Johnson v. L&R Transportation and Logistics, LLC. et al.
Plaintiff: Jamie Johnson
Defendant: Clifford Trucking, LLC. and Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC.
Cross Defendant: L&R Transportation and Logistics, LLC. and Raymond Dennis Clifford
Other: Allied Van Lines, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC and Bayshore Transportation System, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00158
Filed: January 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2024 Filing 26 Opposition to #19 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Raymond Dennis Clifford, Clifford Trucking, LLC., L&R Transportation and Logistics, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants L&R Transportation, Clifford Trucking and Raymond Clifford Exhibits)(Holthus, Douglas)
March 18, 2024 Filing 25 Opposition to #19 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Bayshore Transportation System, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief in Opposition, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Defendants' Answer, #4 Exhibit C - Emails Re Consent to Removal)(Boroff, Robert)
March 14, 2024 Filing 24 Motion for leave To File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant L&R Transportation and Logistics, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant L&R Transportation First Amended Answer)(Holthus, Douglas)
March 6, 2024 Filing 23 Reply to Co-Defendant, Clifford Trucking, LLC's, Cross-Claim filed by Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC.. Related document(s) #1 . (Tipping, Christopher)
March 6, 2024 Filing 22 Reply to Co-Defendant, Raymond Dennis Clifford's, Cross-Claim filed by Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC.. Related document(s) #1 . (Tipping, Christopher)
March 6, 2024 Filing 21 Reply to Co-Defendant, L&R Transportation and Logistics, LLC's, Cross-Claim filed by Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC.. Related document(s) #1 . (Tipping, Christopher)
March 6, 2024 Filing 20 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand, (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC.. (Tipping, Christopher)
March 4, 2024 Filing 19 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Jamie Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sirva-Allied Certificate of Insurance, #2 Exhibit B - Broker-Carrier Agreement)(Sanders, Douglas)
February 28, 2024 Filing 18 Motion for attorney John C. Whitfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12430701, filed by Plaintiff Jamie Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John C. Whitfield, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Attendance, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Sanders, Douglas)
February 19, 2024 Filing 17 Answer to Allied Van Lines, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC, And Bayshore Transportation Systems, Inc's., Crossclaim filed by L&R Transportation and Logistics, LLC.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Holthus, Douglas)
February 19, 2024 Filing 16 Answer To Allied Van Lines, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC, And Bayshore Transportation Systems, Inc's Crossclaim filed by Raymond Dennis Clifford. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Holthus, Douglas)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Cross-Claims. Defendant Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC shall respond to all cross-claims on or before 03/06/2024. Judge David A. Ruiz on 02/13/2024. (K,MJ)
February 12, 2024 Filing 15 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Eric Coglianese and adding attorney Cara M. Wright filed by on behalf of Raymond Dennis Clifford, Clifford Trucking, LLC., L&R Transportation and Logistics, LLC.. (Wright, Cara)
February 12, 2024 Filing 14 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until March 6, 2024 to Respond to Cross-Claims filed by Defendant Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tipping, Christopher)
February 7, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC. (Tipping, Christopher - s/ by Rachel E.C. Richards) Modified on 2/23/2024 (H,Ch).
February 7, 2024 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Christopher A. Tipping filed by on behalf of Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC.. (Tipping, Christopher)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 03/06/2024. Judge David A. Ruiz on 02/07/2024. (K,MJ)
February 6, 2024 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until 03/06/2024 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Journal Entry Granting Extension of Time to Answer)(Richards, Rachel)
February 6, 2024 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Rachel E.C. Richards filed by on behalf of Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC.. (Richards, Rachel)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Devin A. Bembnister filed by on behalf of Allied Van Lines, Inc., Bayshore Transportation System, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC. (Bembnister, Devin)
February 5, 2024 Filing 8 Answer to cross-claim of L&R Transportation filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Bayshore Transportation System, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Broker-Carrier Agreement) (Boroff, Robert)
February 5, 2024 Filing 7 Answer to cross-claim of Clifford Trucking filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Bayshore Transportation System, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Broker-Carrier Agreement) (Boroff, Robert)
February 5, 2024 Filing 6 Answer to cross-claim of Raymond Clifford filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Bayshore Transportation System, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Broker-Carrier Agreement) (Boroff, Robert)
February 2, 2024 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Cross-Claims against L&R Transportation and Logistics, LLC and Raymond Dennis Clifford (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Bayshore Transportation System, Inc., Sirva Relocation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Broker-Carrier Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Combined Correspondence)(Boroff, Robert)
January 29, 2024 Notice to Attorney Eric Coglianese. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
January 26, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bayshore Transportation System, Inc.. (Boroff, Robert)
January 26, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Relo Group, Inc. for Allied Van Lines, Inc. filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc.. (Boroff, Robert)
January 26, 2024 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (F,AW)
January 26, 2024 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 23 990453 with jury demand. Filing fee paid $405.00, receipt number AOHNDC-12376058. Filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Bayshore Transportation System, Inc., and Sirva Relocation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Court Docket, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Corporate Disclosure Sheet, #6 Corporate Disclosure Sheet, #7 Citizen Disclosure Statement, #8 Citizen Disclosure Statement, #9 Citizen Disclosure Statement, #10 Pleading Answer, #11 Pleading Answer, #12 Pleading Answer) (Boroff, Robert)
January 26, 2024 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (F,AW)
January 26, 2024 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (F,AW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. L&R Transportation and Logistics, LLC. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Johnson
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: L&R Transportation and Logistics, LLC.
Represented By: Douglas P. Holthus
Represented By: Eric Coglianese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Raymond Dennis Clifford
Represented By: Douglas P. Holthus
Represented By: Eric Coglianese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Trucking, LLC.
Represented By: Douglas P. Holthus
Represented By: Eric Coglianese
Represented By: Cara M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Van Lines Moving and Storage, LLC.
Represented By: Christopher A. Tipping
Represented By: Hamilton DeSaussure, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel E.C. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Boroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Sirva Relocation, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Boroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Bayshore Transportation System, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Boroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?