July 29, 2019 |
Filing
349
Memorandum Opinion and Order: In accordance with the Circuit's mandate issued July 25, 2019, (Doc. No. 347), I enter judgment in Defendant's favor. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/29/2019. (S,AL)
|
March 27, 2018 |
Filing
330
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 316 Motion for Indicative Ruling filed by First Federal Bank of the Midwest. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/27/2018. (SG,D)
|
March 26, 2018 |
Filing
328
Memorandum Opinion: Defendant's motion for relief from judgment based on the applicability of Indiana'S split-recovery statute on the jury's punitive damage award is denied. Under a choice of law analysis, I find Ohio has a more significant relationship to the occurrence, the parties, and requires application of Ohio law to the punitive damage award. the punitive damage award is limited to $350,000.00 in accordance with Ohio Rev. Code § 2315.21(D)(2)(b). re 295 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/26/2018. (S,AL)
|
June 28, 2017 |
Filing
317
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendant's motion for an indicative ruling is granted. I further find that this Court would consider the substantial issue raised in the Defendant's motion if the Sixth Circuit were to remand the case for this purpose. re 295 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/28/2017. (S,AL)
|
October 11, 2016 |
Filing
285
Memorandum Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and prejudgment interest (Doc. No. 211) is denied. The Plaintiff's Bill of Costs (Doc. No. 228) is granted in the amount of $350.00 relative to the filing fee but denied as to the remainder of costs. Finally, Plaintiff's motion for non-taxable costs (Doc. No. 212) is denied. Re: 211 , 228 , 212 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/11/2016. (SG,D)
|
June 2, 2016 |
Filing
266
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law is denied. Defendant's motion to stay proceedings in aid of execution is granted until the Court issues a ruling on Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and prejudgment interest. Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and costs is set for oral argument on June 29, 2016 at 1:30 pm, in Courtroom 204. re 241 236 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/2/2016. (S,AL)
|
July 2, 2015 |
Filing
245
Memorandum Opinion and Order: I find this Court has jurisdiction to consider the Defendant's Rule 50(b) motion. Defendant's motion for leave to file a renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law and/or a new trial instanter (Doc. No. 224) is denied as moot. Defendant's amended motion for leave to file renewed motion for judgment as matter of law and/or a new trial instanter (Doc. No. 226) is denied as moot. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for July 7, 2015 at 10:00a.m. to set a briefing schedule on Defendant's renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law and/or a new trial (Doc. No. 236) and to discuss other outstanding matters. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/2/2015. (S,AL)
|
June 3, 2015 |
Filing
231
Order: Defendant's request and stay execution of final judgment in this case, upon perfection of the posting of a supersedeas bond in the amount of $2,700,000.00. 213 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/3/2015.(S,AL)
|
April 27, 2015 |
Filing
204
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendant's motion to limit Dollarhide's expert testimony is denied. (Related Doc # 195 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/24/2014.(S,AL)
|
April 19, 2015 |
Filing
198
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendant's objections raised during the depositions of both Mr. Arnett and Mr. Shepler are overruled. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/19/2015. (S,AL)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing
149
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's motion in limine (Doc. No. 131) is denied. Defendant's motion in limine (Doc. No. 133) is denied as to witness Joel Dollarhide and denied as moot as to witness Barry Trine. Defendant' s motion in limine (Doc. No. 133) is granted as to evidence of an unaccepted offer to purchase Beulah Gardens. The issue of punitive damages shall be the subject of a forthcoming order reopening discovery for a limited purpose. Defendant's motion to strike Plaintiffs second supplemental brief in support (Doc. No. 147) is denied as moot. (Related Doc # 131 )(Related Doc # 133 )(Related Doc # 147 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/24/2014.(S,AL)
|
March 31, 2014 |
Filing
125
Memorandum Opinion and Order: the cross motions for summary judgment are denied. re 95 92 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/31/2014. (S,AL)
|
January 15, 2014 |
Filing
118
Memorandum Opinion and Order : Defendant Danford's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted and he is dismissed as a party to this litigation. (Related Doc # 114 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 1/15/2014.(S,AL)
|
December 4, 2012 |
Filing
48
Order : the court denies Defendant Parent's motion for protective order. (Doc. No. 43). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/4/2012.(S,AL)
|