Davison v. City of Lorain et al.
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Davison
Defendant: City of Lorain, Cielo Rodriguez, Mallory Santiago, Patrick Riley, Brett Payne and Victor Perez
Case Number: 1:2024cv00227
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Reply to response to #6 Motion To Dismiss filed by City of Lorain, Brett Payne, Patrick Riley, Cielo Rodriguez, Mallory Santiago. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Pritchard, Joseph)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Response to #6 Motion to dismiss filed by Andrew J. Davison. (R,AP)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Victor Perez c/o Lorain County Prosecutor on 3/11/2024. No delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website. Filed on behalf of Andrew J. Davison. Related document(s) #4 . (M,CE)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion to dismiss filed by City of Lorain, Brett Payne, Patrick Riley, Cielo Rodriguez, Mallory Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support) (Pritchard, Joseph)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Victor Perez c/o Lorain County Prosecutor placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 0940 8467 41. (H,Ch)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to City of Lorain, Brett Payne, Patrick Riley, Cielo Rodriguez, Mallory Santiago placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Priority Mail mail. Receipt # 9114 9022 0085 2250 9364 82. (H,Ch)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion to dismiss with memorandum in support filed by Defendant Victor Perez. (Peltz, Gregory)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Original Summons issued at counter to Pro Se plaintiff for service upon City of Lorain, Victor Perez. (H,Ch)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Additional summonses requested by Andrew J. Davison. Related document #1 . (H,Ch)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of non-document Order mailed to Andrew J. Davison Apt. # J 2606 W. Erie Av. Lorain, OH 44053 on 2/7/2024. (P,K)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Counsel and the parties are hereby advised that this Court will not accept ex parte telephone calls to Chambers regarding substantive issues in pending cases. The Court speaks through its docket. While it may be appropriate to call Chambers regarding routine, non-substantive matters (such as requests for the dial in information for an upcoming status conference, etc.), it is not appropriate under any circumstances for counsel to call Chambers ex parte for guidance or clarification regarding substantive matters, including matters relating to existing case management deadlines, requests to file briefing, and/or inquiries regarding the status of pending motions. All questions regarding substantive matters in pending cases must be filed as a motion on the public docket, with the following exception. If a dispute arises during a deposition that requires this Court's immediate assistance, the parties may call Chambers for assistance, but must do so jointly (and not on an ex parte basis). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 2/7/2024. (P,K)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued at counter to Pro Se plaintiff for service upon Brett Payne, Patrick Riley, Cielo Rodriguez, Mallory Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (H,Ch)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid. $405.00. Receipt # 150067. Filed by Andrew J. Davison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summonses). (H,Ch)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (H,Ch)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davison v. City of Lorain et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lorain
Represented By: Joseph H. Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cielo Rodriguez
Represented By: Joseph H. Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallory Santiago
Represented By: Joseph H. Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Riley
Represented By: Joseph H. Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Payne
Represented By: Joseph H. Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Perez
Represented By: Gregory A. Peltz, II
Represented By: Jacob W. Pullar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?