Plate v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: |
Richard William Plate |
Defendant: |
Charles Johnson, John Tharp, Lucas County, Ohio and John Does |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv01699 |
Filed: |
August 24, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Toledo Office |
County: |
Lucas |
Presiding Judge: |
James G. Carr |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 18, 2018 |
Filing
110
Order: Defendants' motion to certify an order for interlocutory appeal (Re: 95 ) denied. Richard's motion for a Rule 17(a)(3) substitution be, and the same hereby is, granted. Within ninety days of the date of this order, th e correct administrator of Scott's estate must file an amended complaint naming himself, herself, or itself as the plaintiff. Plaintiff's counsel must file status reports with this court if the Sandusky County Probate Court takes any act ion in Scotts probate case on account of, or related to, this order finding that Scott did not reside in Sandusky County when he died. On receipt of the status reports due within 14 days of the filing of the amended complain, the clerk will set this case for a telephonic status/scheduling conference. See order full details and deadlines. Judge James G. Carr on 10/18/18. (C,D)
|
July 25, 2018 |
Filing
94
Order Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction (Doc. 59 ) be, and the same hereby is, denied. Plaintiff's opposition and motion for oral argument (Doc. 91 ) be, and the same hereby is, denied The par ties must submit supplemental briefing on the issues raised on pages 17 and 18 of this order. Plaintiff's brief due 8/15/18; defendants' response due 8/29/18; and plaintiff's reply due 9/5/18. The parties' principal briefs may not exceed fifteen pages, and plaintiff's reply brief may not exceed seven pages. Judge James G. Carr on 7/25/18.(C,D)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
12
Order. Lucas County's Motion for judgment on the pleadings denied (Related Doc # 5 ). Judge James G. Carr on 2/25/2016.(G,D)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?