SERIES 15-09-321 v. Progressive Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: SERIES 15-09-321 a Delaware entity and SERIES 15-09-321
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVECOMPLAINT SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT HOLDINGS, INC, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CLASSIC INSURANCE, PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE HAWAII INSURANCE CORPORATION, PROGRESSIVE CLAIMS MANAGEMENT, Progressive Select Insurance Company and Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02015
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Charles Esque Fleming
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David J. Farber for Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #8 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/11/2023.(S,SR)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Timothy H. Lee for Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #10 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/11/2023.(S,SR)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Emily S. Newton for Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #9 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/11/2023.(S,SR)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan for Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #11 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/11/2023.(S,SR)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Zachary A. McEntyre for Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #12 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/11/2023.(S,SR)
December 8, 2023 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Zachary A. McEntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12308908, filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Zachary A. McEntyre in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Tera)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12308906, filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey S. Cashdan in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Tera)
December 8, 2023 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Timothy H. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12308903, filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Timothy H. Lee in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Tera)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 Motion for attorney Emily S. Newton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12308902, filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emily S. Newton in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Tera)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 Motion for attorney David J. Farber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12308900, filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David J. Farber in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Tera)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Complaint. All Defendants answers due December 15, 2023. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 11/16/2023.(S,SR)
November 15, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 15, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Tera)
November 10, 2023 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Michael K. Farrell and Tera N. Coleman filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Farrell, Michael)
November 6, 2023 Filing 5 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon All Defendants on 11/2/2023, filed on behalf of SERIES 15-09-321 (Related document(s) #4 ) (Silvey, Mark)
October 20, 2023 Filing 4 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Progressive Corporation, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, Progressive Claims Management (H,SP)
October 16, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Corrected Summons filed by SERIES 15-09-321. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, #2 Summons - Progressive American Insurance Company, #3 Summons - Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, #4 Summons - Progressive Claims Management, #5 Summons - Progressive Classic Insurance, #6 Summons - Progressive Corporation, #7 Summons - Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., #8 Summons - Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, #9 Summons - Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, #10 Summons - Progressive Select Insurance Company). (Related document(s) #2 , #1 ) (Silvey, Mark)
October 16, 2023 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. The summons provided were incomplete and not issued. (R,AP)
October 16, 2023 Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (R,AP)
October 16, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (R,AP)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid, $402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12227152. Filed by SERIES 15-09-321. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Progressive Corp Structure Updated, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Request for Service by Clerk, #4 Summons - Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, #5 Summons - Progressive American Insurance Company, #6 Summons - Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, #7 Summons - Progressive Claims Management, #8 Summons - Progressive Classic Insurance, #9 Summons - Progressive Corporation, #10 Summons - Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., #11 Summons - Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corporation, #12 Summons - Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, #13 Summons - Progressive Select Insurance Company) (Silvey, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SERIES 15-09-321 v. Progressive Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES 15-09-321 a Delaware entity
Represented By: Mark E. Silvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES 15-09-321
Represented By: Mark E. Silvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION
Represented By: David J. Farber
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: David J. Farber
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVECOMPLAINT SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE DIRECT HOLDINGS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: David J. Farber
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CLASSIC INSURANCE
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: David J. Farber
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Represented By: David J. Farber
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Represented By: David J. Farber
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE HAWAII INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: David J. Farber
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CLAIMS MANAGEMENT
Represented By: David J. Farber
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company
Represented By: David J. Farber
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: David J. Farber
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?