Eaton Corporation v. United States of America
Petitioner: Eaton Corporation
Respondent: United State of America and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2023cv02278
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Referring Judge: Thomas M Parker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service by certified mail unexecuted upon Internal Revenue Service on 12/6/2023, filed on behalf of Eaton Corporation Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt IRS) (Hunter, Juliana) Modified link on 1/5/2024 (E,CK). Modified on 1/9/2024 to notate service considered unexecuted. Signature required. (L,Br).
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service by certified mail executed upon US Attorney General on 12/8/2023, filed on behalf of Eaton Corporation Related document(s) #6 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt US Atty General)(Hunter, Juliana) Modified on 1/5/2024 (L,Br).
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by certified mail executed upon US Attorney ND OHIO on 12/8/2023, filed on behalf of Eaton Corporation Related document(s) #6 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt US Atty ND Ohio)(Hunter, Juliana) Modified on 1/5/2024 (L,Br).
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/27/23 granting parties' #9 Motion to stay. (T,A)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 Joint Motion to stay case filed by Respondent United States of America. (Heston, Anderson)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] referring case to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker for preparation of report and recommendation. Judge James S. Gwin on 12/12/23. (T,A)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon United States of America (Internal Revenue Service). (M,CE)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment as related to 1:23-mc-00037 before Judge James S. Gwin for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/27/2023. (P,K)
November 27, 2023 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. Judge Pamela A. Barker terminated. (F,AW)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Nadiya F. Beckwith-Stanley for Eaton Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/27/2023.(P,K)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Garrett L. Brodeur for Eaton Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/27/2023.(P,K)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Counsel and the parties are hereby advised that this Court will not accept ex parte telephone calls to Chambers regarding substantive issues in pending cases. The Court speaks through its docket. While it may be appropriate to call Chambers regarding routine, non-substantive matters (such as requests for the dial in information for an upcoming status conference, etc.), it is not appropriate under any circumstances for counsel to call Chambers ex parte for guidance or clarification regarding substantive matters, including matters relating to existing case management deadlines, requests to file briefing, and/or inquiries regarding the status of pending motions. All questions regarding substantive matters in pending cases must be filed as a motion on the public docket, with the following exception. If a dispute arises during a deposition that requires this Courts immediate assistance, the parties may call Chambers for assistance, but must do so jointly (and not on an ex parte basis). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/27/2023. (P,K)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Juliana D. Hunter for Eaton Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #3 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/27/2023.(P,K)
November 24, 2023 Filing 6 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United State of America for (U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio) and (U.S. Attorney General). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
November 24, 2023 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
November 24, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Nadiya F. Beckwith-Stanley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12287169, filed by Petitioner Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Beckwith-Stanley, Nadiya)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Garrett L. Brodeur to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12287167, filed by Petitioner Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Brodeur, Garrett)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Juliana D. Hunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12287166, filed by Petitioner Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Hunter, Juliana)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation PLC for Eaton Corporation filed by Eaton Corporation. (Hunter, Juliana)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint against United State of America. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12287158. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:23-mc-00037-JG. Filed by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6038A Summonses, #2 Affidavit of Minghe Bai, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Rebecca C. Lutzko, #5 Summons - William M. Paul, #6 Summons - Merrick B. Garland). (Hunter, Juliana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton Corporation v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Garrett L. Brodeur
Represented By: Nadiya F. Beckwith-Stanley
Represented By: Juliana D. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United State of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Anderson P. Heston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?