Krantz vs Norfolk Southern Railway Company, et al
Plaintiff: Shelley Krantz
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Scott Blizzard and Jarod Hopewell
Case Number: 3:2012cv02517
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Huron
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2013 Filing 20 Stipulated Order of Case Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (re #19 ). Judge James G. Carr on 8/23/13. (C,D)
August 22, 2013 Filing 19 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Shelley Krantz. (Young, David)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Order(non-document): The parties shall file a dismissal entry or status report regarding the progress of settlement discussions on or before 8/23/13. Judge James G. Carr on 8/9/13. (C,D)
August 7, 2013 Filing 18 JERS Order. Judge James G. Carr on 8/7/2013. (G,D)
June 4, 2013 Minutes of proceedings[non-document] before Judge James G. Carr. Conference call held on 6/4/2013 re. Motion for leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim. Motion is decisional Time: 15 min. Related document(s) #14 . (G,D)
June 4, 2013 Filing 17 Reply to response to #14 Motion for leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim of Norfolk Southern Railway Company Instanter and Supporting Grounds filed by Scott Blizzard, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lewis, John)
June 4, 2013 Filing 16 *FILED IN ERROR* Reply to response to #14 Motion for leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim of Norfolk Southern Railway Company Instanter and Supporting Grounds filed by Scott Blizzard, Jarod Hopewell, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lewis, John) Modified on 6/5/2013 to terminate motion (L,A).
May 30, 2013 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference originally set for 5/30/2013 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 6/4/2013 at 10:30 AM before Judge James G. Carr. (G,D)
May 29, 2013 Filing 15 Opposition to #14 Motion for leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim of Norfolk Southern Railway Company Instanter and Supporting Grounds filed by Shelley Krantz. (Young, David)
May 24, 2013 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 5/30/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge James G. Carr. (G,D)
May 15, 2013 Filing 14 Motion for leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim of Norfolk Southern Railway Company Instanter and Supporting Grounds filed by Scott Blizzard, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer of Defendants Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Scott Blizzard and Counterclaim of Norfolk Southern Railway Company)(Lewis, John)
January 23, 2013 Case (non-document) referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II for Settlement. (G,D)
January 23, 2013 Set Deadlines and Hearings Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 3/31/2013, Related document(s) #13 . (G,D)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case Management Order. Case Management Conference held on 1/22/2013. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to exchange Rule 26 disclosures by 3/15/2013. Discovery due by 7/15/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2013; Opposition due 10/1/2013; Reply due 10/15/2013. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 204 before Judge James G. Carr. Voir Dire set for 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 204 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II. Status or initial settlement conference is to be held at request of any party. Final settlement and pretrial conference to be held by Magistrate Judge Knepp during the first full week of January, 2014, at a date and time convenient for the Magistrate Judge, counsel and parties. Counsel to complete mediation or other ADR in time to avoid alteration of the deadlines set herein. Deadline for amending pleadings 3/31/2013. Motion for reconsideration #9 is withdrawn. Judge James G. Carr on 1/23/2013. (Time: 30 min.)(G,D)
January 18, 2013 Filing 12 Motion to strike Plaintiff's Affidavit to the Motion for Reconsideration filed by Scott Blizzard, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lewis, John) Modified on 1/23/2013 to edit text (B,TM).
January 18, 2013 Filing 11 Opposition to #9 Motion for reconsideration filed by Scott Blizzard, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Unreported Cases)(Lewis, John)
January 15, 2013 Filing 10 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Shelley Krantz. (Young, David)
January 11, 2013 Filing 9 Motion for reconsideration of the Order dated 1/7/2013 re Remand filed by Plaintiff Shelley Krantz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Shelley Krantz)(Young, David) Modified on 1/16/2013 to edit text (B,TM).
January 8, 2013 Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Noticer with case management conference to be held on 1/22/2013 at 02:00 PM at Chambers 403 (Toledo) before Judge James G. Carr. Counsel may participate by phone. The Court will iniitated the call to the numbers indicated on the docket unless alternate contact information is provided. Judge James G. Carr on 1/8/13. (C,D)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc #5 ) is overruled. The Clerk shall schedule a case management conference. Judge James G. Carr on 1/7/2013.(G,D)
November 21, 2012 Filing 6 Opposition to #5 Motion to remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unreported Cases in Alphabetical Order)(Lewis, John)
November 8, 2012 Filing 5 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Shelley Krantz. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Caselaw)(Young, David)
October 15, 2012 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Scott Blizzard, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lewis, John)
October 9, 2012 Filing 3 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 . (Vlasek, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2012 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Knepp. (B,TM)
October 9, 2012 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (B,TM)
October 9, 2012 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Vlasek, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2012 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Huron County Common Pleas Court, case number CVH20120792 with jury demand, Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0647-5626377.. Filed by Scott Blizzard, Jarod Hopewell, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Betty Stewart, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jared Hopewell, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Scott Blizzard, #5 Exhibit E - Unreported Cases) (Vlasek, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krantz vs Norfolk Southern Railway Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: John B. Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Blizzard
Represented By: John B. Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarod Hopewell
Represented By: John B. Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Krantz
Represented By: David Alan Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?