Aaron v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Marla J. Aaron
Defendant: Visteon Corporation, Noble Grohe, Lacoya Fleming, Local 1216, United Auto Worker's Union, George Keller, Mattie Johnson, Jerard Coiffard, Michael Miller, Mark Cullen, International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Mark Desori, Steve Stewart, Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company, Melissa Norris, Rosetta Brown, Frank Musloni, Mark Pussari and John Morgan
Case Number: 3:2009cv02549
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2012 Filing 60 True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Affirming the judgment of the District Court re #54 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 11-3650). Date issued as mandate 5/25/12, Costs: None (Related document #59 ) (H,SP)
May 25, 2012 Filing 59 Information copy of opinion from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Affirming the District Court's judgment re #54 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 11-3650). This is not a mandate order. Circuit Judges: Martin and Clay, District Judge: Hood. Date issued by USCA 5/1/12 (H,SP)
July 20, 2011 Filing 58 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion to appeal in forma pauperis (Related Doc #57 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/20/11.(C,D)
June 23, 2011 Copy of #57 Motion (application) to appeal in forma pauperis mailed to Marla Aaron at 1118 Wamajo Drive, Sandusky, OH 44870 on 6/23/11. (M,C)
June 23, 2011 Filing 57 Motion (application) to appeal in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Marla J. Aaron. Related document #54 . (M,C)
June 23, 2011 Filing 56 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of #54 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 11-3650). Date filed in USCA 6/16/11. (H,SP)
June 16, 2011 Copy of #55 Appeal Transcript Order form, and #54 Notice of Appeal mailed to Marla J. Aaron at 1118 Wamajo Drive, Sandusky, OH 44870 on 6/16/11. (M,C)
June 15, 2011 Filing 55 Transcript Order form filed by Marla J. Aaron re #54 Notice of Appeal. Transcript is unnecessary, there were no hearings. (M,C)
June 15, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the #52 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #53 Judgment of 5/31/11, filed by Marla J. Aaron. Filing fee not paid (M,C). Modified text on 6/23/2011 (H,SP).
May 31, 2011 Filing 53 Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed May 31, 2011 it is hereby ORDERED Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (Doc. Nos. #39 , #41 )are granted, and this case is dismissed. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/31/11. (C,D)
May 31, 2011 Filing 52 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (Doc. Nos. #39 , #41 )are granted, and this case is dismissed. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/31/11. (C,D)
March 24, 2011 Filing 51 Reply to response to #41 Motion for summary judgment filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. (Hoyt, Matthew)
March 24, 2011 Filing 50 Marginal Entry Order granting Automotive Components Holdings and Ford Motor Company's Motion for leave to file a Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Related Doc #49 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/24/11.(G,D)
March 21, 2011 Filing 49 Motion for leave to file a Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Hoyt, Matthew)
March 7, 2011 Filing 48 Opposition to International Union UAW, UAW Local 1216, Noble Grohe, Michael Miller, Jerard Coiffard and Mark Cullen #39 Motion for summary judgment filed by Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton) Modified on 3/8/2011 (M,L).
March 7, 2011 Filing 47 Opposition to Ford Motor Company's #41 Motion for summary judgment filed by Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton) Modified on 3/8/2011 (M,L).
March 4, 2011 Filing 46 Marginal Entry Order granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time until March 7, 2011 to respond to Defendants' Motions for summary judgment (re #39 #41 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/4/11.(C,D)
March 3, 2011 Filing 45 Motion for extension of time until March 7, 2011 to Respond to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order granting #43 Motion for extension of time until March 4, 2011 to Respond to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment #39 #41 . Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/18/11.(C,D)
February 16, 2011 Filing 43 Motion for extension of time until March 4, 2011 to Respond to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton)
January 24, 2011 Filing 42 Supplement Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Mark Tessari to #41 Motion for summary judgment filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. Related document(s) #41 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 - Tessari Declaration)(Hoyt, Matthew)
January 21, 2011 Filing 41 Motion for summary judgment filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Affidavit Mark Tessari, #4 Exhibit 1 - Tessari Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 - Tessari Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 - Tessari Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 - Tessari Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 - Tessari Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 - Tessari Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 - Tessari Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 - Tessari Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 - Tessari Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 - Tessari Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 - Tessari Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 - Tessari Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 - Tessari Declaration, #17 Exhibit Marla Aaron Deposition Transcript, #18 Exhibit Aaron Deposition Ex. 1-14, #19 Exhibit Aaron Deposition Ex. 15-27)(Hoyt, Matthew) Modified on 1/24/2011: Exh. 4 omitted. To be filed as a supplement. (M,L).
