Killion, et al. v. KeHE Distributors, LLC
Plaintiff: Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, John E. Glasscock, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Robert Laihr, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, Ronald J. Masajlo, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr., Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Frank G. Rizzelli, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr., John D. Smolarski, Debra Teeter, Steven Thuss, Jill M. Vander Griend, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Sue Wilson, William A. Woodyard, Gerald V. Yahna, Jill D. Blazak, Daniel Chiu, Donald Church, Robert Coleman, Larissa J. Kiper, Charles Larock, Steven Philipp, Travis Rierson, Eric Roediger, Michael T. Ryan, Gregory R. Simmonds, Amar Sito, Jay Stimson, William J. Strong, Jonathan Thurman, Sally J. Tresnak, Dennis Trylch, Joseph A. Valentino, Patrice Vanderstelt, Judith Wolfe and Anthony Zaremba
Defendant: KeHE Distributors
Case Number: 3:2012cv00470
Filed: February 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Lucas
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2015 Filing 333 Stipulation & Order approving #332 Joint Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with Prejudice. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/10/2015. (D,L)
September 3, 2015 Filing 332 Joint Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with Prejudice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
August 24, 2015 Filing 331 Marginal Entry Order granting #330 Motion for extension of time until 9/4/2014 to File stipulation for dismissal with prejudice. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/24/2015.(D,L)
August 24, 2015 Filing 330 Motion for extension of time until 9/4/2014 to File stipulation for dismissal with prejudice filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Jill D. Blazak, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Daniel Chiu, Donald Church, Robert Coleman, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Larissa J. Kiper, Robert Laihr, Charles Larock, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Steven Philipp, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Christopher Ricevuto, Travis Rierson, Frank G. Rizzelli, Eric Roediger, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Michael T. Ryan, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, Gregory R. Simmonds, Amar Sito, John D. Smolarski, Jay Stimson, William J. Strong, Debra Teeter, Jonathan Thurman, Steven Thuss, Sally J. Tresnak, Dennis Trylch, Joseph A. Valentino, Jill M. Vander Griend, Patrice Vanderstelt, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Judith Wolfe, Gerald V. Yahna, Anthony Zaremba. Related document(s) #328 . (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 8/24/2015 to remove terminated parties as filers. (M,L).
July 8, 2015 Filing 329 Marginal Entry Order granting #328 Joint Motion for Extension of Time until 8/26/2015 to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/8/2015.(D,L)
July 7, 2015 Filing 328 Joint Motion for extension of July 11, 2015 until August 26, 2015 filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Jill D. Blazak, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Daniel Chiu, Donald Church, Robert Coleman, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Larissa J. Kiper, Robert Laihr, Charles Larock, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Steven Philipp, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Christopher Ricevuto, Travis Rierson, Frank G. Rizzelli, Eric Roediger, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Michael T. Ryan, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, Gregory R. Simmonds, Amar Sito, John D. Smolarski, Jay Stimson, William J. Strong, Debra Teeter, Jonathan Thurman, Steven Thuss, Sally J. Tresnak, Dennis Trylch, Joseph A. Valentino, Jill M. Vander Griend, Patrice Vanderstelt, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Judith Wolfe, Gerald V. Yahna, Anthony Zaremba. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 7/8/2015:Terminated parties removed as filers. (M,L).
June 11, 2015 Filing 327 Dismissal Order. Record Hearing held on 6/11/2015. This Court finds the proposed Settlement Agreement to be fair, reasonable, and an adequate settlement of a bona fide dispute over the asserted Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) claims. The Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement 326 is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice, and this Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/11/2015. (30 mins)(D,L)
June 1, 2015 Filing 325 Marginal Entry Order granting #324 Motion to Seal Motion to Approve 216(b) Settlement in case 3:12-cv-00470-JZ. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/1/2015.Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
June 1, 2015 Filing 324 Joint Motion to seal document Motion to Approve 216(b) Settlement under Seal filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Jill D. Blazak, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Daniel Chiu, Donald Church, Robert Coleman, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, John E. Glasscock, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Larissa J. Kiper, Robert Laihr, Charles Larock, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, Ronald J. Masajlo, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Steven Philipp, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Travis Rierson, Frank G. Rizzelli, Eric Roediger, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Michael T. Ryan, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, Gregory R. Simmonds, Amar Sito, John D. Smolarski, Jay Stimson, William J. Strong, Debra Teeter, Jonathan Thurman, Steven Thuss, Sally J. Tresnak, Dennis Trylch, Joseph A. Valentino, Jill M. Vander Griend, Patrice Vanderstelt, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Sue Wilson, Judith Wolfe, William A. Woodyard, Gerald V. Yahna, Anthony Zaremba. (Machin, Barbara)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER. Phone Status held on 5/15/15. Plaintiffs' motion for approval of settlement due by 6/1/15, to be filed under seal. Defendant's supplemental brief due by 6/8/15. Telephone hearing on motion for approval set for 6/11/15 at 2:00 PM. Counsel may attend by calling the District Court conference line. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/15/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(S,Na)
May 14, 2015 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]. Phone Status now set for 5/15/2015 at 11:30 AM (not 1:30 PM) before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. (D,L)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER. Court understands tentative settlement has been reached and, therefore, pending Motion to Decertify #302 is denied as moot without prejudice. Phone Status set for 5/15/15 at 1:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/12/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(S,Na)
May 11, 2015 Minutes of Continued Settlement Conference [non-document] held 5/8/15 to 5/11/15 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. Tentative settlement reached. Time: 3 hours. (A,P)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 5/8/15 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 318 before Magistrate Judge James Knepp. Lead Counsel to attend in person. A representative with full authority to negotiate and settle are to appear in person or be available by phone. Ex parte statements due 5/7/15 by 4:30 PM. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/7/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(S,Na)
May 4, 2015 Filing 320 Defendant's Expert Damages Report filed by KeHE Distributors. (Lewis, Matthew) Modified on 5/5/2015 to note document is missing case caption and certificate of service. Filer notified. (M,L).
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Order re: Measure of FLSA Damages. Pending before Court is the parties' request to determine the appropriate method of calculating Plaintiffs' damages (Docs. #316 - #317 ). Regular rate of overtime compensation is determined by dividing each Plaintiff's weekly commission payments by the total number of hours worked. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/30/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
April 28, 2015 Filing 318 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request to be Removed from Service List(s) filed by KeHE Distributors. (Klingensmith, Jason)
April 24, 2015 Filing 317 Pre-Trial Brief re Calculation of Regular Rate filed by KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DOL Wage Calculator Example, #2 Exhibit Unreported Authorities)(Lewis, Matthew)
April 24, 2015 Filing 316 Pre-Trial Brief Re Calculations Of Damages Under The FLSA filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1:Paid Time Off, #2 Exhibit 2:Payroll Register/Compensation)(Machin, Barbara) Modified descriptions on 4/27/2015 (M,L).
April 21, 2015 Filing 315 Marginal Entry Order granting #311 Motion for Leave to File Instanter Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Decertification. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/21/2015.Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
April 21, 2015 Filing 314 Supplementation of the record to #309 Opposition to #302 Motion for Decertification of Collective Action filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Jill D. Blazak, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Daniel Chiu, Donald Church, Robert Coleman, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Larissa J. Kiper, Robert Laihr, Charles Larock, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Steven Philipp, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Christopher Ricevuto, Travis Rierson, Frank G. Rizzelli, Eric Roediger, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Michael T. Ryan, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, Gregory R. Simmonds, Amar Sito, John D. Smolarski, Jay Stimson, William J. Strong, Debra Teeter, Jonathan Thurman, Steven Thuss, Sally J. Tresnak, Dennis Trylch, Joseph A. Valentino, Jill M. Vander Griend, Patrice Vanderstelt, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Judith Wolfe, Gerald V. Yahna, Anthony Zaremba. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Kaiser v At The Beach, #2 Appendix Intergit v Rite Aid, #3 Appendix Ruffin v Avis, #4 Appendix Judkins V Southerncare, #5 Appendix Troy v KeHE Food Distributors)(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 4/22/2015 (M,L).
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER. Phone Status held on 4/21/15. Court discussed with counsel pending Motion to Decertify and requested Plaintiffs supplement the record by 4/22/15 with legal authority for permitting a class of allegedly misclassified outside salesmen to proceed collectively following the second stage of class certification analysis. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/21/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(S,Na)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Order granting #307 Plaintiffs' Motion for in camera inspection of documents. See Order for details. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/21/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
April 20, 2015 Filing 311 Motion for leave to file Reply brief instanter re #302 Defendant's Motion for Decertification filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. Related document(s) #309 , #302 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief)(Lewis, Matthew)
April 20, 2015 NOTICE [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 4/21/15 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
April 17, 2015 Filing 310 Opposition to #307 Plaintiffs' Motion For In Camera Inspection of Defendant's Documents filed by KeHE Distributors. (Lewis, Matthew) Modified text on 4/21/2015 (M,L).
