Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. v. PAC Machinery, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. doing business as Darn Tough Vermont
Defendant: PAC Machinery, LLC, Converting Technology, Inc. doing business as PAC Machinery, Audion Automation, Ltd. doing business as Clamco doing business as PAC Machinery, PAC Machinery Group and PAC Machinery Bags and Materials
Case Number: 1:2023cv02304
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Bridget Meehan Brennan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 17 Proposed Stipulation to Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Audion Automation, Ltd., Converting Technology, Inc.. (Hinshaw, Scot)
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 Proposed Order re: Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Audion Automation, Ltd., Converting Technology, Inc.. Related document(s) #15 . (Hinshaw, Scot)
January 12, 2024 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 26, 2024 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint (second request for extension) filed by Audion Automation, Ltd., Converting Technology, Inc.. (Hinshaw, Scot)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants Converting Technology, Inc. and Audion Automation Ltd.'s second unopposed motion for an extension of time until January 26, 2024, to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Doc. No. #15 .) Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 1/12/2024. (H,AR)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Converting Technology, Inc.. (Hinshaw, Scot)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Audion Automation, Ltd.. (Hinshaw, Scot)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 Proposed Order re: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time filed by Audion Automation, Ltd., Converting Technology, Inc.. Related document(s) #11 . (Hinshaw, Scot)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 12, 2024 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Audion Automation, Ltd., Converting Technology, Inc. (Hinshaw, Scot)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Scot A.L. Hinshaw and Evan J. Bunis filed by on behalf of Audion Automation, Ltd., Converting Technology, Inc. (Hinshaw, Scot)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants Converting Technology, Inc. and Audion Automation, Ltd.'s unopposed motion for an extension of time until January 12, 2024, to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Doc. No. #11 .) Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 12/20/2023. (H,AR)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Attorney Gordon E.R. Troy's motion for appearance pro hac vice. (Doc. No. #7 .) Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 12/20/2023. (H,AR)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Converting Technology, Inc. on 12/6/2023, filed on behalf of Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. (Fuchs, Joshua)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 Supplement to #7 Motion for attorney Gordon E.R. Troy to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Declaration In Support, filed by Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. (Fuchs, Joshua) Modified on 12/11/2023 (S,HR).
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Gordon E. R. Troy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee paid, $120.00. Receipt number 148978. Filed by Plaintiff Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. (R,AP)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Standing Order signed by Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 12/4/2023. (H,AR)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon PAC Machinery, LLC on 12/1/2023, filed on behalf of Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. (Fuchs, Joshua)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Audion Automation, Ltd. on 12/1/2023, filed on behalf of Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. (Fuchs, Joshua)
December 1, 2023 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Duplicate filing fee. Receipt #: AOHNDC-12296217, filed by Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (G,M)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Audion Automation, Ltd., Converting Technology, Inc., PAC Machinery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (H,Ch)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. (Fuchs, Joshua)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12296248. Filed by Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Audion Automation, #4 Summons - Converting Technology, #5 Summons - PAC Machinery) (Fuchs, Joshua)
November 30, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (H,Ch)
November 30, 2023 Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. v. PAC Machinery, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cabot Hosiery Mills, Inc. doing business as Darn Tough Vermont
Represented By: Joshua B. Fuchs
Represented By: Gordon E.R. Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAC Machinery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Converting Technology, Inc. doing business as PAC Machinery
Represented By: Evan J. Bunis
Represented By: Scot A.L. Hinshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audion Automation, Ltd. doing business as Clamco doing business as PAC Machinery
Represented By: Evan J. Bunis
Represented By: Scot A.L. Hinshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAC Machinery Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAC Machinery Bags and Materials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?