King et al v. Bank of America, NA et al
Plaintiff: Anita King and Bradley J. King
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Valerie White, PennyMac Loan Services LLC, Polaris Home Funding Corp., BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP, Bank of America, NA, Law Offices of John D. Clunk Co., L.P.A. and Clunk, Hoose Co., LPA
Case Number: 3:2018cv02248
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Referring Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 26 Motion for extension of time until 11/26/2018 to to respond to #13 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Plaintiff Anita King. Related document(s) #13 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(M,L)
November 1, 2018 Filing 25 Motion for extension of time until 11/26/2018 to respond to #13 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Plaintiff Bradley J. King. Related document(s) #13 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(M,L) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (M,L).
November 1, 2018 Filing 24 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Clunk, Hoose Co., LPA. (Infante, Laura)
October 26, 2018 Filing 23 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with Memorandum in Support filed by BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP, Bank of America, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - 2012 Petition, #4 Exhibit D - 2013 Petition, #5 Exhibit E - 2014 Petition, #6 Exhibit F- Foreclosure Judgment) (Kostura, Bryan) AddedMotion to dismiss for failure to state a claim on 10/30/2018 (D,TM).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc #22 ). Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 10/26/2018. (R,Ke)
October 25, 2018 Filing 22 Motion for leave to file Motion to Dismiss in excess of 20 pages with Memorandum in Support filed by BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP, Bank of America, NA. (Kostura, Bryan)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion to substitute party; Related Doc #18 . Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 10/23/2018.(R,Ke)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Clunk, Hoose Co., LPA's answer due 11/5/2018. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 10/23/2018. (R,Ke)
October 22, 2018 Filing 21 Motion for extension of time until 11/05/2018 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs #1 Complaint with Exhibit A-Delivery Confirmation filed by Defendant Law Offices of John D. Clunk Co., L.P.A.. (Infante, Laura)
October 16, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Law Offices of John D. Clunk Co., L.P.A.. (Infante, Laura)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Bank of America, N.A. is 100% owned by BANA Holding Corp., which is 100% owned by BAC North America Holding Company. BAC North America Holding Company is 100% owned by NB Holdings Corp., which in turn is 100% owned by Bank of America Corporation, whose shares are publicly traded. No public company other than Bank of America Corporation has an ownership interest of 10% or more in Bank of America, National Association filed by BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP, Bank of America, NA. (Kostura, Bryan) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (D,TM).
October 12, 2018 Filing 18 Motion to substitute party as Clunk Hoose Co., LPA as proper Defendant filed by Defendant Law Offices of John D. Clunk Co., L.P.A.. (Infante, Laura)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement (not flattened) filed by Law Offices of John D. Clunk Co., L.P.A.. (Infante, Laura)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by Laura C. Infante and Ashley E. Mueller filed by on behalf of Law Offices of John D. Clunk Co., L.P.A.. (Infante, Laura)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Steven J. Vander Ark for Polaris Home Funding Corp. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #14 ). Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 10/10/2018. (R,Ke)
October 10, 2018 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. Judge Jack Zouhary terminated. (S,JM)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/10/2018. (D,L)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 Motion for attorney Steven J. Vander Ark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8947499, filed by Defendant Polaris Home Funding Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Steven J. Vander Ark)(Watring, Stephen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Assignments, #4 Exhibit Foreclosure Complaint, #5 Exhibit Answer, #6 Exhibit Summary Judgment Motion, #7 Exhibit Summary Judgment Order, #8 Exhibit Foreclosure Motion, #9 Exhibit Foreclosure Order denying, #10 Exhibit Foreclosure Order 4.14.15, #11 Exhibit Ch 7 Bankruptcy Petition, #12 Exhibit Bankruptcy Docket, #13 Exhibit 2013 Bankruptcy Petition, #14 Exhibit 2013 Bankruptcy Schedules, #15 Exhibit 2013 Trustee Report, #16 Exhibit 2013 Bankruptcy Docket, #17 Exhibit 2014 Bankruptcy Petition, #18 Exhibit 2014 Bankruptcy Docket, #19 Exhibit Current Summons and Complaint, #20 Exhibit Notice of Removal with Exhibits)(Wilson, Sarah)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Polaris Home Funding Corp.. (Watring, Stephen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc #7 ). Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 10/5/2018. (R,Ke)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Polaris Home Funding Corp.. (Watring, Stephen)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Defendant's Motion for leave (Related Doc #6 ). Defendants BANA and BAC shall have up to and including October 26, 2018, to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 10/5/2018. (R,Ke)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Stephen A. Watring and Matthew J. Bakota filed on behalf of Polaris Home Funding Corp. (Watring, Stephen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for leave to file a Joint Motion to Dismiss in excess of 20 pages with Memorandum in Support filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Wilson, Sarah) Modified on 10/15/2018 (D,TM).
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for leave to plead to #1 Complaint until 10/26/2018 filed by BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP, Bank of America, NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kostura, Bryan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Statement of PennyMac Loan Services pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure identifying PennyMac is 100% owned by Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company, LLC (PNMAC). PNMAC is 32.44% owned by PennyMac Financial Services, Inc., filed by PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Wilson, Sarah) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (D,TM).
October 2, 2018 Notice to Attorney Omar F. Shaaban. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Statement of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure identifying wholly-owned subsidiary as MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. is owned by Maroon Holding, LLC. Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., is the only publicly-held corporation that individually owns 10% or more of Maroon Holding, LLC, filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.. (Wilson, Sarah) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (D,TM).
October 1, 2018 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2.Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/1/2018. (M,L)
October 1, 2018 Notice by Clerk that Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,L)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
September 28, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
September 28, 2018 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L) Modified date filed on 10/1/2018 (M,L).
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Supplement - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Wilson, Sarah)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Wood County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018CV0503 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8933803.. Filed by PennyMac Loan Services LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Docket, #3 Exhibit State Court Filing) (Wilson, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Bank of America, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita King
Represented By: Omar F. Shaaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley J. King
Represented By: Omar F. Shaaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Wirthlin
Represented By: Sarah Alford Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services LLC
Represented By: John R. Wirthlin
Represented By: Sarah Alford Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Home Funding Corp.
Represented By: Steven J. Vander Ark
Represented By: Matthew J. Bakota
Represented By: Stephen A. Watring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP
Represented By: Bryan T. Kostura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: Bryan T. Kostura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of John D. Clunk Co., L.P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clunk, Hoose Co., LPA
Represented By: Ashley E. Mueller
Represented By: Laura C. Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?