Elliott v. Indivior, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lori Elliott
Defendant: Indivior Inc., Indivior PLC, Indivior Solutions Inc., Aquestive Therapeutics Inc., Monosol Rx Inc., MonoSol LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC and Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare (UK) Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2024sf65028
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese(MDL3092)
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2024 Filing 10 Stipulation & Order Dismissing with Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims against Monosol, LLC. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 4/4/2024. (M,CE)
February 16, 2024 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern. Case number 2:24-cv-00235. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 15, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) IN RE: SUBOXONE (BUPRENORPHINE/NALOXONE) FILM PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation,the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of February 2, 2024, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable J. Philip Calabrese. (GO) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
February 15, 2024 Filing 7 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohiofor the reasons stated in the order of February 2, 2024, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to theHonorable J. Philip Calabrese. (TLH) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
February 15, 2024 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (GO) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
February 15, 2024 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (TLH) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
February 13, 2024 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation,the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of February 2, 2024, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable J. Philip Calabrese. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (LF) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
February 8, 2024 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS by Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., Reckitt Benckiser LLC (Lynott, Patrick) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Monosol, LLC is directed to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before February 29, 2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 1/31/2024. (DN) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
January 30, 2024 Filing 4 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Monosol, LLC. (Stein, Deana) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (CL) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (CL) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17451694 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Lori Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Dell, Joseph) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
January 11, 2024 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (CL) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL) [Transferred from nyed on 2/16/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Indivior, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Elliott
Represented By: Jay Joseph Massaro
Represented By: Joseph G. Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquestive Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monosol Rx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MonoSol LLC
Represented By: Deana S. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare (UK) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?