Lathan v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Darek Lathan
Defendant: Jamie Murphy, State of Ohio, Adult Parole Authority, Doug Linker, United States of America, Agent Steve Doe, Supervisor John Doe, Marc Thompson and Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, ad Firearms
Case Number: 3:2018cv02115
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to dismiss Defendants' #5 Motion to dismiss filed by Plaintiff Darek Lathan. Related document(s) #5 . (M,S)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 Marginal Order granting motion (Re: #3 ) for extension of time until 11/14/18 to move, plead, or answer (re #1 Notice of Removal). Judge James G. Carr on 10/10/18. (C,D)
October 8, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Doug Linker, Jamie Murphy, Marc Thompson. (Yuhas, Maureen)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (re #1 Notice of Removal) Adult Parole Authority, Doug Linker, Jamie Murphy, and Marc Thompson answers due 10/10/2018.Judge James G. Carr on 10/2/2018.(C,D)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until 10/10/2018 to answer Plaintiff's complaint filed by Adult Parole Authority, Doug Linker, Jamie Murphy, Marc Thompson. Related document(s) #1 . (Yuhas, Maureen)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Rojas, Guillermo) Modified text on 10/13/2018 (M,L).
September 14, 2018 Copy of #2 Magistrate Consent Form Issued, #1 Notice of Removal and docket report mailed to Darek Lathan at 3151 County Rd. 2425 Stryker, OH 43557 on 9/14/2018. Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (B,JL)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,JL)
September 14, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (B,JL)
September 14, 2018 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (B,JL)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County Common Pleas Court, case number G-4801-CI-0201803457-000 . Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Rojas, Guillermo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lathan v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darek Lathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Murphy
Represented By: Maureen C. Yuhas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Parole Authority
Represented By: Maureen C. Yuhas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Linker
Represented By: Maureen C. Yuhas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Guillermo J. Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent Steve Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisor John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Thompson
Represented By: Maureen C. Yuhas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, ad Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?