April 14, 2015 Filing 309 Opposition to #302 Motion for Decertification of Collective Action filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Jill D. Blazak, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Daniel Chiu, Donald Church, Robert Coleman, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Larissa J. Kiper, Robert Laihr, Charles Larock, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Steven Philipp, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Christopher Ricevuto, Travis Rierson, Frank G. Rizzelli, Eric Roediger, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Michael T. Ryan, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, Gregory R. Simmonds, Amar Sito, John D. Smolarski, Jay Stimson, William J. Strong, Debra Teeter, Jonathan Thurman, Steven Thuss, Sally J. Tresnak, Dennis Trylch, Joseph A. Valentino, Jill M. Vander Griend, Patrice Vanderstelt, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Judith Wolfe, Gerald V. Yahna, Anthony Zaremba. (Machin, Barbara)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER. Court construes Plaintiffs' Motion for In Camera Inspection #307 as a motion to compel production of documents. Defendant shall file any opposition to the Motion and provide Chambers with a hard copy of documents for in camera review by 4/17/15. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/13/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(S,Na) Modified restriction on 4/13/2015 (M,L).
April 10, 2015 Filing 307 Motion Plaintiffs' Motion For In Camera Inspection of Defendant's Documents filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Jill D. Blazak, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Daniel Chiu, Donald Church, Robert Coleman, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, John E. Glasscock, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Larissa J. Kiper, Robert Laihr, Charles Larock, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, Ronald J. Masajlo, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Steven Philipp, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Travis Rierson, Frank G. Rizzelli, Eric Roediger, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Michael T. Ryan, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, Gregory R. Simmonds, Amar Sito, John D. Smolarski, Jay Stimson, William J. Strong, Debra Teeter, Jonathan Thurman, Steven Thuss, Sally J. Tresnak, Dennis Trylch, Joseph A. Valentino, Jill M. Vander Griend, Patrice Vanderstelt, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Sue Wilson, Judith Wolfe, William A. Woodyard, Gerald V. Yahna, Anthony Zaremba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit B Blair v Professional Transportation, #3 Exhibit C Scot, Ensor v Chipolte, #4 Exhibit D Beverly v U.S., #5 Exhibit E New Phoenix Sunrise Corp v Commissioner, IRS, #6 Exhibit F Clevenger v Dillard's Dept Stores)(Bunda, Robert)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER RE: TIME LIMITS. Voir Dire set for 6/8/15 at 1:00 PM with jury trial to follow until concluded. See Order for jury pool and time procedures. Final Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 5/26/15 at 2:00 PM (EDT). Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/9/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(S,Na)
April 9, 2015 Filing 305 JERS ORDER re procedures for submission of Exhibits to be used with JERS program. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/9/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(S,Na)
April 9, 2015 Filing 304 TRIAL ORDER. Jury Trial set for 6/8/15 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 209 before Judge Jack Zouhary. If case settles within 3 weeks of trial, $2,500 in court costs will be assessed against the parties absent a showing of good cause. Joint Statement, Voir Dire and Jury Instructions due 5/18/15. Motions in Limine due 5/11/15; opposition due 5/18/15; no replies. Motions will be ruled on in advance of trial. See attached Order with attachment re deposition testimony. Counsel shall file a complete written transcript of each deposition to be used at trial no later than 5/26/15. Objections will be ruled on in advance of trial. Counsel shall exchange exhibits and bring to court one set for use at trial. If a party will use realtime or order daily transcripts, the party shall provide court reporter with a second set of exhibits. Do not file exhibits with the Clerk of Courts. Counsel shall file a "List of Exhibits" consistent with the JERS CD. See JERS Order and deadline of 5/26/15. In order to facilitate the creation of an accurate Realtime record, counsel shall provide a "Notice to Court Reporter" by 5/26/15. Well in advance of trial, counsel should be trained and familiar with electronic presentation of evidence and use of courtroom equipment. Training on the eve of or during trial is not permitted. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/9/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(S,Na)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Order denying #296 Motion for leave to file motion for partial summary judgment. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/9/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
April 8, 2015 Filing 302 Motion for Decertification of Collective Action filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Church Transcript, #3 Exhibit Vanderstelt Transcript & Dep Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Rizzelli Commission Statement, #5 Exhibit Mallouf Sales Route, #6 Exhibit Ovall Account List, #7 Exhibit Huizinga Sales Route, #8 Exhibit Tresnak Interrogatory Responses, #9 Exhibit Unpublished Cases Cited)(Lewis, Matthew) Modified on 4/13/2015 (M,L).
April 8, 2015 Filing 301 Appeal Order from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied re #287 (No. 14-959) (H,SP)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER. Phone Status held on 4/7/15. Motion of Defendant for Leave to File Partial Summary Judgment #296 denied for reasons which will be stated in a subsequent Order. Case set for trial between June 8 - June 19, 2015. A separate Trial Order will be entered consistent with its earlier Amended Scheduling Order #278 . Counsel encouraged to discuss limiting the trial to liability, with damages pre-determined depending on jury findings. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/8/15. (S,Na)
April 1, 2015 Filing 299 Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Expert's Report filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report)(Machin, Barbara)
April 1, 2015 NOTICE [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 4/7/15 at 4:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
March 31, 2015 Filing 298 Opposition to Defendant's #296 Motion for leave to file motion for partial summary judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Order denying #289 Motion for reconsideration. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/31/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
March 30, 2015 Filing 296 Motion for leave to file motion for partial summary judgment filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Lewis, Matthew)
March 26, 2015 Filing 295 Marginal Entry Order granting # 294 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 4/8/2015 to file Motion to Decertify. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/26/2015.(D,L)
March 24, 2015 Filing 294 Unopposed Motion for extension of Motion to Decertify filing deadline until April 8, 2015 filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Lewis, Matthew)
March 12, 2015 Filing 293 Marginal Entry Order granting # 292 Motion for Leave to File Reply in support of # 289 Motion for reconsideration of the Court's Order Tolling the Statute of Limitations. No further briefing. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/12/2015.Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
March 12, 2015 Filing 292 Motion for Leave to File Reply in support of # 289 Motion for reconsideration of the Court's Order Tolling the Statute of Limitations filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified to edit docket text and event type on 3/12/2015 (D,L).
