Lofties v. Definbaugh et al
Plaintiff: Floyd Lofties
Defendant: Fortitude Auto Transport, Fleet Car Lease, Inc. and Jason Definbaugh
Case Number: 3:2019cv01070
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of receipt of Remand. Filed in Erie County Common Pleas Court case 2018cv0707 on 5/31/2019. (M,L)
May 28, 2019 Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Erie County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. Related document(s) #5 . (M,L)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: This action (Doc. #1 ) be, and the same hereby is, dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and remanded to the Erie County Court of Common Pleas. Judge James G. Carr on 5/23/19. (C,D)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Service of Answers to Plaintiff's Request for Admission filed by Jason Definbaugh. (Center, Joseph)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Floyd Lofties. Related document(s) #1 . (Murray, Dennis)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
May 14, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
May 14, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (M,L)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from In the Court of Common Pleas of Erie County, Ohio, case number 2018 CV 0707 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9306252. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 3:18-cv-02944. Filed by Fortitude Auto Transport, Jason Definbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Pleading Complaint, #3 Pleading Summons to Jason Definbaugh, #4 Pleading Summons with Certificates of Mailing, #5 Pleading Successful Service on Jason Definbaugh, #6 Pleading Successful Service on Frotitude Auto Transport, #7 Pleading Successful Service on Fleet Car Lease, Inc., #8 Pleading Fleet Car Lease's Answer, #9 Pleading Notice of Appearance for Fleet, #10 Pleading Electronically Generated Notice of Appearance for J. Definbaugh & Fortitude Auto Transport, #11 Pleading Notice of Appearance of Donna J. Evans for Plaintiff, #12 Pleading Electronic Notice of Service of Notice of Appeaeance Donna Evans for Plaintff, #13 Pleading Magistrate Order, #14 Pleading Electronic Service of CMC Magistrate Order, #15 Pleading Notice of Appearance as Plaintiff Counsel, #16 Pleading Electronic Notice of Service of Notice of Apperance by F Murray for Plaintiff, #17 Pleading Consent to Plead and Judgment Entry for Jason Definbaugh and Fortitude Auto Transport, #18 Pleading Electronic Notice of Service for Consent to Plead and Judgment Entry, #19 Pleading Answer of J. Definbaugh and Fortitude Auto Transport, #20 Pleading Electronic Notice of Service of Answer of J Definbaugh and Fortitude Auto Transport, #21 Pleading Magistrate Order (Trial Scheduling Order), #22 Pleading Electronic Notice of Service of Magistate Order (Trial Scheduling Order), #23 Pleading Judgment Entry, #24 Pleading Electronic Notice of Service of Judgment Entry, #25 Pleading Certificate of Service (Plaintiff's Responses to Disc), #26 Pleading Electronic Notice of Service of Certificate of Service, #27 Pleading Complaint filed in Case No. 3:18-cv-02944, #28 Pleading Summons to Fortitude Auto Transport, #29 Pleading Summons to Fleet Car Lease, Inc.) (Center, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lofties v. Definbaugh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Lofties
Represented By: Florence Jesrani Murray
Represented By: Donna J. Evans
Represented By: Dennis E. Murray, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortitude Auto Transport
Represented By: Joseph S. Center
Represented By: Joseph W. Pappalardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet Car Lease, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Definbaugh
Represented By: Joseph S. Center
Represented By: Joseph W. Pappalardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?