Hastings Mutual Insurance Coompany v. R & P Investments, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hastings Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: R & P Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01369
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by R & P Investments, Inc.. (Martin, David)
July 1, 2019 Notice by Clerk that R & P Investments, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (R,Ke)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by R & P Investments, Inc.. R & P Investments, Inc. waiver sent on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019 filed on behalf of R & P Investments, Inc. (Martin, David)
June 13, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon R & P Investments, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
June 13, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
June 13, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment against R & P Investments, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9362644. Filed by Hastings Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Policy), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Taylor, Randy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastings Mutual Insurance Coompany v. R & P Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hastings Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald A. Rispo
Represented By: Randy L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & P Investments, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?