March 6, 2015 Filing 291 Opposition to # 289 Motion for reconsideration of the Court's Order Tolling the Statute of Limitations filed by KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cited Unreported Cases)(Lewis, Matthew)
March 3, 2015 Filing 290 Notice of Service of Supplemental Responses to Request for Production No. 11 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
February 27, 2015 Filing 289 Motion for reconsideration of the Court's Order Tolling the Statute of Limitations filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Jill D. Blazak, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Daniel Chiu, Donald Church, Robert Coleman, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, John E. Glasscock, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Larissa J. Kiper, Robert Laihr, Charles Larock, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, Ronald J. Masajlo, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Steven Philipp, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Travis Rierson, Frank G. Rizzelli, Eric Roediger, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Michael T. Ryan, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, Gregory R. Simmonds, Amar Sito, John D. Smolarski, Jay Stimson, William J. Strong, Debra Teeter, Jonathan Thurman, Steven Thuss, Sally J. Tresnak, Dennis Trylch, Joseph A. Valentino, Jill M. Vander Griend, Patrice Vanderstelt, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Sue Wilson, Judith Wolfe, William A. Woodyard, Gerald V. Yahna, Anthony Zaremba. (Bunda, Robert)
February 26, 2015 Filing 288 Amended Notice to take Deposition of KeHE Distributors, Inc. on March 16, 2015 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
February 20, 2015 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Jack Zouhary. At the request of counsel, Telephone Conference held on 2/20/15 re discovery dispute. (30 min) (S,Na)
February 11, 2015 Filing 287 Appeal Remark from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 2/6/15 and placed on the docket 2/9/15 as No. 14-959 (H,SP)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Order regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Docs. # 282 & # 283 ). To the extent not already produced, defense counsel will provide information sufficient to calculate the hourly PTO or ABR for all plaintiffs. This prong of the Motion is denied as moot. Compensation records pre-dating 10/9/2010 are irrelevant to Plaintiffs' claim; this prong of the Motion is denied. Defendant's request for fees in opposing Plaintiffs' Motion is also denied. By agreement of counsel, Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint # 284 is granted. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/9/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
February 5, 2015 Filing 285 Second Amended complaint against All Plaintiffs and adding new party plaintiff(s) Jill Blazak, Danny Chiu, Don Church, Robert Coleman, Mark DeBoer, Larissa Kiper, Charles LaRock, Steve Philipp, Travis Rierson, Eric Roediger, Mike Ryan, Greg Simmonds, Amar Sito, Jay Stimson, Dennis Trylch, Bill Strong, Jonathon Thurman, Sally Tresnak, Joe Valentino, Patty Vanderstelt, Judy Wolfe, Anthony Zaremba. Filed by Daryl Paladino, Leonard Hegna, Francis T. Washell, Brion P. Haley, Carl Ovall, Jr, Robert Laihr, Ron Anderson, Thomas E Killion, Marvin J. Huizinga, Benjamin L. Frazier, Jeffrey B. Monn, Todd A. Wagner, Ronald J. Masajlo, Alan Keel, Edward M. Palmer, Todd Miles, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, John E. Glasscock, Donald Burk, Earl P. Crowe, Charles L. Mallouf, Frank G. Rizzelli, Vicki Weaver, Michael O'Neill, Sue Wilson, Jeffrey Beede, Mearl Doster, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, Eric Pogachar, Michael L. Williams, William Todman Mentzer, Thomas B. Moore, John D. Smolarski, Robert Planitzer, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Gerald V. Yahna, Peter H. Waddell, Earl Allman, Laura Pica, Steven R. Savage, Mark Walters, Christopher Ricevuto, Denis K. Vorhees, Anthony J. Basnec, Christine Hodson, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Allan Parse, Debra Teeter, Steven Thuss, Barbara A. Keller, Jamie Cranmer, William A. Woodyard, Jill M. Vander Griend, Jeffrey F. Rogers. (Machin, Barbara)
February 4, 2015 Filing 284 Motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, John E. Glasscock, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Robert Laihr, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, Ronald J. Masajlo, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Frank G. Rizzelli, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, John D. Smolarski, Debra Teeter, Steven Thuss, Jill M. Vander Griend, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Sue Wilson, William A. Woodyard, Gerald V. Yahna. (Attachments: # 1 2nd Amended Complaint and Jury Demand)(Machin, Barbara)
February 2, 2015 NOTICE [non-document]. At the joint request of counsel, the Telephone Conference set for 2/3/15 is vacated and reset for 2/5/15 at 3:00 PM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
January 29, 2015 Filing 283 Opposition to # 282 Motion to compel discovery filed by KeHE Distributors. (Lewis, Matthew)
January 29, 2015 Filing 282 Motion to compel discovery filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, John E. Glasscock, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Robert Laihr, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, Ronald J. Masajlo, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Frank G. Rizzelli, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, John D. Smolarski, Debra Teeter, Steven Thuss, Jill M. Vander Griend, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Sue Wilson, William A. Woodyard, Gerald V. Yahna. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix A to Motion to Compell, # 2 Appendix Appendix B to Motion to Compel, # 3 Appendix Appendix C to Motion to Compel)(Machin, Barbara)
January 9, 2015 Filing 281 Notice to take Deposition of Defendant Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) on January 28, 2015 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 29, 2014 Filing 280 Notice of Service of Discovery Responses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 23, 2014 Filing 279 Notice of Service of Responses to Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 23, 2014 Filing 278 JOINT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER ON REMAND . Court set the following dates: Liability and damages fact discovery deadline for newly joined Plaintiffs due 1/30/15. Expert disclosures and reports due 2/27/15. Close of expert discovery period and rebuttal expert report filing deadline due 3/27/15. Defendant's motion to de-certify due 4/1/15; Plaintiffs' opposition to motion to decertify due 4/15/15; no reply unless requested by Court. Motions in Limine, Jury Instructions, Exhibit and Witness Lists due Per Court's standard Trial Order. Counsel should reserve the dates of June 9-25, 2015 for trial with exact days to be determined later. Court will allot a limited number of trial hours for each side, again exact number to be determined later. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/23/14. (S,Na)
December 19, 2014 Filing 277 Notice of Service of Responses to Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 18, 2014 Filing 276 Proposed Order Joint Amended Scheduling Order on Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER. Phone conference held on 12/15/14. Due to calendar conflict, Court vacates April 2015 trial month and, with agreement of counsel, sets a new trial month of JUNE 2015 . Defendant's Motion to Stay is therefore denied as moot # 272 . Parties will meet and confer to propose a date specific for trial and any related adjustments to the remaining dates in the Scheduling Order on Remand # 222 . (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/15/14. (S,Na)
December 12, 2014 Filing 274 Notice of Service of Responses to Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 11, 2014 Filing 273 Opposition to # 272 Motion to stay Trial Court Proceedings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 11, 2014 NOTICE [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 12/15/14 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
December 8, 2014 Filing 272 Motion to stay filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sixth Circuit Slip Opinion, # 2 Exhibit Unpublished Opinions)(Lewis, Matthew)
December 5, 2014 Filing 271 Notice of Service of Responses to Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
November 28, 2014 Filing 270 Consent to Join in Collective Action under 29 USC 216(b) of Judith F. Wolfe filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 12/5/2014 (M,L).
November 26, 2014 Filing 269 Notice of Service of Responses to Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
November 26, 2014 Filing 268 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) Joseph A. Valentino filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 12/4/2014 (M,L).
November 25, 2014 Filing 267 Consent to Join in Collective Action under 29 USC 216(b) of Michael T. Ryan filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 12/4/2014 (M,L).
November 25, 2014 Filing 266 Consent to Join in Collective Action under 29 USC 216(b) of Lorissa J. Kiper filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 12/4/2014 (M,L).
November 25, 2014 Filing 265 Consent to Join in Collective Action under 29 USC 216(b) of Donald Church filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 12/4/2014 (M,L).
November 24, 2014 Filing 264 Notice of Service of Certificate of Service filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 263 .(Machin, Barbara)
November 24, 2014 Filing 263 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Jay Stimson) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/24/2014 to edit text and to note no certificate of service page, filer notified (B,TM).
November 21, 2014 Filing 262 Consent to Join in Collective Action under 29 USC 216(B) (Travis Rierson) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/24/2014 to edit text (B,TM).
November 21, 2014 Filing 261 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (William J. Strong) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/24/2014 to edit text (B,TM).
November 20, 2014 Filing 260 Notice of Service of Responses to Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/24/2014 to edit text (B,TM).
November 17, 2014 Filing 259 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b). of Robert Coleman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/20/2014 (M,L).
November 17, 2014 Filing 258 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) of Dennis Trylch filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/20/2014 (M,L).
November 13, 2014 Filing 257 Certificate of Service of Supplemental Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
November 10, 2014 Filing 256 Plaintiff Carl Rogers' Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Join filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
November 7, 2014 Filing 255 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 USC 216(b) by Jonathan Thuman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/17/2014 (M,L).
November 6, 2014 Filing 254 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 USC 216(b) Steve Philipp filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/17/2014 (M,L).
November 6, 2014 Filing 253 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 USC 216(b) by Danny Chica filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/17/2014 (M,L).
November 5, 2014 Filing 252 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) of Mark DeBoer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified text on 11/13/2014 (M,L).
November 4, 2014 Filing 251 Notice of Service of Requests for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
October 28, 2014 Filing 250 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) of Gregory R. Simmonds filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014 (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 249 Notice of Service of Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 237 .(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014: Document improperly captioned. Filer notified. (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 248 Notice of Service of Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 241 .(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014: Document improperly captioned. Filer notified. (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 247 Notice of Service of Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 242 .(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014: Document improperly captioned. Filer notified. (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 246 Notice of Service of Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 239 .(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014: Document improperly captioned. Filer notified. (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 245 Notice of Service of Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 237 .(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014: Document improperly captioned. Filer notified. (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 244 Notice of Service of Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 240 .(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014: Document improperly captioned. Filer notified. (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 243 Notice of Service of Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 238 .(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014: Document improperly captioned. Filer notified. (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 242 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) Patrice A. Vanderstelt filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014 (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 241 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) Anthony Zaremba filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014 (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 240 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) Eric D. Roediger filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014 (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 239 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) Amar Sitto filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014 (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 238 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) Charles La Rock filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014 (M,L).
October 28, 2014 Filing 237 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S. C. 216(b) of Carl Rogers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 11/3/2014 (M,L).
October 21, 2014 Filing 236 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) for Jill D. Blazak filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified text on 10/30/2014 (M,L).
October 21, 2014 Filing 235 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) of Sally J. Tresnak filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified text on 10/30/2014 (M,L).
