Downing et al v. Ditech Financial LLC
Plaintiff: Ancle K Downing and Karen L Downing
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00179
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Case Dismissal. This case be, and the same hereby is dismissed, without prejudice to the right of the plaintiff to file a claim in the defendant's pending bankruptcy proceeding, or, in the event of dismissal of that proceeding without the defendant's discharge, to reopen this case within two months of the date of such dismissal (Re #4 ). Judge James G. Carr on 3/14/19. (C,D)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy and Suggestion of Automatic Stay filed by Ditech Financial LLC. (Sandy, James)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Ditech Financial LLC answer due 2/21/2019. Judge James G. Carr on 2/1/19.(C,D)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Stipulated Motion for leave to plead to Complaint until February 21, 2019 filed by Defendant Ditech Financial LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Sandy, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,Ke)
January 24, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
January 24, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (R,Ke)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Huron County Common Pleas Court, case number CVH20181021 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9109638.. Filed by Ditech Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint Huron County Common Pleas Court, #2 Exhibit B - Additional Pleadings in Huron County Common Pleas Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sandy, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downing et al v. Ditech Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ancle K Downing
Represented By: Kathryn M. Eyster
Represented By: Daniel L. McGookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L Downing
Represented By: Kathryn M. Eyster
Represented By: Daniel L. McGookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: James W. Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?