Elsevier, Inc. et al v. Norfolk Southern Corp.

Plaintiff: J.M. Huber Corp., Fastems Oy AB and Elsevier, Inc.
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corp. and Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00160
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE. Phone Status held on 3/19/19. Case Management Conference set for 5/24/19 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel may participate by phone, and party attendance is not required. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due 3 days before the Conference. Defendant's Answer to the Complaint due by 4/8/19. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/19/19. (S,Na)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 Marginal Entry Order granting #9 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Christopher J. Merrick for Defendant Norfolk Southern. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L)
March 7, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 3/19/19 at 9:15 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for attorney Christopher J. Merrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9184014, filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Christopher J. Merrick)(Santin, Teresa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance of Teresa G. Santin and Joseph K. Cole by Teresa G. Santin filed by on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corp.. (Santin, Teresa)
February 22, 2019 Notice to Attorney Christopher Merrick. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (P,WL)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Norfolk Southern Corp., waiver sent on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019 with Notice to waive service of summons attached filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saks, Jeffrey) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (D,TM).
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/22/2019. (R,Ke)
January 22, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (R,Ke)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Norfolk Southern Corp. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,Ke)
January 22, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by J.M. Huber Corp.. (Saks, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,Ke)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Fastems Oy AB. (Saks, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent RELX PLC for Elsevier, Inc. filed by Elsevier, Inc.. (Saks, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Norfolk Southern Corp.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9105844.. Filed by Elsevier, Inc., Fastems Oy AB, J.M. Huber Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Saks, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elsevier, Inc. et al v. Norfolk Southern Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M. Huber Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fastems Oy AB
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsevier, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Joseph K. Cole
Represented By: Teresa G. Santin
Represented By: Christopher J. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?