Warstler v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Randy Warstler
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc., John Doe I and John Doe II
Case Number: 3:2016cv00385
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Paulding
Presiding Judge: David A. Katz
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order denying plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Re: 20 18 ). Judge James G. Carr on 7/20/17.(C,D)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order granting Defendant's Motion to dismiss complaint. (Related Doc # 6 ). Judge James G. Carr on 2/28/17.(C,D)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order: Warstler's motion to convert (Doc. 8 ) is denied. Warstler has until August 31, 2016, to file a response to Medtronic's motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6). (Doc. 6 ). Medtronic shall have until September 15, 2016, to file its reply. Judge James G. Carr on 8/15/16.(C,D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warstler v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Warstler
Represented By: Michelle L. Kranz
Represented By: James G. O'Brien
Represented By: Carasusana B. Wall
Represented By: David W. Zoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?