Kontur v. Riverfront Apartments Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Michael Larue Kontur
Defendant: Riverfront Apartments Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2019cv00248
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kara E. Brodfuehrer for Plaintiff Michael Larue Kontur. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/7/2019.(SG,D)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Eric G. Dunn for Plaintiff Michael Larue Kontur. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/7/2019.(SG,D)
March 4, 2019 Financial Transaction in the amount of $240.00 received for motion to appear pro hac vice by attorney Kara Brodfuehrer and Eric Dunn, Receipt # 34660011232. Related document(s) #7 , #6 . (D,TM)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Kara E. Brodfuehrer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120.00, receipt number 34660011232, filed by Plaintiff Michael Larue Kontur. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(D,TM)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Eric G. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee$ 120.00, receipt number 34660011232, filed by Plaintiff Michael Larue Kontur. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(D,TM)
February 21, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (R,Ke)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Riverfront Apartments Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,Ke)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Marginal Entry Order granting the plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Related Doc #2 ) Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/19/2019.(S,AL)
February 1, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
February 1, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint - AO440 Summons, filed by Michael Larue Kontur. Related document(s) #1 . (Thomas, George)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael Larue Kontur. (Thomas, George)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Riverfront Apartments Limited Partnership. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Michael Larue Kontur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Restrictive Covenant, #2 Exhibit: First Amendment to Restrictive Covenant, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thomas, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kontur v. Riverfront Apartments Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Larue Kontur
Represented By: George A. Thomas
Represented By: Taylor N. Schmaltz
Represented By: Eric G. Dunn
Represented By: Kara E. Brodfuehrer
Represented By: Taylor N. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverfront Apartments Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?