ZUFFA, LLC v. Johnston et al
Plaintiff: ZUFFA, LLC
Defendant: Edon House LLC and Richard F Johnston
Case Number: 3:2019cv01415
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 8/27/19 at 3:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #11 Defendant Richard F. Johnston's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Richard F Johnston answer now due 8/19/2019. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/6/2019.(D,L)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until 08/19/2019 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Richard F Johnston. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stopar, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Edon House LLC. (Lehenbauer, Alan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to Complaint filed by Edon House LLC. (Lehenbauer, Alan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Richard F Johnston on 7/15/2019, filed on behalf of ZUFFA, LLC. Related document(s) #5 . (D,TM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Edon House LLC on 7/12/2019, filed on behalf of Plaintiff. Related document(s) #5 . (D,TM)
June 28, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Edon House LLC, Receipt # 7017 0660 0000 4302 8493 and Richard F Johnston, # 7005 1820 0004 7736 8280 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Related documents #1 , #5 . (D,TM)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/19/2019. (R,Ke)
June 19, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (R,Ke)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Edon House LLC, Richard F Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,Ke)
June 19, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
June 19, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,Ke)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet - Amended, filed by ZUFFA, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship. Related document(s) #1 . (Lonstein, Julie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by ZUFFA, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ZUFFA, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Edon House LLC, Richard F Johnston. Filing fee paid 400, Receipt number 0647-9373497.. Filed by ZUFFA, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Complaint - Advertisements, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (no county listed) , #3 Summons as to Defendant, Richard F. Johnston, #4 Summons as to Defendant, Edon House LLC) (Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZUFFA, LLC v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edon House LLC
Represented By: Alan J. Lehenbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F Johnston
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Stopar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZUFFA, LLC
Represented By: Julie C. Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?