Pietro v. Indivior Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Lindsay Pietro
Defendant: Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., Indivior Inc., Indivior PLC, Indivior Solutions, Inc., MonoSol Rx, LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC and Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare (UK) Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02260
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Charles Esque Fleming
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 12 Stipulation & Order. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/21/2023. Related Document #11 . (S,SR)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond or Otherwise Plead filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 .(Dickerson, Denise)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 Copy of Blank Waiver for Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare (UK) Ltd. filed on behalf of Lindsay Pietro (Connolly, Meghan) Modified on 12/12/2023 (R,EM).
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lindsay Pietro. Indivior PLC waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 2/20/2024 filed on behalf of Lindsay Pietro (Connolly, Meghan)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lindsay Pietro. Reckitt Benckiser LLC waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024 filed on behalf of Lindsay Pietro (Connolly, Meghan)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lindsay Pietro. Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024 filed on behalf of Lindsay Pietro (Connolly, Meghan)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lindsay Pietro. Indivior Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024 filed on behalf of Lindsay Pietro (Connolly, Meghan)
December 11, 2023 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lindsay Pietro. Indivior Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024 filed on behalf of Lindsay Pietro (Connolly, Meghan)
December 5, 2023 Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $120.00 refunded on 12/05/2023 for receipt AOHNDC-12286645. (K,Ve)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Erin K. Copeland for Lindsay Pietro. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 11/28/2023.(S,SR)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Erin K. Copeland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12287065, filed by Plaintiff Lindsay Pietro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit TX State Bar - Certificate of Good Standing)(Copeland, Erin)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR. Wrong document uploaded. Motion for attorney Erin K. Copeland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12286645, filed by Plaintiff Lindsay Pietro. (Attachments: #1 TX State Bar - Certificate of Good Standing)(Copeland, Erin) Modified on 11/22/2023 (S,HR).
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Erin K. Copeland for Lindsay Pietro. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #3 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 11/22/2023. (S,SR)
November 22, 2023 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Motion marked a filing error. Document to be refiled. Receipt #: AOHNDC-12286645, filed on behalf of Lindsay Pietro. Related document(s) #3 . (S,HR)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., Indivior Inc., Indivior PLC, Indivior Solutions, Inc., Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare (UK) Ltd., Reckitt Benckiser LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (F,AW)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $402.00, receipt number BOHNDC-12283742. Filed by Lindsay Pietro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Indivior Inc., #3 Summons Indivior PLC, #4 Summons Indivior Solutions Inc., #5 Summons Aquestive Therapeutics Inc., #6 Summons Reckitt Benckiser LLC, #7 Summons Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare UK Ltd) (Connolly, Meghan)
November 21, 2023 Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (F,AW)
November 21, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (F,AW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pietro v. Indivior Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Denise A. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Denise A. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior PLC
Represented By: Denise A. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Denise A. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MonoSol Rx, LLC
Represented By: Denise A. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Represented By: Denise A. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare (UK) Ltd.
Represented By: Denise A. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Pietro
Represented By: Meghan P. Connolly
Represented By: Erin K. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?