Emerson v. Hebb
Plaintiff: Joseph Emerson
Defendant: Joseph Hebb
Case Number: 3:2019cv00460
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Copy of #8 Judgment, #7 Order, mailed to Joseph Emerson, PO Box 13, Toledo, OH 43601 on 4/1/19. Related document(s) #8 , #7 . (C,D)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 Judgment: This action (Doc. #1 ) be, and the same hereby is, dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. I hereby certify, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision would not be in good faith and shall not be allowed without prepayment of the filing fee. (re #7 Order). Judge James G. Carr on 3/28/19. (C,D)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order: This action (Doc. #1 ) be, and the same hereby is, dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. I hereby certify, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision would not be in good faith and shall not be allowed without prepayment of the filing fee. Judge James G. Carr on 3/28/19. (C,D)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Joseph Emerson on 3/19/2019. (B,JL)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet (partially completed) filed by Joseph Emerson. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(M,L)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement to #1 Complaint, filed by Joseph Emerson. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(M,L)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint, filed by Joseph Emerson. (No 2nd page, filer previously notified) Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Addition to Case-Face Page of Complaint, #2 Envelope)(D,TM)
March 1, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
March 1, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (R,Ke)
March 1, 2019 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. Copy of #1 Complaint and blank Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Joseph Emerson at P.O. Box 13, Toledo, Ohio 43601 on 3/1/2019. (R,Ke)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Joseph Emerson. (R,Ke)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Joseph Hebb. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Joseph Emerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: IRS correspondence and tax returns, #2 Exhibit: IRS correspondence and tax returns, redacted, #3 Summons, #4 USM-285) (R,Ke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson v. Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?