Hall et al v. Edgewood Partners Insurance Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian K Hall and Michael G Thompson
Defendant: Edgewood Partners Insurance Center, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00821
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Lucas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J. Helmick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Memorandum Opinion: I find the preliminary injunction order of July 5, 2017 is modified to exclude the first thirty-seven customers identified in Plaintiffs Exhibit 1. The customers which are off limits to Plaintiffs and subject to the July 2 017 preliminary injunction order include: Equipment Rentals, Quick Lifts, Indestructo Rental, and five Star Equipment Rental. Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. No. 72) is denied. The Plaintiffs' oral motion to increase the bond is denied without prejudice. Defendant's motion for contempt (Doc. No. 62) is granted. re 62 72 59 Telephone Conference set for 5/10/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. The Court will initiate the phone call. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/25/2018. (S,AL)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Memorandum Opinion: the Defendant's motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. No. 11) is granted. The bond filed in conjunction with the TRO remains in place as security for this preliminary injunction order. Plaintiff's motion for leave to submit evidence to contradict the declaration of Eileen Webb (Doc. No. 55) is denied as moot. re 11 55 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/5/2017. (S,AL)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Memorandum Opinion and Order : Defendant's motion for TRO (Doc. No. 11) is granted. The Defendant shall file a bond in the amount of $50,000.00 with the Clerk's office. Therefore, the Plaintiffs are enjoined from soliciting, directly or indirectly any of EPIC's restricted clients until further order of this Court. Motions terminated: 11 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/19/2017. (SG,D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Edgewood Partners Insurance Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K Hall
Represented By: Katherine Stone Decker
Represented By: Gregory H. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G Thompson
Represented By: Katherine Stone Decker
Represented By: Gregory H. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewood Partners Insurance Center, Inc.
Represented By: Steven D. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?