Lathan v. Carr et al
Plaintiff: Darek L. Lathan
Defendant: Jack Zouhary, James Knepp II, Tracey B. Tangeman, James G. Carr, Jeffrey J. Helmick and Tracey Ballard Tangeman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00147
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Copy of #11 Order on Motion for extension of time, Order on Motion to amend complaint and Order on Motion for release, mailed to Darek Lathan, #201800685 on 2/21/2019 at - Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio - 24-25 03151 County Rd., - Stryker, OH 43557 Related document(s) #11 . (D,TM)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting #4 Government's Motion for Extension of time to move, plead or answer Complaint until 3/25/2019; Denying Defendant's Motion to amend complaint (Related Doc #5 ) and Denying Defendant's #9 Motion for immediate release. Honorable George Caram Steeh on 2/21/2019. (D,TM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for Expedited Proceedings with Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Darek L. Lathan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(D,TM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for immediate release with Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Darek L. Lathan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (D,TM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Opposition to #5 Motion to amend complaint, #7 Motion compelling dismissal of Defendant's #4 Motion for Extension of TimeMotion compelling Dispositive Filings to end litigation (Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Latest Filings (ECF # 5, 7) filed by Tracey Ballard Tangeman. (Rojas, Guillermo)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 Motion compelling dismissal of Defendant's #4 Motion for Extension of Time, and Motion compelling Dispositive Filings to end litigation with Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Darek L. Lathan. (Attachments: #1 Letters from Stone Law Firm and U.S. Department of Justice, #2 Envelope) (D,TM)
February 1, 2019 Copy of #6 Order designation of Judge George Caram Steeh III, mailed to Darek L. Lathan #201800685 at Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio, 24-25, 03151 County Road, Stryker, OH 43557 on 2/1/2019. Related document(s) #6 . (M,L)
February 1, 2019 Honorable George Caram Steeh assigned to case. Judge Jack Zouhary terminated. (M,L)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order designation of Judge George Caram Steeh III, United States District Judge or the Eastern District of Michigan to hold a district court in the Northern District of Ohio. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge George Caram Steeh III for all further proceedings. Judge R. Guy Cole, Jr. on 1/30/2019. (M,L)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to amend complaint pursuant to Civil R. 15 with Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Darek L. Lathan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(M,L)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time to move, plead, or answer for 60 days filed by Defendant Tracey Ballard Tangeman. Related document(s) #1 . (Rojas, Guillermo)
January 23, 2019 Copy of #3 mailed to Darek L. Lathan, #201800685 at Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio, 24-25, 03151 County Rd., Stryker, OH 4355 on 1/23/2019. (D,L)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Recusal. Upon review of the docket in this case, this Court finds recusal is appropriate. This case is returned to the Clerk's Office for reassignment / designation to another District Judge pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 292(b). Further proceedings are stayed pending assignment of this case to a District Judge from another District. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/23/2019. (D,L)
January 22, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
January 22, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,Ke)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Amended Certificate of Service filed by Tracey B. Tangeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Certificate of Service)Related document(s) #1 .(Rojas, Guillermo)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Lucas County, Ohio, case number G-4801-CI-0201804780-000. Filing fee exempt Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 3:18cv2115. Filed by Tracey B. Tangeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Lathan Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet ) (Rojas, Guillermo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lathan v. Carr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Zouhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Knepp II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey B. Tangeman
Represented By: Guillermo J. Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey J. Helmick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Ballard Tangeman
Represented By: Guillermo J. Rojas
Represented By: Lynne Haddad Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darek L. Lathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?