MacLean-Patterson, et al v. Erie County, Ohio, et al
Plaintiff: Richard D. MacLean and Dawn E. MacLean-Patterson
Defendant: John, No. 1 to 5 Doe, Eric Reiber, Jared L. Oliver, Christopher Lawson, John Doe 6-10, Dennis Wolfe, Thomas Casey Proy, Erie County, Ohio, Board of Commissioners, Paul A. Sigsworth, Katharina A. Boyer, Firelands Regional Health System, John T. Nolder, Brittany M. Hausman, Erie County, Ohio, Firelands Regional Medical Center, John Does and Lt. Thomas Casey Proy
Case Number: 3:2018cv02986
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE. Initial Phone Status held on 2/15/19. Plaintiffs granted leave to amend the Complaint by 3/8/19; Defendants to file Answers to the Complaint (or Amended Complaint) by 3/29/19. Telephone Case Management Conference (CMC) set for 4/2/19 at 1:30 PM. Counsel may call the same District Court conference line. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due 3 days before the Conference. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/19/19. (S,Na)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 2/15/19 at 10:45 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Service of First Set of Interrogatories, Second Set of Interrogatories, and First Request for Production filed by Katharina A. Boyer, Firelands Regional Health System, Firelands Regional Medical Center. (Murphy, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Katharina A. Boyer, Firelands Regional Health System, Firelands Regional Medical Center. (Murphy, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Teresa L. Grigsby and Jennifer A. McHugh filed by on behalf of Erie County, Ohio, Erie County, Ohio, Board of Commissioners, Brittany M. Hausman, Christopher Lawson, John T. Nolder, Jared L. Oliver, Thomas Casey Proy, Eric Reiber, Paul A. Sigsworth, Dennis Wolfe. (Grigsby, Teresa)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying without prejudice #6 Motion to dismiss For Failure to State A Claim. See Doc. #5 -- to be discussed at Initial Phone Status yet to be scheduled after all Defendants enter an appearance of counsel. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/7/2019.(D,L)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss For Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Pursuant To Fed.R. 12b6 filed by Katharina A. Boyer, Firelands Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Michael)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/31/2018. (M,L)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR: Document not attached. Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/31/2018. (M,L) Modified on 12/31/2018 (M,L). Modified on 12/31/2018: Refiled as document #5 . (M,L).
December 31, 2018 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and not issued. (M,L)
December 31, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
December 31, 2018 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Zagrans, Eric)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand for Money Damages against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9072626.. Filed by Dawn E. MacLean-Patterson, Richard D. MacLean. (Zagrans, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacLean-Patterson, et al v. Erie County, Ohio, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John, No. 1 to 5 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Reiber
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared L. Oliver
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Lawson
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Wolfe
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Casey Proy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie County, Ohio, Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Sigsworth
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katharina A. Boyer
Represented By: Michael P. Murphy
Represented By: Justin D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firelands Regional Health System
Represented By: Michael P. Murphy
Represented By: Justin D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Nolder
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany M. Hausman
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie County, Ohio
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firelands Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Michael P. Murphy
Represented By: Justin D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Thomas Casey Proy
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D. MacLean
Represented By: Eric H. Zagrans
Represented By: John P. Colan
Represented By: Thomas D. Robenalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn E. MacLean-Patterson
Represented By: Eric H. Zagrans
Represented By: John P. Colan
Represented By: Thomas D. Robenalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?