Jaegly v. Lucas County Board of Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey C. Jaegly
Defendant: Lucas County Board Of Commissioners, David Lewandowski and Lisa D. McGowan
Case Number: 3:2016cv01982
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Lucas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J. Helmick
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Memorandum Opinion: Defendant's motion for certification is denied. (Doc. No. 42). Pursuant to my previous order, Defendant is granted ten days to file a notice of appeal with the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals. re 42 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/18/2018. (S,AL)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Memorandum Opinion: previous holding is reaffirmed, denying Defendant Lucas County Common Pleas Court's motion to dismiss on alternative grounds. re 33 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/6/2017. (S,AL)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Memorandum Opinion: Jaegly's unopposed motion to dismiss parties is granted. (Doc. No. 17). I find the Defendants may be sued in federal court under the claims and deny Defendants' motions to dismiss. (Doc. Nos. 19, 23). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/28/2017. (S,AL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaegly v. Lucas County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey C. Jaegly
Represented By: Owen B. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas County Board Of Commissioners
Represented By: John A. Borell, Sr.
Represented By: Evy M. Jarrett
Represented By: Andrew K. Ranazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lewandowski
Represented By: John A. Borell, Sr.
Represented By: Evy M. Jarrett
Represented By: Andrew K. Ranazzi
Represented By: Kimberly Vanover Riley
Represented By: Linda L. Woeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa D. McGowan
Represented By: John A. Borell, Sr.
Represented By: Evy M. Jarrett
Represented By: Andrew K. Ranazzi
Represented By: Kimberly Vanover Riley
Represented By: Linda L. Woeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?