Ackles v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Aubrey R. Ackles
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv01458
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Referring Judge: Thomas M Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Related document(s) #9 , #10 . (Asher, Ruchi)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Related document(s) #9 . (Asher, Ruchi)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Asher, Ruchi)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration c/o US Attorney's Office on 6/26/2019, upon Attorney General's Office by FedEx on 6/28/19, upon Regional Counsel by FedEx on 7/1/19 filed on behalf of Aubrey R. Ackles (Related document(s) #7 ). (H,SP)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons, Complaint, Initial Order and Magistrate Consent Package issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285). (D,JJ)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,JJ)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 6/25/2019. (D,JJ)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 6/25/2019. (D,JJ)
June 25, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James G. Carr on 6/25/2019. (M,L)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Track Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,L)
June 25, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,L)
June 25, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (M,L)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Providing Information to US Attorney filed by Aubrey R. Ackles. (Farrell, Clifford)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Aubrey R. Ackles. (Farrell, Clifford)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Aubrey R. Ackles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 USM-285 Attorney General, #3 USM-285 US Attorney, #4 USM-285 Regional Counsel, #5 Summons Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney, #7 Summons Regional Counsel) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ackles v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey R. Ackles
Represented By: Clifford M. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?