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Order re: Post-Appeal Motion to Toll the Statute of Limitations granting in part # 226 Motion to Toll the Statute of Limitations in case 3:12-cv-00470-JZ. The statute is tolled for all current Plaintiffs and all potential Plaintiffs, with a final decision to be made if and when a party has opted in and Defendant chooses to raise the statute of limitations as an affirmative defense. The tolling period for all cases will be from the date of this Court's earlier Order -- 10/9/2013 -- which was ultimately reversed by the Court of Appeals. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/21/2014. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
October 20, 2014 Filing 233 Marginal Entry Order denying # 232 Defendant's Motion to strike Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/20/2014. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
October 14, 2014 Filing 232 Motion to strike plaintiff's notice of supplemental authority filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(Lewis, Matthew)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice of Collective Action Consent to Join & Contact Information # 228 . Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/14/14. (S,Na)
October 14, 2014 Filing 230 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Equitable Tolling filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bunda, Robert)
October 10, 2014 Filing 229 Opposition to # 226 Motion for relief Plaintiffs' Post-Appeal To Toll The Statute Of Limitations filed by KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Cases)(Lewis, Matthew)
October 3, 2014 Filing 228 Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice of Collective Action, Consent to Join & Contact Information filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit for Unpaid Overtime Wages, # 2 Exhibit Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b), # 3 Exhibit Contact Information Form)(Bunda, Robert)
October 3, 2014 Filing 227 Marginal Entry Order granting # 223 Motion to consolidate cases (Doc. # 223 in case 12 CV 470; Doc. # 45 in case 12 CV 1585; Doc. # 32 in case 12 CV 2861). Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/3/2014. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
October 3, 2014 Filing 226 Motion for relief. Plaintiffs' Post-Appeal To Toll The Statute Of Limitations filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, John E. Glasscock, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Robert Laihr, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, Ronald J. Masajlo, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Frank G. Rizzelli, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, John D. Smolarski, Debra Teeter, Steven Thuss, Jill M. Vander Griend, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Sue Wilson, William A. Woodyard, Gerald V. Yahna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Daniel B. Yahraes, et al. v Restaurant Assoc Events Corp. et al, # 2 Exhibit Hanaa B. Abadeer, et al v Tyson Foods, Inc.(page 5 of exhibit is blank))(Bunda, Robert) Modified to indicate blank page on 10/10/2014 (M,L).
October 2, 2014 Filing 225 Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 223 .(Bunda, Robert)
October 2, 2014 Filing 224 FILING ERROR - TO BE REFILED AS DOC # 225 - Motion to consolidate cases filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 223 . (Bunda, Robert) Modified to note error on 10/2/2014 (L,A).
September 26, 2014 Filing 223 Motion to consolidate cases filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, John E. Glasscock, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Robert Laihr, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, Ronald J. Masajlo, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Frank G. Rizzelli, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, John D. Smolarski, Debra Teeter, Steven Thuss, Jill M. Vander Griend, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Sue Wilson, William A. Woodyard, Gerald V. Yahna. (Bunda, Robert)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Scheduling Order on Remand. See Order for deadlines. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/22/2014. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
September 19, 2014 Filing 221 True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Affirming in part and reversing in part the judgment of the District Court re # 215 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 13-4340). Date issued as mandate 9/19/14, Costs: None (H,SP)
August 21, 2014 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Jack Zouhary. Telephone Conference held on 8/21/14 re status of case. Counsel granted until 9/4/14 to submit a proposed case schedule upon remand. (15 min) (S,Na)
August 19, 2014 NOTICE [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 8/21/14 at 12:45 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
August 15, 2014 Filing 220 True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Dismissing for lack of jurisdiction the plaintiffs' interlocutory appeal re # 174 (USCA# 13-3357). Date issued as mandate 8/14/14, Costs: None (H,SP)
August 4, 2014 Filing 219 Plaintiff's (Dolan) Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Plaintiff Barney Dolan. (Machin, Barbara)
May 19, 2014 Filing 217 Appellant Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 261(b) filed by Mark Walters. (Machin, Barbara)
November 15, 2013 Filing 216 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of # 215 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 13-4340). Date filed in USCA 11/13/13. (H,SP)
November 6, 2013 Filing 215 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the # 212 Memorandum Opinion and Order of 10/9/13, filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, John E. Glasscock, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Robert Laihr, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, Ronald J. Masajlo, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Frank G. Rizzelli, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, John D. Smolarski, Debra Teeter, Steven Thuss, Jill M. Vander Griend, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Sue Wilson, William A. Woodyard, Gerald V. Yahna. (Filing fee of $455 paid, receipt number 0647-6265241) (Bunda, Robert). Modified text on 11/7/2013 (H,SP).
October 9, 2013 Filing 214 Judgment Entry: This Court having contemporaneously filed its Memorandum Opinion and Order ( # 212 in 3:12 CV 470), orders Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ( # 203 in 3:12 CV 470) is granted. No other claims remaining, this Court enters final judgment for Defendant and orders this case dismissed. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/9/2013. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
October 9, 2013 Filing 213 Marginal Entry Order denying as moot ( # 210 in 3:12 CV 470) Motion for Extension of Time. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/9/2013. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
October 9, 2013 Filing 212 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ( # 203 in 3:12 CV 470) and entering final judgment in favor of Defendant. Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert ( # 205 in 3:12 CV 470) is also granted. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/9/2013. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
October 4, 2013 Filing 211 Opposition to # 210 Motion for extension of time until October 11, 2013 to Opt-in Plaintiff Michael L. Williams to Respond to Court Order Compelling Discovery filed by KeHE Distributors. (Lewis, Matthew)
October 4, 2013 Filing 210 Motion for extension of time until October 11, 2013 to Opt-in Plaintiff Michael L. Williams to Respond to Court Order Compelling Discovery filed by Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Anthony J. Basnec, Jeffrey Beede, Donald Burk, Kenneth E. Cantwell, Jamie Cranmer, Earl P. Crowe, Barney Dolan, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster, Benjamin L. Frazier, John E. Glasscock, Brion P. Haley, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara A. Keller, Thomas E Killion, Robert Laihr, Nathaniel P. Leighton, Charles L. Mallouf, Ronald J. Masajlo, William Todman Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey B. Monn, Thomas B. Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr, Daryl Paladino, Edward M. Palmer, Allan Parse, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Frank G. Rizzelli, Jeffrey F. Rogers, Steven R. Savage, Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr, John D. Smolarski, Debra Teeter, Steven Thuss, Jill M. Vander Griend, Denis K. Vorhees, Peter H. Waddell, Todd A. Wagner, Mark Walters, Francis T. Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael L. Williams, Sue Wilson, William A. Woodyard, Gerald V. Yahna. (Machin, Barbara)
September 27, 2013 Filing 209 Reply to response to # 205 Motion to strike expert report filed by KeHE Distributors. (Lewis, Matthew)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER re discovery dispute. Given length of time Williams has had to respond to discovery requests, and with no explanation for his failure to respond, Court requires him to respond to discovery requests by 10/4/13. Failure to do so will result in a dismissal of his claim without prejudice. Counsel for Plaintiffs are instructed to serve a copy of this Order by e-mail, hand delivery and/or certified mail. Phone conference set for 9/19/13 to discuss dispute is no longer needed and is vacated. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/18/13. (S,Na)
September 17, 2013 Filing 207 Opposition to # 205 Motion to strike expert report of Karen Dulaney Smith filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bunda, Robert)
September 10, 2013 Filing 206 Reply to response to # 203 Motion for summary judgment filed by KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Designation of Cited Materials)(Lewis, Matthew)
September 10, 2013 Filing 205 Motion to strike expert report filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. Related document(s) # 197 . (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit Unreported Decisions)(Lewis, Matthew)
August 30, 2013 Filing 204 Opposition to # 203 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 - Exhibits to Depositions, # 2 Appendix 2 - Report of Karen Delaney Smith, # 3 Appendix 3 - Affidavit of Marvin Huizinga, # 4 Appendix 4 - Affidavit of Todd A. Wagner, # 5 Appendix 5 - Affidavit of Earl P. Crowe, # 6 Appendix 6 - Email from Jon Rosemeyer, # 7 Appendix 7 - DOL letter and Compliance Action Report, # 8 Appendix 8 - 29 C.F.R. Sec. 541.504) (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 9/4/2013 (M,L).
August 15, 2013 Filing 203 Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Memorandum of Law, # 2 Appendix of Attachments, # 3 Tab 1 - Dept. of Labor, Wage and Hour Division, Report and Recommendations on Proposed Revisions of Regulations, Part 541 (1949) (the 1949 Weiss Report), # 4 Tab 2 - Declaration of Mark Walsh in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Tab 3 - Deposition of Scott Leannais (July 12, 2013), # 6 Tab 4 - Deposition of David Bawulski (July 11, 2013), # 7 Tab 5 - Deposition and Cited Exhibits of Anthony Basnec (July 23, 2013), # 8 Tab 6 - Deposition and Cited Exhibits of Brion Haley (July 25, 2013), # 9 Tab 7 - Deposition and Cited Exhibits of Marvin Huizinga (July 22, 2013), # 10 Tab 8 - Deposition and Cited Exhibits of Frank Rizzelli (July 29, 2013), # 11 Tab 9 - Deposition and Cited Exhibits of Todd Wagner (July 22, 2013), # 12 Tab 10 - Deposition and Cited Exhibits of Thomas Killion (July 19, 2013), # 13 Tab 11 - Deposition and Cited Exhibits of Carl Ovall, Jr. (July 25, 2013), # 14 Tab 12 - Deposition and Cited Exhibits of Kenneth Cantwell (July 23, 2013), # 15 Tab 13 - Deposition and Cited Exhibits of Charles Mallouf (July 24, 2013), # 16 Tab 14 - Brion Haley MidYear Performance Review (Feb. 3, 2009), # 17 Tab 15 - Carl Ovall, Jr. MidYear Performance Review (Feb. 3, 2009))(Lewis, Matthew) Modified on 8/22/2013 (M,L).
