Fitts et al v. Porter
Plaintiff: KEVIN FITTS and CHANELLE A. FITTS
Defendant: David Porter and David L. Porter
Case Number: 3:2019cv01384
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Verification of Discovery Request of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Kevin Fitts filed by David L. Porter. (DeLaney, Cormac) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (M,L).
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by David L. Porter. (DeLaney, Cormac)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon David L. Porter on 6/19/2019, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Boyk, Charles)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/17/2019. (R,Ke)
June 17, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (R,Ke)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon David L. Porter. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,Ke)
June 17, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM)
June 17, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (D,TM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against David Porter. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9366159.. Filed by Kevin Fitts and Chanelle A. Fitts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Boyk, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitts et al v. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN FITTS
Represented By: Charles E. Boyk
Represented By: Kathleen R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANELLE A. FITTS
Represented By: Charles E. Boyk
Represented By: Kathleen R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Porter
Represented By: Cormac B. DeLaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?