Ball v. Central States Trucking Co. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Ball
Defendant: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, Central States Trucking Co. and Ricardo Ortiz-Perez
Case Number: 3:2019cv00433
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Copy of #1 & #16 mailed to Star Insurance Company at 10 New England Business Center, Suite 110, Andover, MA 01810 on 4/25/2019. (D,L)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order to Star Insurance Company. The Clerk is ordered to serve a copy of the Complaint on Star Insurance Company at the following address: 10 New England Business Center, Suite 110, Andover, Massachusetts 01810. Star Insurance Company is ordered to enter an appearance in this case and assert any lien or subrogation rights it may have based upon payments to Plaintiff. If Star Insurance fails to enter an appearance in this case within 30 days after service of this Order, it will be precluded from pursuing those rights against Plaintiff in this action. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/25/2019. (D,L)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 4/11/19. Defendants' Motion to Compel Joinder #12 is granted. Counsel shall meet and confer and provide Court with a proposed Order directing Star Insurance Company to enter an appearance in this case and set forth its interest, by lien or subrogation, in the proceeds of any recovery for Plaintiff. Counsel shall include an address for the Clerk to serve Star Insurance with a copy of the Order and the Complaint. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/12/19. (S,Na)
April 10, 2019 NOTICE [non-document]. Initial Phone Status set for 4/11/19 at 4:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. This Court will initiate the call. (S,Na)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 Opposition to #12 Motion to join subrogated carrier as a necessary Party with Memorandum of Law and Law and Argument attached filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bolotin, Samuel) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (M,L).
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Order in support of #12 Motion to Compel Joinder filed by Central States Trucking Co., Ricardo Ortiz-Perez. (Borla, R.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to compel joinder of necessary Party Star Insurance Company with Memorandum in Support filed by Central States Trucking Co., Ricardo Ortiz-Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subrogation Notice) (Borla, R.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying wholly owned subsidiary Forward Air Corporation for Central States Trucking Co., filed by Central States Trucking Co.. (Borla, R.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Central States Trucking Co., Ricardo Ortiz-Perez. (Borla, R.)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order and Notice of Party Dismissal approving #8 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, Only. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/20/2019. (D,L)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, Only filed by Eugene Ball. (Bolotin, Samuel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/27/2019. (M,L)
February 27, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Central States Trucking Co., Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, Ricardo Ortiz-Perez. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Supplement to Complaint, - Summons to Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, filed by Eugene Ball. Related document(s) #1 . (Bolotin, Samuel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement to Complaint, - Summons to Ricardo Ortiz-Perez, filed by Eugene Ball. Related document(s) #1 . (Bolotin, Samuel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint, - Summons to Central States Trucking Co., filed by Eugene Ball. Related document(s) #1 . (Bolotin, Samuel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - Corrected Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Eugene Ball. Related document(s) #1 . (Bolotin, Samuel)
February 27, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
February 27, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9168455. Filed by Eugene Ball. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company Insurance Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bolotin, Samuel) Modified on 2/27/2019: Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet uploaded. Filer notified. (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. Central States Trucking Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central States Trucking Co.
Represented By: R. Brian Borla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Ortiz-Perez
Represented By: R. Brian Borla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Ball
Represented By: Samuel G. Bolotin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?