U.S. Department of Labor v. Fischer
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor, Board of Trustees for the Toledo Electrical Joint Apprenticeship Training & Trust Fund, Daniel Bollin, Eric Grosswiler, Russ Zimmerman, Ray Brint, Jr., Toledo Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Richard Burson, Scott Korczynksi, Kris Cousino, Patricio Covarrubias, Jason Szymanski, Kenneth Fischer and Patrick Davis
Case Number: 3:2018cv02241
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Kris Cousino waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Russ Zimmerman waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Toledo Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Jason Szymanski waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Eric Grosswiler waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Kenneth Fischer waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Patrick Davis waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Patricio Covarrubias waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Richard Burson waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Ray Brint, Jr waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Daniel Bollin waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Scott Korczynksi waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 filed on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor (Cottle, Lisa)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint filed against Trustees for the Toledo Joint Electrical Joint Apprenticeship Training and Trust Fund et al.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cottle, Lisa)
September 28, 2018 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
September 28, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
September 28, 2018 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Department of Labor v. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor
Represented By: Lisa A. Cottle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees for the Toledo Electrical Joint Apprenticeship Training & Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bollin
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Grosswiler
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russ Zimmerman
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Brint, Jr.
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toledo Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Burson
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Korczynksi
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Cousino
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricio Covarrubias
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Szymanski
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Fischer
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Davis
Represented By: Wesley D. Merillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?