Avisar et al. v. Chen et al.
Plaintiff: Mordechai Avisar, Tai Liani and James Domingo
Defendant: Wen-Chi Chen, HTC Corporation, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation and Surgical Theater, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01980
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/4/23 setting a case management conference on 1/31/2024 at 12:00 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin. This Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel, and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Local Rule 30.1)(T,A)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. (Lee, Felix)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion to dismiss case for insufficient service of process, Motion to dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendants Wen-Chi Chen, HTC Corporation, and H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Felix S. Lee in Support of Specially Appearing Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Felix S. Lee, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Rebecca Yang)(Lee, Felix) (R,EM). Added Motion to dismiss for failure lack of jurisdiction and Added Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim on 12/1/2023 (R,EM).
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Answer to Complaint filed by Surgical Theater, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Crocker, Julie)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Reply Memorandum in support of #12 Motion to remand lawsuit to Ohio Common Pleas Court and Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Mordechai Avisar, James Domingo, Tai Liani. (Cohen, Joshua)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/21/23 granting plaintiff's #17 Motion for extension of time until November 24, 2023 to file response/reply to #12 Motion to remand to State Court and Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses . No further extensions. (T,A)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion for extension of time until November 24, 2023 to file response/reply to #12 Motion to remand to State Court Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Mordechai Avisar, James Domingo, Tai Liani. Related document(s) #12 . (Cohen, Joshua)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/17/23 granting defendant's #16 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 11/30/2023 to answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint Surgical Theater, Inc. No further extensions. (T,A)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 11/30/2023 to answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Surgical Theater, Inc.. (Crocker, Julie)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Opposition to #12 Motion to remand to State Court and Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. (Blair, Mitchell)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Response of Nominal Defendant Surgical Theater, Inc to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Surgical Theater, Inc. Related document(s) #12 . (Crocker, Julie)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/13/23 granting defendants' #13 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until November 30, 2023 to answer . Wen-Chi Chen answer due 11/30/2023; H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation answer due 11/30/2023; HTC Corporation answer due 11/30/2023. (T,A)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until November 30, 2023 to answer filed by Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. (Blair, Mitchell)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to remand to State Court and Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses, filed by Mordechai Avisar, James Domingo, Tai Liani. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Cohen, Joshua). Added Motion for attorney fees on 11/7/2023 (F,AW).
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/17/23 granting defendant's #11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until November 16, 2023 to answer plaintiffs' complaint. Surgical Theater, Inc. answer due 11/16/2023. (T,A)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until November 16, 2023 to answer plaintiffs' complaint, filed by Defendant Surgical Theater, Inc. (Crocker, Julie)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/16/23 granting defendants' #10 Motion for extension of time until November 16, 2023 to answer Complaint. Wen-Chi Chen answer due 11/16/2023; H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation answer due 11/16/2023; HTC Corporation answer due 11/16/2023. (T,A)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Adrian Matthew Rios for Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James S. Gwin on 10/16/23. (Related Doc #6 )(T,A)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Daniel J. Emam for Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James S. Gwin on 10/16/23. (Related Doc #7 )(T,A)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Felix Lee for Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James S. Gwin on 10/16/23. (Related Doc #8 ) (T,A)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jedediah Wakefield for Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James S. Gwin on 10/16/23. (Related Doc #9 ) (T,A)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion for extension of time until November 16, 2023 to answer Complaint filed by Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. (Wen, Xin)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion for attorney Jedediah Wakefield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12220695, filed by Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Standing)(Blair, Mitchell)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion for attorney Felix Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12220685, filed by Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Standing)(Blair, Mitchell)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion for attorney Daniel J. Emam to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12220671, filed by Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing)(Blair, Mitchell)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion for attorney Adrian Matthew Rios to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12220630, filed by Wen-Chi Chen, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Standing)(Blair, Mitchell)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,AP)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (R,AP)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (R,AP)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Dashwire, Inc., Other Affiliate DeepQ Holding (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate DeepQ Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate DeepQ Technology (Beijing) Co., LTD, Other Affiliate H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp, Other Affiliate High Tech Computer Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd, Other Affiliate HTC (Australia and New Zealand) PTY LTD., Other Affiliate HTC (Thailand) Limited, Other Affiliate HTC America Content Services, Inc., Other Affiliate HTC America Inc., Other Affiliate HTC America Innovation Inc., Other Affiliate DeepQ Technology Corp., Other Affiliate HTC Belgium BVBA/SPRL, Other Affiliate HTC Communication Canada, Ltd., Other Affiliate HTC Communication Co., Ltd, Other Affiliate