron Strong
Represented By: Vincent S. Weisband
Represented By: Brianna M. Prislipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?