A.A. et al v. Otsego Local Schools Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: A.A., Mirela Demirovic and Alen Demirovic
Defendant: Otsego Local Schools Board of Education, Wood County, Ohio, Wood County Sheriff's Office and Brian Ruckstuhal
Case Number: 3:2015cv01747
Filed: August 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Wood
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J. Helmick
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Memorandum Opinion and Order: I deny the motion of Defendant Brian Ruckstuhl for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' Second and Fourth Claims for Relief and grant his motion as to Plaintiffs' Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, Eighth, and Eleventh Claims for Relief. (Doc. No. 80). re 80 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/18/2020. (S,AL)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FILED IN ERROR Memorandum Opinion and Order: L Squared's motion for default judgment, (Doc. No. 12), is granted as to Counts I, II, and IV, and denied as to Count III of its Complaint. L Squared is entitled to $60,702.14 in compensat ory damages, $121,404.28 in punitive damages, $14,400.50 in attorney fees, pre-judgment interest on its compensatory damages, and post-judgment interest calculated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a). Count III of the Complaint is dismissed. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/17/2019. 12 (S,AL) Modified on 5/17/2019 (S,AL).
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for protective order pursuant to Rule 26(c). (Related Doc # 54 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/9/2018.(SG,D)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Memorandum Opinion: Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleading is granted in part as to portions of the Eleventh Claim, but denied in part as to the remaining claims regarding Defendant Ruckstuhl. The motion is also denied as moot ag ainst Otsego Local Schools, the Wood County Sheriff's Department, and Wood County, Ohio. The Plaintiffs are granted two weeks from the date of this decision to dismiss their Third Claim for relief as noted in their opposition or the Defendant's motion, upon request, will be reinstated. re 20 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/21/2016. (S,AL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.A. et al v. Otsego Local Schools Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.A.
Represented By: Gregg A. Peppel
Represented By: Thomas P. Timmers
Represented By: Anthony E. Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirela Demirovic
Represented By: Gregg A. Peppel
Represented By: Thomas P. Timmers
Represented By: Anthony E. Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alen Demirovic
Represented By: Gregg A. Peppel
Represented By: Thomas P. Timmers
Represented By: Anthony E. Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otsego Local Schools Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood County, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Ruckstuhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?