Zehner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Eric Allen Zehner
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv02620
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kathleen B Burke
Referring Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See #General Order 2019-1 for details. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/2019. (P,G)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case for a period of 14 days due to the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government. See #General Order 2018-15 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/26/2018. (D,TM)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Second Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Eric Allen Zehner. (Forbes, Randal)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] re #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Allen Zehner. Plaintiff has filed an improper application to proceed in forma pauperis. He is ordered to complete and submit the entire Financial Application accompanying this Order within 14 days of the date of this Order. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/4/2018. (D, I)
November 14, 2018 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James G. Carr on 11/14/2018. (D,TM)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/14/2018. (D,TM)
November 14, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (D,TM)
November 14, 2018 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (D,TM)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Jason S. Rodman filed by on behalf of Eric Allen Zehner. (Rodman, Jason)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Randal S. Forbes filed by on behalf of Eric Allen Zehner. (Forbes, Randal)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Eric Allen Zehner. (Forbes, Randal)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Decision of Commissioner of Social Security Administration against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Eric Allen Zehner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 USM-285) (Forbes, Randal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zehner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Allen Zehner
Represented By: Randal S. Forbes
Represented By: Jason S. Rodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?