January 21, 2011 Filing 40 Memorandum In Support of #39 Motion for summary judgment filed by Jerard Coiffard, Mark Cullen, Noble Grohe, International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local 1216, United Auto Worker's Union, Michael Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Aaron Depo Transcript, #2 Exhibit Aaron Depo Ex. 7, #3 Exhibit Aaron Depo Ex. 8, #4 Exhibit Declaration Kemp, #5 Exhibit Aaron Depo Ex. 12 p.2-3, #6 Affidavit Drudi, #7 Affidavit Martin, #8 Exhibit Declaration Furr, #9 Affidavit Klein)(Torzewski, Joan)
January 21, 2011 Filing 39 Motion for summary judgment filed by Jerard Coiffard, Mark Cullen, Noble Grohe, International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local 1216, United Auto Worker's Union, Michael Miller. (Torzewski, Joan)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order granting #37 Motion to Extend Deadlines; Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2011, Opposition due 2/18/2011. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/11/11.(C,D)
January 10, 2011 Filing 37 Joint Motion for extension of Dispositive Motion until 01/21/2011 filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoyt, Matthew)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Case schedule revised as follows: Plaintiff to make written settlement demand to Defendants by 12/10/10; Defendants to respond in writing to Plaintiff's demand by 12/20/10. Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/11; Opposition due by 2/11/11; no reply. Bench Trial set for 5/10/11 confirmed. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/19/10. (S,Na)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. Status Phone Conference held on 11/8/10. Discovery is ongoing. Plaintiff to make written settlement demand to Defendants by 11/19/10. Defendants to respond in writing to Plaintiff's demand by 11/29/10. Dispositive Motions due 12/20/10; Opposition due 1/20/11; Reply due 1/31/11. Bench Trial set for 5/10/11 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 209 before Judge Jack Zouhary. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/8/10. (S,Na)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order granting Motion for stipulated protective order (Related Doc #32 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/4/2010.(C,D)
November 4, 2010 Filing 33 Status Report (Pre-Teleconference) filed by Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton) Modified on 11/5/2010 (M,L).
November 2, 2010 Filing 32 Motion/Stipulated Protective Order filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. (Hoyt, Matthew) Modified on 11/3/2010 (M,L).
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order denying #30 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The dispositive motion deadline of October 15, 2010 is vacated and will be revisited during the Status Conference set for 11/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in to be held telephonically before Judge Jack Zouhary. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/5/2010.(C,D)
October 4, 2010 Filing 30 Joint Motion for extension of Dispositive Motion until 10/29/10 filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoyt, Matthew)
September 30, 2010 Filing 29 Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants filed by Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton)
September 22, 2010 Filing 28 Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants Ford Motor Company and Automotive Components Holdings, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Status Phone Conference held on 7/29/10. Discovery is extended until 10/1/10. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/10; 3 weeks for Opposition; 1 week for Reply. Counsel to call Chambers if they feel further assistance with settlement would be helpful. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/30/10. (S,Na)
July 20, 2010 Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 7/29/10 at 1:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. (Previous date of 7/30/10 vacated.) (S,Na)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. Status Phone Conference held on 6/1/10. Discovery is ongoing. Parties requested time to respond to written discovery and depose Plaintiff, and then address the remaining case schedule. Further Phone Status set for 7/30/10 at 9:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. The Court will initiate the call. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/1/10. (S,Na)
April 21, 2010 Filing 25 Answer to #20 Second Amended Complaint, filed by Automotive Components Holdings and Ford Motor Company. (Hoyt, Matthew) Modified on 4/22/2010 (B,TM).
April 13, 2010 Filing 24 Marginal Entry Order granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Automotive Components Holdings answer due 4/21/2010; Ford Motor Company answer due 4/21/2010. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/13/10.(B,CJ)
April 12, 2010 Filing 23 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until April 21, 2010 to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. Related document(s) #20 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoyt, Matthew) Modified on 4/13/2010 (B,TM).
April 8, 2010 Filing 22 Answer to #20 Second Amended complaint, filed by Jerard Coiffard, Mark Cullen, Noble Grohe, International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local 1216, United Auto Worker's Union, Michael Miller. (Torzewski, Joan) Modified on 4/13/2010 (B,TM).
