Midwest Terminals of Toledo International, Inc. v. International Longshoremen's Association et al
Plaintiff: Midwest Terminals of Toledo International, Inc.
Defendant: International Longshoremen's Division - Great Lakes District Council, International Longshoremen's Association and Local 1982, International Longshoremen's Association
Case Number: 3:2018cv02560
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Local 1982, International Longshoremen's Association on 11/21/2018, filed on behalf of Midwest Terminals of Toledo International, Inc. Related document(s) #2 . (Mason, Ronald)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: conference to be held on 2/5/2019 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 210 before Judge Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting)(S,AL)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order and Notice of Party Dismissal of defendant International Longshoremen's Association, without prejudice. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/6/2018. (S,AL)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Partial Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) ONLY as to Defendant International Longshoremen's Association filed by Midwest Terminals of Toledo International, Inc. (Tulencik, Aaron)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 First Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Midwest Terminals of Toledo International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from International Longshoremen's Assn - Harrold Daggett, #2 Exhibit B -Letter from International Longshoremen's Assn - William Yockey, #3 Exhibit C - Letter from International Longshoremen's Assn - Yockey to Ron Mason, #4 Exhibit D -1-25-17 Letter from International Longshoremen's Assn. - Yockey to Ron Mason, #5 Exhibit E - Letter from Mason Law to Baker & Brown, #6 Exhibit F - International Longshoremen's Assn press release dated 5-13-18) (Mason, Ronald)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Marginal Entry Order granting the defendants' motion for an extension of time to answer. Answer due 1/15/2019. #7 #8 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/28/2018.(S,AL)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 Corrected Joint Motion for extension of time until January 15, 2019 to answer filed by International Longshoremen's Association, International Longshoremen's Division - Great Lakes District Council, Local 1982, International Longshoremen's Association. Related document(s) #1 , #7 . (Mando, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 Joint Motion for extension of time until January 19, 2019 to answer , move, or otherwise defend filed by International Longshoremen's Association, International Longshoremen's Division - Great Lakes District Council, Local 1982, International Longshoremen's Association. Related document(s) #1 . (Mando, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Joseph D. Mando filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Mando, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Hoffman, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by George H. Faulkner filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Faulkner, George)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Amended Original Summons (with complete address) issued to counsel for service upon Local 1982, International Longshoremen's Association. (S,JM)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon International Longshoremen's Association, International Longshoremen's Division - Great Lakes District Council, and Local 1982, International Longshoremen's Association. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM)
November 7, 2018 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (S,JM)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8996045. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 3-17-cv-01688. Filed by Midwest Terminals of Toledo International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from International Longshoremen's Association - Harrold Daggett, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from International Longshoremen's Association- William Yockey, #3 Exhibit C - Letter from International Longshoremen's Association - Yockey to Ron Mason, #4 Exhibit D - 1-25-17 - Letter from International Longshoremen's Association Yockey to Ron MasonLetter, #5 Exhibit E - Letter from Mason Law to Baker & Brown, #6 Exhibit F -International Longshoremen's Association press release dated 5-13-18, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons International Longshoremen's Association, Local 1982, #9 Summons International Longshoremen's Association - Harrold A. Daggett, #10 Summons International Longshoremen's Association-Great Lakes Council - John Baker Jr) (Mason, Ronald)
November 6, 2018 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (S,JM)
November 6, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (S,JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Terminals of Toledo International, Inc. v. International Longshoremen's Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshoremen's Division - Great Lakes District Council
Represented By: George H. Faulkner
Represented By: Joseph D. Mando
Represented By: Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshoremen's Association
Represented By: George H. Faulkner
Represented By: Joseph D. Mando
Represented By: Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 1982, International Longshoremen's Association
Represented By: George H. Faulkner
Represented By: Joseph D. Mando
Represented By: Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Terminals of Toledo International, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron T. Tulencik
Represented By: Ronald L. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?