Barker v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Donell Barker
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01443
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 Subpoena Returned Unexecuted; service attempted upon Toledo Police Dept. by Unknown means and attempted on Unknown date filed on behalf of Donell Barker. (Attachments: #1 Police Report dated 11/19/2017)(M,L)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. CMC held on 8/13/19. Case is assigned to the Standard Track with trial in AUGUST 2020. Deadline for amending pleadings/adding parties: 1/27/20. Counsel are reminded to follow the amended Civil Rules re proportional discovery and civility. Counsel will stage depositions pursuant to 2015 Civil Rules amendments. See Civil Case Management Procedures (Doc. #14 at Paragraph 3). Discovery deadlines: Liability/Damages due by 7/17/20; Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 1/15/20; Plaintiff's expert reports due by 3/16/20; Defendant's expert disclosures due by 2/14/20; Defendant's expert reports due by 5/15/20. Expert depositions and dispositive motions require prior Court approval. See attached Order for briefing requirements. Failure to follow will result in Clerk striking the briefing. Next Phone Status set for 11/12/19 at 3:30 PM. Court will initiate call. If counsel wish to discuss possible motion practice during the Phone Status, they shall provide Court with a copy of their pre-motion letters by 11/8/19. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/14/19. (S,Na)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/14/2019. (D,TM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. Related document(s) #10 .(Orndorff, Erin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Munger, Peter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Orndorff, Erin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE. CMC to be held on 8/13/19 at 12:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel may participate by phone, and party attendance is not required. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due 3 days before the Conference. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/11/19. (S,Na)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 7/10/19 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena is denied #8 . Defendant required to turn over all records received from Boost Mobile to Plaintiff's counsel. Issues with respect to relevancy will be decided at a later date as necessary. Case Management Conference by phone set for 8/13/19 at 12:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. A CMC Notice will be filed simultaneously with this Order. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/11/19. (S,Na)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 7/10/19 at 3:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. (S,Na)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to quash Liberty Mutual's Amended Subpoena to Boost Mobile filed by Plaintiff Donell Barker. Related document(s) #7 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Subpoena to Boost Mobile, #2 Exhibit B - 7/1/19 Letter to Liberty Mutual counsel)(Munger, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Issuance of Amended Subpoena to Boost Mobile filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Subpoena to Boost Mobile)Related document(s) #6 .(Orndorff, Erin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporation's Notice of Issuance of Subpoena to Boost Mobile filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Boost Mobile)(Orndorff, Erin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Orndorff, Erin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,Ke)
June 21, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
June 21, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,Ke)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Lucas Co. Common Pleas Complaint and Summons (Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal), filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. Related document(s) #1 . (Harter, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Harter, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County Common Pleas, case number G-4801-CI-0201902470-000 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9378574. Filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harter, William) Modified on 7/7/2019: Common Pleas Court Summons and Complaint filed as document #3 (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donell Barker
Represented By: Peter C. Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Erin E. Orndorff
Represented By: William M. Harter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?