Reese v. Lucas County Job and Family Services
Plaintiff: Leevorne Reese
Defendant: Lucas County Job and Family Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv00438
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Copy of #8 & #9 mailed to Leevorne Reese at 2114 Airport Highway, Toledo, OH 43609 on 4/24/2019. (D,L)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Order, this action is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. This Court certifies that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/24/2019. (D,L)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Dismissing Complaint. This action is dismissed, and this Court certifies that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/24/2019. (D,L)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 Addendum to #1 Complaint, #4 Supplement filed by Leevorne Reese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, redacted: Judgment Entries, Lucas County Common Pleas Court, #2 Reference list)(R,Ke)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until April 18, 2019 to answer filed by Defendant Lucas County Job and Family Services. (Borell, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Lucas County Job and Family Services on 3/1/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Leevorne Reese. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (M,L)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Addendum to #1 Complaint, filed by Leevorne Reese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C: Judgment Entries, Lucas County Common Pleas Court)(M,L)
February 27, 2019 Copy of #3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order and Magistrate Consent Form mailed to Leevorene Reese at 2114 Airport Highway, Toledo, OH 43609 on 2/27/2019. Related document(s) #3 . (M,L)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/27/2019. (M,L)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to pro se Plaintiff for service upon Lucas County Job and Family Services. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
February 27, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
February 27, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Lucas County Job and Family Services. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 34660011215. Filed by Leevorne Reese. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (M,L) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2019: #3 Complaint-file stamped) (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Lucas County Job and Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas County Job and Family Services
Represented By: John A. Borell, Sr.
Represented By: Elaine Berendsen Szuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leevorne Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?