Baughan v. Patterson, et al
Plaintiff: Dianne V. Baughan
Defendant: HSD Holding Company, LLC, Wallace S. Patterson, II, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, John Doe and HSD Operations, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01195
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Service of Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions filed by HSD Holding Company, LLC, Wallace S. Patterson, II. (Hudson, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by HSD Operations, Inc.. (Hudson, David)
July 13, 2019 Notice by Clerk that HSD Operations, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,L)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order granting plaintiff's motion to appoint process server to serve subpoenas in this case. (Related Doc #14 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/9/2019.(S,AL)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. HSD Operations, Inc. waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Wallace S. Patterson, II waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Contrada, Charles)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Marginal Entry Order and Notice of Party Dismissal of Progressive Speciality Company without prejudice, with the right to refile within one year. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/3/2019. (S,AL)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Service of interrogatories, request for production of documents,request for admissions and request for supplementation to defendants Wallace S. Patterson, II, HSD Operations, Inc. and John Doe filed by All Plaintiffs. (Contrada, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Motion and Memorandum to appoint process server filed by Plaintiff Dianne V. Baughan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to appoint process server)(Contrada, Charles)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to #9 Amended complaint filed by HSD Operations, Inc., Wallace S. Patterson, II. (Hudson, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon HSD Operations, Inc., Wallace S. Patterson, II per Amended Complaint filed #9 . (D,TM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Partial Dismissal filed by Dianne V. Baughan. (Contrada, Charles)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 Supplement to Amended complaint - summons, filed by Dianne V. Baughan. Related document(s) #9 . (Attachments: #1 summons)(Contrada, Charles)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 First Amended complaint against Defendants and adding new Defendant HSD Operations, Inc., filed by Dianne V. Baughan. (Contrada, Charles)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Marginal Entry Order granting the plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/19/2019.(S,AL)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for leave to amend complaint by substituting parties and memorandum of authorities in support of motion to amend with Amended Complaint attached filed by Plaintiff Dianne V. Baughan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Contrada, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Glen R. McMurry filed by on behalf of HSD Holding Company, LLC. (McMurry, Glen)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: Granting Joint Motion for extension of time for Defendants to move, plead, or otherwise respond to complaint. Defendants Wallace S. Patterson, II, and HSD Holding Company, LLC shall be permitted up to and including July 1, 2019 within which to move, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff shall also be granted leave of Court to file a First Amended Complaint through July, 1, 2019. re #4 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/4/2019. (SG,D)
June 3, 2019 Notice to Attorney Glen R. McMurry. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #4 . (O,K)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Joint Motion for extension of time until July 1, 2019 to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Resond to Complaint filed by HSD Holding Company, LLC, Wallace S. Patterson, II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hudson, David) Modified text on 6/1/2019 (M,L).
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
May 24, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
May 24, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to Notice of Removal - Corrected Summons and Complaint filed by Wallace S. Patterson, II and HSD Holding Company, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Hudson, David) Modified text and termed Motion on 5/24/2019 (M,L).
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Williams County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CI000034 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9327796. Filed by Wallace S. Patterson, II and HSD Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 ERROR: Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hudson, David) Modified on 5/24/2019: Incorrect Complaint uploaded. Refiled as document #2 . (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baughan v. Patterson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSD Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: David R. Hudson
Represented By: Glen R. McMurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace S. Patterson, II
Represented By: David R. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSD Operations, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne V. Baughan
Represented By: Charles V. Contrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?