Hogan v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: John W. Hogan
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2023cv02146
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong
Referring Judge: Charles Esque Fleming
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 19 Acknowledgment and Agreement to Be Bound filed by John W. Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order)Related document(s) #18 .(L,Br)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 12/19/2023. (K,L)
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 Joint Electronically Stored Information Protocol filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Craft, Brent)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 Joint Proposed Stipulation for Protective Order filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Craft, Brent)
December 19, 2023 Copy of #18 Protective Order mailed to John W. Hogan 4375 E. 131 Street Garfield Heights, OH 44105 on 12/19/2023. (K,L)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 Reply to Defendant's Motion of Support to Dismiss Complaint filed by John W. Hogan. Related document(s) #14 . (L,Br)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 Reply in support of #10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Craft, Brent)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Status Conference set for 4/5/2024, at 9:30 AM to be held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. Cut-off Date to amend pleadings or add parties: 2/2/2024. Deadline for Motions Directed at the Pleadings: 2/16/2024. Fact Discovery deadline: 7/12/2024. Dispositive Motion deadline: 10/4/ 2024. Initial Expert Report(s) Due: 5/17/2024. Rebuttal Expert Report(s) Due: 6/21/2024. Expert discovery cut-off: 8/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 12/6/2023. (K,L)
December 6, 2023 Filing 12 Opposition to #10 Motion to dismiss complaint filed by John W. Hogan. (R,AP)
December 6, 2023 Copy of CMC minutes mailed to John W. Hogan 4375 E. 131 Street Garfield Heights, OH 44105 on 12/6/2023. (K,L)
December 6, 2023 Copy of #13 Case Management Conference Plan/Order and teleconference access information mailed to John W. Hogan 4375 E. 131 Street Garfield Heights, OH 44105 on 12/6/2023. (K,L)
December 5, 2023 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong held a case management conference on 12/5/2023. Plaintiff John W. Hogan, pro se, attended on behalf of himself. Defendants counsel Eric W. Richardson and Brent D. Craft also attended. The Court established a discovery schedule and set dispositive motion deadlines as indicated in a separate Case Management Order to follow. Time: 20 minutes. (ECRO: none.) (K,L)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 Pro-Se Litigant Registration for Electronic Filing filed by John W. Hogan. (L,Br)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Craft, Brent)
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Chain)(Richardson, Eric)
November 20, 2023 Filing 8 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Notice of Supplementation of Exhibit C to Notice of Removal and Combined Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Temporarily Order the Reinstatement of Insurance Policy, filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplement to Notice of Removal)(Craft, Brent)
November 6, 2023 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until November 30, 2023 to answer Move, or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Defendant Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Brent)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 11/28/2023 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 11/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Report Of The Parties, #2 Attachment 2)(K,L)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong for general pretrial supervision and resolution of non-dispositive motions. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 11/6/2023. (S,SR)
November 6, 2023 Copy of #6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order and teleconference access information mailed to John W. Hogan 4375 E. 131 Street Garfield Heights, OH 44105 on 11/6/2023. (K,L)
November 6, 2023 Copy of #5 Order of Referral mailed to John W. Hogan at 4375 E. 131 Street Garfield Heights, OH 44105 on 11/6/2023. (S,SR)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #7 Motion for extension of time until November 30, 2023 to answer Move, or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiffs Complaint Guardian Life Insurance Company of America answer due 11/30/2023. Case management conference to be held on 11/28/2023 at 09:00 AM telephonically before Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong NOW SET FOR 12/5/2023 at 11:00 AM* telephonically before Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. *NOTE: Case management conference date and time changed. (K,L)
November 6, 2023 Copy of Order on Motion for extension of time to answer mailed to John W. Hogan 4375 E. 131 Street Garfield Heights, OH 44105 on 11/6/2023. (K,L)
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Richardson, Eric)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (F,AW)
November 2, 2023 Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (F,AW)
November 2, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (F,AW)
November 2, 2023 Notice by Clerk that Guardian Life Insurance Company of America failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (F,AW)
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. Related document(s) #1 .(Richardson, Eric)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV-23-985834. Filing fee paid $402.00, receipt number BOHNDC-12256557. Filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Bush Declaration, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Filings) (Richardson, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Eric W. Richardson
Represented By: Brent D. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?