Young v. Management & Training Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Aaron E Young
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation, MTC Medical LLC, Neil Turner, Taggart Boyd, Becky Joyce, Lori Shuler, Ruben Quintero, Vicky Donahue, April Ellinwood, Deanna Croyle, James Craig, Unknown Correctional Officer, Unknown First Shift Captain, Unknown First Shift Lieutenant, Unknown Deaf Service Coordinator, Kea Smith, Benjamin Blankenship, Unknown Nurses, Jane Doe and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2017cv02426
Filed: November 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J. Helmick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Memorandum Opinion and Order: I deny Young's motion to alter or amend the judgment against him, (Doc. No. 49), his motion for recusal, (Doc. No. 50), his motion for judicial notice, (Doc. No. 52), and his motion to stay. (Doc. No. 53). re 49 52 53 50 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/15/2020. (S,AL)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendants' motion for summary judgment, (Doc. No. 23), is granted. Young's motions to strike, (Doc. No. 28; Doc. No. 34; Doc. No. 41), are denied, and Defendant's motion to strike, (Doc. No. 44), is denied as moot. Young's motion for leave to file a declaration in support of his opposition to Defendants' summary judgment motion, (Doc. No. 38), is denied. re 41 38 34 28 23 44 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 1/7/2020. (S,AL)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Supplemental Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint are granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Restraining Order, Motion to Stay Proceedings, Motion to Take Jud icial Notice, and Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Parties are denied without prejudice. Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is also denied without prejudice. re 6 17 15 8 14 12 5 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/19/2018. (S,AL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Management & Training Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron E Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Medical LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Turner
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taggart Boyd
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Joyce
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Shuler
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Quintero
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Donahue
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Ellinwood
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Croyle
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Craig
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown First Shift Captain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown First Shift Lieutenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Deaf Service Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kea Smith
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Blankenship
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?