MAR Oil Company v. Korpan et al
Plaintiff: MAR Oil Company
Defendant: Myron Korpan, National Energy, LLC, GulfLink LLC, Right of Way Land Services LLC, Imagine Mapping LLC, Chatham Holdings LLC, Ronald Brock, Solstice Energy LLC and Solstice Energy Partners LP
3rd_party_plaintiff: Imagine Mapping LLC, National Energy, LLC, Chatham Holdings LLC, Solstice Energy LLC, Myron Korpan, Ronald Brock, GulfLink LLC, Solstice Energy Partners LP and Right of Way Land Services LLC
3rd_pty_defendant: Wayne Toole
Case Number: 3:2011cv01261
Filed: June 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Wyandot
Presiding Judge: James G. Carr
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Order: Defendant ROWLS' Motion for a New Trial (Doc. 350 ) be, and the same hereby is denied. Defendant ROWLS' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (Doc. 352 ) be, and the same hereby is denied. Co-defendants Solst ice Energy and Raymond Brock's Motion for an Award of Costs (Doc. 350 ) be, and the same hereby is denied. Plaintiffs' Statement of Fees and Costs (Doc. 349 ) to be supplemented as directed herein within three weeks of the date of t his order; defendants to respond, if desired, within two weeks thereafter; plaintiffs to reply within one week thereafter; and Plaintiffs' Motion for a Default Judgment (Doc. 348 ) be, and the same hereby is granted. Judge James G. Carr on 2/3/16. (C,D)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Order : Mar Oil's motion for application of joint and several liability (Doc. 323 ) be, and the same hereby is, granted as to compensatory damages and denied as to punitive damages. (Related Doc # 323 ). Judge James G. Carr on 9/29/15.(C,D)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Order On the motions in limine (Docs. 229 , 230 , 231 , and 232 ) that the parties have submitted. Ruling on plaintiffs' motion to exclude exhibits (Doc. 253 ) held in abeyance. Judge James G. Carr on 4/3/15. (C,D)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order : plaintiff MAR Oil's motion for preliminary injunction is denied. A scheduling conference is set for November 14, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. Out of town counsel may participate by phone. (Related Doc # 7 . Judge James G. Carr on 10/20/2011.(S,AL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAR Oil Company v. Korpan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAR Oil Company
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Nathan A. Hall
Represented By: Jason E. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Korpan
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Energy, LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GulfLink LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Right of Way Land Services LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imagine Mapping LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham Holdings LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Brock
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solstice Energy LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solstice Energy Partners LP
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Imagine Mapping LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: National Energy, LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Chatham Holdings LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Solstice Energy LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Myron Korpan
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Ronald Brock
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: GulfLink LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Solstice Energy Partners LP
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Right of Way Land Services LLC
Represented By: Leigh A. Maxa
Represented By: John B. Schomer
Represented By: Stephan R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_pty_defendant: Wayne Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?