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Order. Status Phone Conference held on 8/6/2013. In the interest of judicial economy and efficiency, Case Nos. 12 CV 470 and 12 CV 1585 are consolidated with Case No. 12 CV 2861, Case No. 12 CV 470 being the lead case and all documents shall be filed under that case. Defendant shall file its brief by 8/15/2013; Plaintiffs shall respond by 8/30/2013, Defendant may reply by 9/10/2013. See order for other details. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/7/2013. (15 min)Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ, 3:12-cv-02861-JZ(D,L)
August 5, 2013 NOTICE [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 8/6/13 at 3:30 PM (EDT) before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
July 18, 2013 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Jack Zouhary. At request of counsel, Telephone Conference held on 7/18/13 re discovery dispute. (15 min) (S,Na)
July 17, 2013 NOTICE [non-document] of Telephone Conference re discovery dispute set for 7/18/13 at 11:30 AM (EDT) before Judge Jack Zouhary. (S,Na)
July 16, 2013 Filing 201 Notice of Service of Request for Admission filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
July 10, 2013 Filing 200 Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Join as to John E. Glasscock filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 7/19/2013 to edit text (B,TM).
July 8, 2013 Filing 199 Stipulation & Order re # 198 (in 3:12 CV 470) Stipulated Discovery Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/8/2013. (D,L)
July 3, 2013 Filing 198 Proposed Order Confirming Discovery Procedure (Stipulated) filed by KeHE Distributors. (Lewis, Matthew)
July 1, 2013 Filing 197 Initial Disclosures of Liability Expert Karen Dulaney Smith filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Report of Karen Dulaney Smith)(Machin, Barbara)
June 27, 2013 Filing 196 Notice to take Deposition of Scott Leannais on July 12, 2013 at 9:00 am filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
June 27, 2013 Filing 195 Notice to take Deposition of David Bawulski on July 11, 2013 at 9:00 am filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
June 26, 2013 Filing 194 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Christine Hodson's Response to Request for Admission filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
June 24, 2013 Filing 193 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Frank G. Rizzelli's Responses to Requests for Production filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
June 19, 2013 Filing 192 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Vicky Weaver's Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
June 19, 2013 Filing 191 Notice of Service of Request for Admission to Christine Hodson filed by Kehe Food Distributor's Inc.. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ(Wagoner, Mark)
June 18, 2013 Filing 190 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Jeffrey Monn's Answers to Interrogatories filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
June 11, 2013 Filing 189 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Vicky Weaver's Answers to Interrogatories filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
June 10, 2013 Filing 188 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Frank Rizzelli's Answers to Interrogatories and Jeffrey Monn's Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
May 28, 2013 Filing 187 Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents of Plaintiff Alan Parse filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
May 13, 2013 Filing 186 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Thomas Schlaegel's Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
May 6, 2013 Filing 185 Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Join of Ronald J. Masajlo's filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 5/8/2013 to edit text (B,TM).
April 29, 2013 Filing 184 Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents of Todd Miles filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sechrist, Rebecca)
April 24, 2013 Filing 183 Notice of Filing Parties' Draft Collective Action Notices With Trial Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's draft proposal, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's draft proposal, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Correspondence from Plaintiff, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence from Defendant)(Machin, Barbara)
April 23, 2013 Filing 182 Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents of Jamie Cranmer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
April 22, 2013 Filing 181 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Alan Keel's Responses to Requests for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
April 16, 2013 Appeal Fee in the amount $455.00 received from Bunda, Stutz & Dewitt. Receipt# 34660007588 (Related document(s) # 174 ) (B,TM). Modified text on 4/16/2013 (H,SP).
April 11, 2013 Filing 180 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
April 8, 2013 Filing 179 Notice of Service of Plaintiff John Glasscock's Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
April 5, 2013 Filing 178 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents of Robert Planitzer and Marvin Huizinga filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
April 2, 2013 Filing 177 Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Join action by Sue Wilson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 4/4/2013 to edit text (B,TM).
April 1, 2013 Filing 176 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Christopher Ricevuto's Answers to Interrogatories and Plaintiff jeffrey Beede's Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
April 1, 2013 Filing 175 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of # 174 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 13-3357). Date filed in USCA 3/28/13. (H,SP)
March 18, 2013 Filing 173 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
March 12, 2013 Filing 172 Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Join filed by Eric Pogachar, and William A. Woodyard. (Sechrist, Rebecca) Modified on 3/13/2013 to edit text (B,TM).
March 8, 2013 Filing 171 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Requests for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
March 6, 2013 Filing 170 Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/6/2013. (D,L)
March 5, 2013 Filing 169 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by KeHE Distributors. Related document(s) # 102 . (Lewis, Matthew) Modified on 3/11/2013 (B,TM).
March 4, 2013 Filing 168 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sechrist, Rebecca)
February 28, 2013 Filing 167 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sechrist, Rebecca)
February 27, 2013 Filing 166 Marginal Entry Order granting # 165 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Matthew W. Lewis for KeHE Distributors. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/27/13. (Attachments: # 1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L)
February 26, 2013 Filing 165 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew W. Lewis Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-5853013, filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Matthew W. Lewis)(Wagoner, Mark) Modified text on 2/27/2013 (G,CA).
February 26, 2013 Filing 164 Notice of Withdrawal of attorney Jonathon Rosemeyer filed by KeHE Distributors. (Wagoner, Mark) Modified on 3/1/2013 to edit text (B,TM).
February 26, 2013 Filing 163 Answer to # 160 Amended complaint with Jury Demand filed by KeHE Distributors. (Stack, Nicholas)
February 26, 2013 Filing 162 Declaration of Untimely Filing of Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Due to Technical Difficulties filed by KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, # 2 Exhibit Error Message, # 3 Exhibit Error Message, # 4 Exhibit E-mail to Court and Counsel)Related document(s) # 160 .(Stack, Nicholas)
February 22, 2013 Filing 161 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Requests for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
February 6, 2013 Filing 160 First Amended complaint with Jury Demand against KeHE Distributors and adding new party plaintiff(s) Earl Allman, Ron Anderson, Jeffrey Beede, Donald Burk, Kenneth Cantwell, Jamie Cranmer, Earl Crowe, Patricia Dorsey, Mearl Doster for the Estate of Mary Jo Doster, Benjamin Frazer, John Glasscock, Leonard Hegna, Christine Hodson, Marvin J. Huizinga, Alan Keel, Barbara Keller, Robert Laihr, Nathaniel Leighton, Charles Mallouf, Ronald Masajlo, William T. Mentzer, Todd Miles, Jeffrey Monn, Thomas Moore, Michael O'Neill, Carl Ovall, Jr., Daryl Paladino, Edward Palmer, Allan Parse, Laura Pica, Robert Planitzer, Eric Pogachar, Christopher Ricevuto, Frank Rizzelli, Jeffrey Rogers, Steven Savage, Thomas Schlaegel, Sr., John Smolarski, Debra Teeter, Steven Thuss, Jill Vander Griend, Denis Vorhees, Peter Waddell, Todd Wagner, Francis Washell, Vicki Weaver, Michael Williams, Sue Wilson, William Woodyard, Gerald Yahna. Filed by Mark Walters, Thomas E Killion, Brion P. Haley, Barney Dolan. (Machin, Barbara)
January 30, 2013 Filing 159 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of John E. Glasscock filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Envelope postmarked 1/23/2013)(Machin, Barbara)
January 29, 2013 Filing 158 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Court adopts Joint Proposed Amended Scheduling Order as follows: Liability experts and reports due 7/1/13; Discovery cutoff (liability) due 7/19/13; Dispositive motions (liability) due 8/9/13; Responses to dispositive motions due 8/23/13; Reply briefs to dispositive motions due 8/30/13; Defendant's Motion to Decertify due 10/18/13; Plaintiffs' response to Motion to Decertify due 11/1/13; Defendant's Reply due 11/8/13; Damages experts and reports due 12/16/13; Expert discovery cutoff 1/17/14; Jury Trial 2/24/14. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/29/13. (S,Na)
January 28, 2013 Filing 157 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Debra Teeter filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Envelope postmarked 1/23/2013)(Machin, Barbara)
January 24, 2013 Filing 156 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 24, 2013 Filing 155 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Allan Parse filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 24, 2013 Filing 154 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Todd Miles filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 24, 2013 Filing 153 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Jamie Cranmer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 24, 2013 Filing 152 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Jeffrey B. Monn filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 24, 2013 Filing 151 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Jill M. Vander Griend filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER. Status Phone Conference held on 1/23/13. Parties shall file a joint proposed amended case schedule, with a trial month no later than February 2014 for this Court's review and approval. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/24/13. (S,Na)
January 24, 2013 Filing 149 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Michael L. Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 24, 2013 Filing 148 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of John M. Smolarski filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 24, 2013 Filing 147 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Ronald J. Masajlo filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 23, 2013 Filing 146 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S. C. Section 216(b) of Frank G. Rizzelli filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 23, 2013 Filing 145 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Alan R. Keel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 23, 2013 Filing 144 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Daryl Paladino filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 22, 2013 Filing 143 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Michael O'Neill filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 22, 2013 Filing 142 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Ron Anderson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 21, 2013 Filing 141 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29.S.C.Section 216(b) of Steven R. Savage filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 21, 2013 Filing 140 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Steven R. Thuss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 17, 2013 Filing 139 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Edward M. Palmer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 17, 2013 Filing 138 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C.Section 216(b) of Leonard Hegna filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 17, 2013 Filing 137 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Marvin Huizinga filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 16, 2013 Filing 136 Consent to Join Collective Action by Nathaniel Leighton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 16, 2013 Filing 135 Consent to Join in Collective Action by Thomas Moore filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 16, 2013 NOTICE [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 1/23/13 at 10:15 AM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
January 11, 2013 Filing 134 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Earl Allman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 10, 2013 Filing 133 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Jeffrey Beede filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 10, 2013 Filing 132 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Mearl L. Doster filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 9, 2013 Filing 131 Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 9, 2013 Filing 130 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Donald Burk filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 8, 2013 Filing 129 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Jeffrey F. Rogers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 7, 2013 Filing 128 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Patricia Dorsey filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 2, 2013 Filing 127 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Eric Pogachar filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
January 2, 2013 Filing 126 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Laura A. Pica filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 27, 2012 Filing 125 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Francis T. Washell filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 27, 2012 Filing 124 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Robert Planitzer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 21, 2012 Filing 174 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the # 115 Order denying Motion for reconsideration. Filing fee paid 4/16/13, receipt# 34660007588. Pursuant to the Order (attached) the Petition for Permission to Appeal originally docketed in the Sixth Circuit is now entered as a Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Court of Appeals Order dated 3/18/2013) (D,L). Modified on 3/21/2013 (D,L). Modified text on 3/21/2013 (H,SP). Modified on 4/16/2013 for fee payment (H,SP).
