Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. PSG Foods, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company and Western Heritage Insurance Company
Defendant: Eva Pepaj, Masha Lund, Rosie Jones, Sabella Shake, PSG Foods LLC d/b/a Platinum Showgirls, Jessica Burciaga, Lucy Pinder, Rachel Koren and PSG Foods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01341
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Plaintiffs'. Jessica Burciaga waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Rosie Jones waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Rachel Koren waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Masha Lund waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Eva Pepaj waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Lucy Pinder waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Sabella Shake waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019 filed on behalf of Western Heritage Insurance Company; Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Schwartz, Jonathan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 First Amended complaint for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants and adding new party plaintiff(s) Western Heritage Insurance Company. Filed by Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Western Heritage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015-2016 Western Heritage Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 2016-2017 Scottsdale Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Underlying Action Complaint) (Schwartz, Jonathan)
June 11, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L)
June 11, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
June 11, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company; Other Affiliate Scottsdale Insurance Company for Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company filed by Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Schwartz, Jonathan) Modified to add affiliate on 6/11/2019 (M,L).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9356281. Filed by Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2016-2017 Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Underlying Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schwartz, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. PSG Foods, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: David C. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masha Lund
Represented By: David C. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie Jones
Represented By: David C. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabella Shake
Represented By: David C. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSG Foods LLC d/b/a Platinum Showgirls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Burciaga
Represented By: David C. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: David C. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Koren
Represented By: David C. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSG Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan L. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Heritage Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan L. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?