HTC Communication Sweden AB, Other Affiliate HTC Communication Technologies (Shanghai) Limited, Other Affiliate HTC Corporation (Shanghai WGQ), Other Affiliate HTC Electronics (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate HTC EUROPE CO., Ltd, Other Affiliate HTC FRANCE CORPORATION (1a), Other Affiliate HTC America Holding Inc., Other Affiliate HTC Germany GmbH., Other Affiliate HTC HK, Limited, Other Affiliate HTC Holding B.V., Other Affiliate HTC Iberia S.L., Other Affiliate HTC India Private Limited, Other Affiliate HTC Communication Solutions Mexico, S.A DE C.V., Other Affiliate HTC Investment (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate HTC Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate HTC Investment One (BVI) Corporation, Other Affiliate HTC Italia SRL, Other Affiliate HTC Middle East FZ-LLC, Other Affiliate HTC Netherlands B.V., Other Affiliate HTC NIPPON Corporation, Other Affiliate HTC Nordic ApS., Other Affiliate HTC Philippines Corp., Other Affiliate HTC Poland sp. z.o.o., Other Affiliate HTC Servicios DE Operacion Mexico, S.A DE C.V., Other Affiliate HTC Smart phone (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate HTC South Eastern Europe Limited Liability Company, Other Affiliate HTC VIVE Investment (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate HTC VIVE TECH (HK) Limited, Other Affiliate HTC VR Content (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate HungXu Holding (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate HungXu Technology Corporation, Other Affiliate Inquisitive Minds, Inc., Other Affiliate One & Company Design, Inc., Other Affiliate REIGN Technology Corporation (Cayman), Other Affiliate REIGN Technology Corporation (Republic of China), Other Affiliate S3 Graphics, Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Uomo Vitruviano Corp., Other Affiliate VIVE Arts Corporation, Other Affiliate Vive Arts Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate VIVE Arts Limited, Other Affiliate VIVE ARTS TECH (Beijing) CO. Limited, Other Affiliate Viveport Corporation, Other Affiliate Viveport Digital Corporation, Other Affiliate Viverse Limited (Ireland), Other Affiliate Viverse Limited (UK), Other Affiliate HungXu Technology (BVI) Corp for HTC Corporation filed by HTC Corporation. (Wen, Xin)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation, Other Affiliate Dashwire, Inc., Other Affiliate DeepQ Holding (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate DeepQ Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate DeepQ Technology (Beijing) Co., LTD, Other Affiliate High Tech Computer Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd, Other Affiliate HTC (Thailand) Limited, Other Affiliate HTC America Content Services, Inc., Other Affiliate HTC America Inc., Other Affiliate HTC America Innovation Inc., Other Affiliate DeepQ Technology Corp., Other Affiliate HTC Belgium BVBA/SPRL, Other Affiliate HTC Communication Canada, Ltd., Other Affiliate HTC Communication Co., Ltd, Other Affiliate HTC (Australia and New Zealand) PTY LTD, Other Affiliate HTC Communication Sweden AB, Other Affiliate HTC Communication Technologies (Shanghai) Limited, Other Affiliate HTC Corporation (Shanghai WGQ), Other Affiliate HTC Electronics (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate HTC EUROPE CO., Ltd, Other Affiliate HTC FRANCE CORPORATION (1a), Other Affiliate HTC America Holding Inc., Other Affiliate HTC Germany GmbH., Other Affiliate HTC HK, Limited, Other Affiliate HTC Holding B.V., Other Affiliate HTC Iberia S.L., Other Affiliate HTC India Private Limited, Other Affiliate HTC Communication Solutions Mexico, S.A DE C.V., Other Affiliate HTC Investment (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate HTC Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate HTC Investment One (BVI) Corporation, Other Affiliate HTC Italia SRL, Other Affiliate HTC Middle East FZ-LLC, Other Affiliate HTC Netherlands B.V., Other Affiliate HTC NIPPON Corporation, Other Affiliate HTC Nordic ApS., Other Affiliate HTC Philippines Corp., Other Affiliate HTC Poland sp. z.o.o., Other Affiliate HTC Servicios DE Operacion Mexico, S.A DE C.V., Other Affiliate HTC Smart phone (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate HTC South Eastern Europe Limited Liability Company, Other Affiliate HTC VIVE Investment (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate HTC VIVE TECH (HK) Limited, Other Affiliate HTC VR Content (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate HungXu Holding (BVI) Corp., Other Affiliate HungXu Technology Corporation, Other Affiliate Inquisitive Minds, Inc., Other Affiliate One & Company Design, Inc., Other Affiliate REIGN Technology Corporation (Cayman), Other Affiliate REIGN Technology Corporation (Republic of China), Other Affiliate S3 Graphics, Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Uomo Vitruviano Corp., Other Affiliate VIVE Arts Corporation, Other Affiliate Vive Arts Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate VIVE Arts Limited, Other Affiliate VIVE ARTS TECH (Beijing) CO. Limited, Other Affiliate Viveport Corporation, Other Affiliate Viveport Digital Corporation, Other Affiliate Viverse Limited (Ireland), Other Affiliate Viverse Limited (UK) for H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation. (Wen, Xin)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wen-Chi Chen. (Blair, Mitchell)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County, Ohio, case number CV-23-984802 with jury demand. Filing fee paid, $402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12219534. Filed by HTC Corporation, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation, Wen-Chi Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: County Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Verified Derivative Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Motion to Substitute Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - County Court Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - County Court Summons, #6 Exhibit 6 - Instructions for Service, #7 Exhibit 7 - County Court Docket, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Blair, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avisar et al. v. Chen et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mordechai Avisar
Represented By: Bobby Samini
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tai Liani
Represented By: Bobby Samini
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Domingo
Represented By: Bobby Samini
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wen-Chi Chen
Represented By: Fritz E. Berckmueller
Represented By: Xin Wen
Represented By: Mitchell G. Blair
Represented By: Adrian M. Rios
Represented By: Daniel J. Emam
Represented By: Felix Lee
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Fritz E. Berckmueller
Represented By: Xin Wen
Represented By: Mitchell G. Blair
Represented By: Adrian M. Rios
Represented By: Felix Lee
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Represented By: Daniel J. Emam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corporation
Represented By: Fritz E. Berckmueller
Represented By: Xin Wen
Represented By: Mitchell G. Blair
Represented By: Adrian M. Rios
Represented By: Daniel J. Emam
Represented By: Felix Lee
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgical Theater, Inc.
Represented By: Julie A. Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?