December 20, 2012 Filing 123 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Peter H. Waddell filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 20, 2012 Filing 122 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Vicki Weaver filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 20, 2012 Filing 121 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Benjamin L. Frazer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 20, 2012 Filing 120 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Earl P. Crowe filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 20, 2012 Filing 119 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Robert Laihr filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 20, 2012 Filing 118 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of Christopher Ricevuto filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 20, 2012 Filing 117 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) of William A. Woodyard filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 19, 2012 Filing 116 Consent to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) by Sue Wilson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order denying # 106 Motion for reconsideration. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/7/12.(D,L)
November 27, 2012 Filing 114 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Reconsideration filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 113 . (Machin, Barbara)
November 26, 2012 Filing 113 Opposition to # 106 Motion for reconsideration of Order Enforcing Collective Action Waiver filed by KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rosemeyer, Jonathan)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Order. Having reviewed proposed notice documents submitted by Plaintiffs with suggested revisions by Defendant, this Court approves the attached documents for providing notice to the putative opt-in class. Responses must be received within 45 days of mailing in order to be considered. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/21/12. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Collective Action, # 2 Consent to Join, # 3 Contact Information)(D,L)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Order denying # 105 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Toll the Statute of Limitations. Plaintiffs' Motion is not well taken and is denied without prejudice. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/21/12.(D,L)
November 15, 2012 Filing 110 Notice of concurrence in the motion for reconsideration of order enforcing waiver filed by Barney Dolan, Mark Walters. Related document(s) # 106 . (Morgan, Kerry) Modified on 11/21/2012 to term incorrect motion and to edit text (B,TM).
November 15, 2012 Filing 109 Notice of concurrence in the renewed motion to toll the statutes of limitation filed by Barney Dolan, Mark Walters. Related document(s) # 105 . (Morgan, Kerry) Modified on 11/21/2012 to edit text and to correct event, NEF regenrated (B,TM).
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER. Status Phone Conference held on 11/13/12. Defendant's e-mail response to Plaintiffs' letter of 11/9/12 due by 11/15/12; no replies. Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration # 106 due by 11/26/12. No Reply shall be filed in response to Defendant's Opposition # 107 to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Toll Statute of Limitations # 105 . (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/14/12. (S,Na)
November 12, 2012 Filing 107 Opposition to Plaintiffs' # 105 Renewed Motion to Toll the Statute of Limitations filed by KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rosemeyer, Jonathan) Modified on 11/13/2012 (G,Di).
November 9, 2012 Filing 106 Motion for reconsideration of Order Enforcing Collective Action Waiver filed by Barney Dolan, Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion, Mark Walters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Horton, et al vs. NLRB)(Bunda, Robert)
November 5, 2012 Filing 105 Renewed Motion to Toll the Statute of Limitations filed by Barney Dolan, Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion, Mark Walters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Abadeer v. Tyson Foods, # 2 Exhibit Yahraes v. Restaurant Assoc.)(Bunda, Robert) Modified on 11/7/2012 (G,Di).
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting # 98 Motion for class certification. Because Plaintiffs have established a colorable basis that they are similarly situated to the putative class of KeHE sales representatives, Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify the Collective Action # 98 is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery from KeHE is also granted. KeHE to provide Plaintiffs' counsel with names and contact information for all individuals who have been employed as sales representatives in the Great Lakes Region since 3/1/09, for purposes of giving notice to potential opt-in plaintiffs. Parties further ordered to confer and submit a joint-proposed notice document and proposed opt-in schedule by 11/9/12. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/31/12.(D,L) Modified on 11/1/2012 to edit text and change document type (G,D).
September 27, 2012 Filing 103 Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Conditional Certification of a Collective Action Under Sec. 216(b) of the FLSA filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Plaintiffs' payroll registers, # 2 Appendix Troy, et al Court Order) (Related Document # 98 ) (Bunda, Robert) Modified on 10/2/2012 to create linkage to motion (G,Di).
September 25, 2012 Filing 102 Stipulated Protective Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/25/12. (D,L)
September 24, 2012 Filing 101 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Barney Dolan, Brion P. Haley, KeHE Distributors, Thomas E Killion, Mark Walters, Barney Dolan, Kehe Food Distributor's Inc., Mark Walters. (Rosemeyer, Jonathan) Modified on 9/25/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
September 21, 2012 Filing 100 Opposition to # 98 Motion for class certification , Approve Discovery Of And Notice To Putative Class filed by KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Mark Walsh, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of John Skladd, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Glenn Karlowicz, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of James Gillette, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Griselda Rodriguez, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Unpublished Cases Cited in Defendant KeHE's Opposition)(Rosemeyer, Jonathan)
August 31, 2012 Filing 99 Notice of concurrences to Motion for class certification filed by Barney Dolan, Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion, Mark Walters. Related document(s) # 98 . (Morgan, Kerry) Modified on 9/5/2012 to edit text and to term incorrect filed motion (B,TM).
August 31, 2012 Filing 98 Motion for class certification, approved discovery of and notice to putative class filed by Barney Dolan, Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion, Mark Walters. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Affidavits of plaintiffs, # 2 Appendix Statements, # 3 Appendix Case Law)(Bunda, Robert) Modified on 9/5/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. At request of counsel, Phone Conference held on 8/21/12. Court reviewed discovery dispute between parties. Counsel will continue to discuss specifics and try to resolve any remaining issues. Counsel agreed on following briefing schedule for conditional class certification: 8/31/12 Motion with supporting brief; 9/21/12 Response; 10/1/12 Reply. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/21/12. (S,Na)
August 20, 2012 Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference re discovery dispute set for 8/21/12 at 2:30 PM (EDT) before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATION. Request for Certification for an Interlocutory Appeal is denied. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/13/12. (S,Na)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. Record Hearing (via phone) held on 8/9/12 (Court Reporter: Tracy Spore). Court reviewed Plaintiffs' Request for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal # 92 and invited additional briefing. Court also reviewed discovery dispute. Defendant is providing Plaintiffs with additional responses to pending discovery requests. Counsel agree Motion for Conditional Class Certification should be addressed next, and that the issue of exemption should be handled later in the case schedule. Counsel should submit a proposed briefing schedule for class certification. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/13/12. (S,Na)
August 9, 2012 Filing 94 Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) Certification for Interlocutory Appeal filed by KeHE Distributors. Related document(s) # 92 . (Rosemeyer, Jonathan)
August 9, 2012 Filing 93 Brief Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Certifying Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bunda, Robert)
August 8, 2012 Filing 92 Plaintiffs' Request for 28 U.S.C. Sec.1292(b) Certification for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Bunda, Robert)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order dismissing without prejudice Plaintiffs' Motion for class certification (Related Doc # 38 ) Telephone Conference set for 8/9/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/3/12.(R,Ci)
August 3, 2012 Filing 90 Memorandum Opinion and Order that plaintiffs' motion to void [doc #5] (12cv1585) is denied and KeHE's Motion to strike [doc #70] (12cv470) is granted. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/3/12. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00470-JZ, 3:12-cv-01585-JZ(R,Ci)
July 30, 2012 Filing 89 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Kerry L. Morgan Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # 87 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/30/12. (Attachments: # 1 ACTL Code) (C,D) Modified on 8/2/2012 to correct attorney name (B,TM).