April 2, 2010 Filing 21 Initial Disclosures filed by Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton)
April 1, 2010 Filing 20 Second Amended complaint against Automotive Components Holdings, Jerard Coiffard, Mark Cullen, Ford Motor Company, Noble Grohe, International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local 1216, United Auto Worker's Union, Michael Miller. Filed by Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton)
March 30, 2010 Filing 19 Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton) Modified on 4/2/2010 (filer to file supplemental amended complaint stating who parties are) (B,TM).
March 30, 2010 Filing 18 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Without Prejudice, of Defendants Keller, Morgan, Desori, Stewart, Johnson, Brown, Norris, and Fleming filed by Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order to Show Cause. Pltf is granted 10 days to show cause why defts George Keller, John Morgan, Mark Desori, Steve Stewart, Mattie Johnson, Rosetta Brown, Melissa Norris, Lacoya Fleming, Mark Pussari and Mark Cullen should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/25/10. (B,CJ)
March 10, 2010 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. CMC held on 3/1/10. Case is assigned to the standard track. Ruled 26(a) disclosures due by 4/1/10. Discovery re liability/damages due by 9/1/10. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 4/1/10. Telephone status hearing set for 6/1/10 at 9:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. (45 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/10/10. (S,Na)
February 25, 2010 Filing 15 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Marla J. Aaron. (Pommeranz, Milton)
January 25, 2010 Filing 14 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice - case management conference to be held on 3/1/2010 at 11:30 AM at Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. (Recommended Track: Standard) Rule 26a disclosures shall be exchanged prior to CMC. (B,CJ)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Appointing Richard R. Malone for Marla J. Aaron as pro bono counsel.. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/22/10. (M,DA)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Phone Conference held on 12/16/09 before Judge Zouhary. The Court refers pltf to the Court's Pro Bono Program for appt of legal counsel. Upon entry of appearance of counsel, the Court will schedule a status conference. Time: 15 min. (B,CJ)
November 24, 2009 Filing 11 Joint Removal Statement filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Jerard Coiffard, Mark Cullen, Ford Motor Company, Noble Grohe, International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local 1216, United Auto Worker's Union, Michael Miller, Frank Musloni. (Torzewski, Joan)
November 20, 2009 Filing 10 Answer to Complaint filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hoyt, Matthew)
November 19, 2009 Filing 9 REMOVAL ORDER. USDC accepts jurisdiction (Erie County Common Pleas, Case No. 2009cv831). Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/19/09. (B,CJ)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER staying proceedings as to deft Visteon Corporation only, pending bankruptcy. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/19/09. (B,CJ)
November 9, 2009 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Notice of Bankruptcy Filing of Visteon Corporation and Suggestion of Stay filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Voluntary Petition)(Hoyt, Matthew)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Automotive Components Holdings answer due 11/20/2009; Ford Motor Comany answer due 11/20/2009. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/9/09.(B,CJ)
November 6, 2009 Filing 5 Motion for extension of time until November 20, 2009 to answer Plaintiff's pro se Complaint filed by Automotive Components Holdings, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoyt, Matthew)
November 5, 2009 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Jerard Coiffard, Mark Cullen, Noble Grohe, International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local 1216, United Auto Worker's Union, Michael Miller, Frank Musloni. (Torzewski, Joan)
November 2, 2009 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
November 2, 2009 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
November 2, 2009 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UAW Local 1216, International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America filed by UAW Local 1216, International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Torzewski, Joan)
October 30, 2009 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Erie County Common Pleas, case number 2009 CV 0831. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0647-3809961. Filed by Local 1216, United Auto Workers Union; International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America; Noble Grohe; Michael Miller; Jerard Coiffard; Frank Musloni and Mark Cullen. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure(Re-filed as Doc. #2 ) (Torzewski, Joan) Modified on 11/2/2009 (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visteon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Grohe
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacoya Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 1216, United Auto Worker's Union
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerard Coiffard
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Miller
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cullen
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Desori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automotive Components Holdings
Represented By: Ronald G. Linville
Represented By: Matthew W. Hoyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Ronald G. Linville
Represented By: Matthew W. Hoyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosetta Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Musloni
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pussari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla J. Aaron
Represented By: Milton E. Pommeranz
Represented By: Richard R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?