July 30, 2012 Filing 88 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Randall Pentiuk Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # 85 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/30/12. (C,D) Modified on 8/2/2012 to correct attorney name (B,TM).
July 30, 2012 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Jack Zouhary.Status phone calls held on 7/27/12 re pending Motions (Court Reporter: Tracy Spore). (1 hr) (S,Na)
July 26, 2012 NOTICE [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 7/27/12 at 9:00 AM (NOT 9:30 AM) before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel instructed to call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
July 18, 2012 Filing 87 Motion for attorney Kerry L. Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-5470961, filed by Barney Dolan, Mark Walters. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kerry L. Morgan, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 7/19/2012 (G,Di).
July 18, 2012 Filing 86 Supplement to Motion to Admit Randall A. Pentiuk Pro hac Vice filed by Barney Dolan, Mark Walters. Related document(s) # 85 . (Attachments: # 1 Supplement - Certificate of Good Standing)(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 7/19/2012 (G,Di).
July 16, 2012 Filing 85 Motion for attorney Randall A. Pentiuk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-5465530, filed by Barney Dolan, Mark Walters. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Randall Pentiuk, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 7/17/2012 (G,Di).
July 16, 2012 Filing 84 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Hodson's Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production filed by Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion. (Machin, Barbara)
July 12, 2012 Filing 83 Affidavit/Declaration of Christine Hodson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
July 12, 2012 Filing 82 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Hodson's Discovery Responses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
July 5, 2012 Notice to Attorney Randall A. Pentiuk. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Notice sent to attorney by U.S. Mail on 7/5/2012 (P,G)
July 5, 2012 Notice to Attorney Kerry L. Morgan. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Notice sent to attorney by U.S. Mail on 7/5/2012. (P,G)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order : Status Conference held on 6/29/12 Time: 45 Minutes. Pursuant to agreement of counsel, and in the interest of judicial economy and efficiency, Case Nos. 12 CV 470 and 12 CV 1585 are consolidated. ALL DOCUMENTS SHALL BE FILED UNDER CASE 12CV470. Telephone Conference set for 7/27/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 209 before Judge Jack Zouhary. See order for full details. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/29/12. (C,D)
June 29, 2012 Filing 80 Response to Court's Order of June 25, 2012 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Defendant's Responses to Discovery Requests, # 2 Appendix KeHE New Compensation Plan) (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 7/3/2012 to edit text and event (B,TM).
June 28, 2012 Filing 79 Reply in support of # 70 Motion to strike consent to opt into action filed by KeHE Distributors. (Rosemeyer, Jonathan) Modified on 6/29/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
June 28, 2012 Filing 78 Marginal Entry Order granting # 76 Motion to Extend Deadlines for an additional two weeks, until July 12, 2012, to respond to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/28/12.(C,D)
June 28, 2012 Filing 77 Supplemental Brief Addressing Christopher v. Smithkline Beecham Corp. filed by KeHE Distributors. (Rosemeyer, Jonathan)
June 28, 2012 Filing 76 Motion for extension of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Discovery Requests until July 12, 2012 filed by Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion. (Machin, Barbara)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re Plaintiffs' motion to conditionally certify collective class action # 38 . After reviewing briefs and recent Supreme Court case, further briefing is required ahead of phone status set for 6/29/12. See attached Order for a summary and questions to be answered by counsel, succinctly and in written responses, prior to the phone status. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/25/12. (S,Na)
June 21, 2012 Filing 74 Opposition to # 70 Motion to strike consent to opt into action filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Raniere vs. Citigroup, # 2 Appendix Release Agreement of DenisVorhees)(Bunda, Robert)
June 20, 2012 Filing 73 Notice of Service of Answers and Discovery Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 6/21/2012 to edit text and to note no certificate of service attached (B,TM).
June 20, 2012 Filing 72 Affidavit/Declaration of Charles "Chuck" Louis Mallouf filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
June 18, 2012 Filing 71 Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Consent to opt into action filed by KeHE Distributors. Related document(s) # 70 . (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Mike Petroff, # 3 Exhibit 2- Unpublished Cases Cited in Defendant KeHE's Memorandum) (Rosemeyer, Jonathan) Modified on 6/19/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
June 18, 2012 Filing 70 Motion to strike consent to opt into action filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Rosemeyer, Jonathan) Modified on 6/19/2012 (B,TM).
June 18, 2012 Filing 69 Affidavit/Declaration of Kenneth Edward Cantwell filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
June 11, 2012 Filing 68 Reply Brief in support of Conditional Certification of a Collective Action under Section 216(b) of the FLSA, Equitable Tolling and Notice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 6/13/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
June 6, 2012 Filing 67 Marginal Entry Order granting # 66 Motion for Extension of Time re # 66 until June 20, 2012 to answer interrogatories and request for production. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/6/12.(C,D)
June 6, 2012 Filing 66 Motion for extension of time until June 20, 2012 to answer interrogatories and request for production filed by Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion. (Machin, Barbara)
June 6, 2012 Filing 65 Notice of Service of Responses to Discovery Requests of Denis Vorhees filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 6/7/2012 to note no certificate of service attached,, filer notified (B,TM).
June 6, 2012 Filing 64 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 6/7/2012 to note no certficate of service attached, filer notified (B,TM).
June 6, 2012 Filing 63 Affidavit/Declaration of Anthony J. Basnec filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter, Separation and Release Agreement)(Machin, Barbara)
June 5, 2012 Filing 62 Opposition to # 38 Motion for class certification to approve notice to discovery of putative class members and toll the statutes of limtations filed by KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Mark Walsh, # 3 Exhibit 2- Declaration of James "Jim" Gillette, # 4 Exhibit 3- Declaration of Glenn Karlowicz, # 5 Exhibit 4- Declaration of John "Jack" Skladd, # 6 Exhibit 5- Unpublished decisions cited in Defendant's Response) (Rosemeyer, Jonathan) Modified on 6/7/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order granting Motion for leave to file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Class in excess of fifteen pages (Related Doc # 59 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/5/12.(C,D)
June 5, 2012 Filing 60 Memorandum Opinion and Order : Although both Motions are denied (Re: # 36 , # 41 ) Killion and Ovall may continue to take part in the collective action against KeHE. As explained above, this result follows from KeHE's acceptance of Killion and Ovall's amendment to their respective Agreements. As for Haley, KeHE did not accept his changes and his bonus claim must fail. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/5/12. (C,D)
June 4, 2012 Filing 59 Unopposed Motion for leave to file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Class in excess of fifteen pages filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosemeyer, Jonathan)
May 31, 2012 Filing 58 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Section 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
May 29, 2012 Filing 57 Notice of Service of Discovery on Plaintiff filed by KeHE Distributors. (Rosemeyer, Jonathan) Modified on 5/30/2012 to note no certificate of service attached, filer notified (B,TM).
May 22, 2012 Filing 56 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Section 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order granting # 54 Motion for extension of time until June 5, 2012 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/22/2012.(G,D)
May 21, 2012 Filing 54 Motion for extension of time until June 5, 2012 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. Related document(s) # 38 . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagoner, Mark)
May 17, 2012 Filing 53 Notice of Service of Discovery on Plaintiffs filed by KeHE Distributors. (Rosemeyer, Jonathan)
May 15, 2012 Filing 52 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Section 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
May 11, 2012 Filing 51 Reply Brief in support of Voiding Release of FLSA Rights filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 36 and # 46 . (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 - Raniere, et al. v. Citigroup, # 2 Appendix 2 - Sutherland v. Ernst & Young) (Bunda, Robert) Modified on 5/16/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
May 8, 2012 Filing 50 Notice of Service of Discovery on Plaintiffs filed by KeHE Distributors. (Rosemeyer, Jonathan)
May 8, 2012 Filing 49 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures on Plaintiffs filed by KeHE Distributors. (Rosemeyer, Jonathan)
May 8, 2012 Filing 48 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Section 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
May 7, 2012 Filing 47 Notice of Service of Discovery on Plaintiffs filed by KeHE Distributors. (Rosemeyer, Jonathan)
May 4, 2012 Filing 46 Response in Opposition to plaintiffs # 36 Motion for an Order that defendants release from potential class action are void as a matter of law filed by KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Griselda Rodriguez, # 2 Exhibit 2- Unreported Decisions Cited in Defendant's Response)(Rosemeyer, Jonathan) Modified on 5/7/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
May 4, 2012 Filing 45 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. CMC held on 5/4/12. Case is assigned to the Complex track. Trial to be held by December 2013 or sooner. Briefing Schedule: Motion to Void Release of FLSA rights due 4/23/12; Defendant's Response due 5/4/12; Plaintiffs' Reply due 5/11/12. Motion to Conditionally Certify Collection Action due 4/23/12; Defendant's Response due 5/29/12; Plaintiffs' Reply due 6/12/12. Rule 26(a) disclosures have been started and document exchange is ongoing. Discovery cut-off dates: Liability due 12/3/12; Damages due 1/3/13. Deadline for amending pleadings/adding parties: A minimum of 30 days following the deadline for putative class members to return the Consent to Join as members of the collective class. Exact date to be determined later. Telephone status set for 6/29/12 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel to call Chambers to obtain District Court conference line and advise who will be attending the conference. (1 hr) Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/4/12. (S,Na)
May 4, 2012 Filing 44 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission on Defendant filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
May 4, 2012 Filing 43 Attorney Appearance by Nicholas T. Stack filed by on behalf of KeHE Distributors. (Stack, Nicholas)
April 27, 2012 Filing 42 Affidavit/Declaration of Brion P. Haley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Machin, Barbara)
April 27, 2012 Filing 41 Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Find Defendant's Releases Void as to FLSA Claims filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
April 27, 2012 Filing 40 Initial Disclosures Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a) Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
April 23, 2012 Filing 39 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Parties. (Machin, Barbara)
April 23, 2012 Filing 38 Motion to conditionally certify collective class action, approve notice and discovery of putative class members and toll the statutes of limitation, filed by Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Conditional Class Certificate)(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 4/24/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
April 23, 2012 Filing 37 Brief in Support of # 36 Motion for Order filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 36 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Termination, # 2 Exhibit District Crt Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Order certifying classes) (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 4/24/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
April 23, 2012 Filing 36 Motion for Order that defendants release from potential collective action plaintiffs are void as a matter of law filed by Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 4/24/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
April 12, 2012 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KeHE Distributors. (Wagoner, Mark)
April 12, 2012 Filing 34 Answer to # 1 Complaint filed by KeHE Distributors. (Wagoner, Mark)
April 12, 2012 Filing 33 Affidavit/Declaration of Denis Keith Vorhees filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bunda, Robert)
April 10, 2012 Filing 32 Marginal Entry Order granting # 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. KeHE Distributors answer due 4/12/2012. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/10/12.(C,D)
April 6, 2012 Filing 31 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Sec.216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
March 30, 2012 Filing 30 Affidavit/Declaration of Gerald V. Yahna filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
March 30, 2012 Filing 29 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice with case management conference to be held on 5/4/2012 at 10:00 AM at Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. (C,D)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order granting Motion to withdraw as attorney, attorney Peter R. Silverman removed from case. (Related Doc # 26 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/30/2012.(C,D)
March 29, 2012 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Jack Zouhary.Status Conference held on 3/29/12. Time: 15 minutes. (C,D)
March 29, 2012 Filing 27 Affidavit/Declaration of Barbara A. Keller filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
March 29, 2012 Filing 26 Motion to withdraw Peter R. Silverman as attorney filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagoner, Mark) Modified on 3/30/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
March 29, 2012 Filing 25 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Sec.216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
March 27, 2012 Filing 24 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Sec. 216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
March 27, 2012 Filing 23 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jonathan E. Rosemeyer for KeHE Distributors. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # 21 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/27/12. (Attachments: # 1 ACTL Code)(C,D)
March 27, 2012 Filing 22 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Cardelle B. Spangler for KeHE Distributors. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # 20 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/27/12. (Attachments: # 1 ACTL Code)(C,D)
March 26, 2012 Filing 21 Motion for attorney Jonathan E. Rosemeyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-5259736, filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Wagoner, Mark)
March 26, 2012 Filing 20 Motion for attorney Cardelle B. Spangler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-5259700, filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Wagoner, Mark)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order : This Court will hold a phone conference on Thursday, March 29, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss preparation by counsel of the Report of Parties (attached) in advance of a Case Management Conference. In the meantime, the currently pending Motions (Docs. # 8 & # 16 ) are dismissed without prejudice and will also be discussed during the phone conference. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/26/12. (Attachments: # 1 Report of Parties form) The Court will initiate the call.(C,D)
March 23, 2012 Filing 18 Motion for extension of time until April 12, 2012 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant KeHE Distributors. Related document(s) # 1 . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagoner, Mark)
March 8, 2012 Filing 17 Affidavit/Declaration of William Todman Mentzer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
March 7, 2012 Filing 16 Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Class Under 29 USC Section 216(b), Approve Notice and Order Discovery of Putative Class filed by Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix #1)(Machin, Barbara) Modified on 3/9/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
March 7, 2012 Filing 15 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon KeHE Distributors on 3/2/2012 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 3/9/2012 to edit text (B,TM).
March 7, 2012 Filing 14 Affidavit/Declaration of Todd Alan Wagner filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
March 7, 2012 Filing 13 Affidavit/Declaration of Carl Ovall, Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Machin, Barbara)
March 7, 2012 Filing 12 Affidavit/Declaration of Brion P. Haley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Machin, Barbara)
March 5, 2012 Filing 11 INCOMPLETE. Return of Service by certified mail executed upon KeHE Distributors on 3/2/2012, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara) Modified on 3/7/2012 to note first signed and sealed page of summons missing, filer notified to refile (B,TM).
March 2, 2012 Filing 10 Affidavit/Declaration of Thomas E. Killion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Machin, Barbara)
March 2, 2012 Filing 9 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order that Defendant's Releases from Potential Collective Action Paintiffs are Void as a Matter of Law filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) # 8 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Bunda, Robert)
March 2, 2012 Filing 8 Motion For an Order That Defendant's Releases from Potential Collective Action Plaintiffs are Void as a Matter of Law filed by Brion P. Haley, Thomas E Killion. (Bunda, Robert)
March 1, 2012 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Sec.216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
February 28, 2012 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Sec.216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
February 28, 2012 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Sec.216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
February 28, 2012 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Sec.216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
February 28, 2012 Filing 3 Plaintiff's Consent to Participate in Collective Action Under 29 USC Sec.216(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Machin, Barbara)
February 28, 2012 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon KeHE Distributors. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
February 28, 2012 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
February 28, 2012 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
February 27, 2012 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against KeHE Distributors. Filing fee paid $ 350, Receipt number 0647-5205954. Filed by Thomas E Killion, Brion P. Haley. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (Machin, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killion, et al. v. KeHE Distributors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Allman
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Anderson
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Basnec
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Beede
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Burk
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth E. Cantwell
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Cranmer
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl P. Crowe
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barney Dolan
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dorsey
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mearl Doster
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin L. Frazier
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Glasscock
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brion P. Haley
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Hegna
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Hodson
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin J. Huizinga
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Keel
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Keller
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Killion
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Laihr
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel P. Leighton
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L. Mallouf
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Masajlo
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Todman Mentzer
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Miles
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey B. Monn
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas B. Moore
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Neill
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Ovall, Jr.
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Paladino
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward M. Palmer
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Parse
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Pica
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Planitzer
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Pogachar
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ricevuto
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank G. Rizzelli
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey F. Rogers
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R. Savage
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Schlaegel, Sr.
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Smolarski
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Teeter
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Thuss
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill M. Vander Griend
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis K. Vorhees
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter H. Waddell
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd A. Wagner
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Walters
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis T. Washell
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Weaver
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Williams
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Wilson
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Woodyard
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald V. Yahna
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill D. Blazak
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Chiu
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Church
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Coleman
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larissa J. Kiper
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Larock
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Philipp
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Rierson
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Roediger
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Ryan
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory R. Simmonds
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amar Sito
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Stimson
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Strong
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Thurman
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally J. Tresnak
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Trylch
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Valentino
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Vanderstelt
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Wolfe
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Zaremba
Represented By: Robert A. Bunda
Represented By: Barbara E. Machin
Represented By: Rebecca Chase Sechrist
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeHE Distributors
Represented By: Matthew W. Lewis
Represented By: Cardelle B. Spangler
Represented By: Nicholas T. Stack
Represented By: Peter R. Silverman
Represented By: Jonathan E. Rosemeyer
Represented By: Mark D. Wagoner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?